Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc v. Herbert S. Madan Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515209
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald S. Davidson +1 415 393 2000
v.
No Logo Herbert S. Madan Revocable Trust Dated April 23, 1997, Respondent
No Logo Madan, Herbert S., Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment Thereon Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Written Order And Judgment Are Signed And Filed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Clerk: Jose Rios Merida; Not Reported. (d302)
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed And Judgment (transaction Id # 100003783) Filed By Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc
      Blank 9 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
      Mini Minutes For Sep-27-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016 Text Judgment
        The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: ** Judgment Confirming Arbitration Award **
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: 9/27/2016
          Order Granting Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 6 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
            Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 100001867) Filed By Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 Proof of Service
              Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 100001763) Filed By Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                Declaration Of Jennifer Machlin Iso Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100001763) Filed By Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 100001763) Filed By Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016
                    Notice Of Hearing On Wells Fargos Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award And Enter Judgment Thereon (transaction Id # 100001763) Filed By Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc Hearing Set For Sep-27-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                      Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Wells Fargo Advisors, Llc F/k/a Wells Fargo Investments, Llc As To Respondent Madan, Herbert S. Herbert S. Madan Revocable Trust Dated April 23, 1997 Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                        Request RequestSpace

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 242 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?