Lalanne Fitness Llc Et Al v. Harry Ming
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515237
Superior Court Judge Suzanne R. Bolanos, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lalanne Fitness Llc, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas John Lalanne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas John LaLanne +1 415 434 1122 +1 415 434 1125 lalanne@ix.netcom.com
No Logo Lalanne, Christopher, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas John Lalanne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas John LaLanne +1 415 434 1122 +1 415 434 1125 lalanne@ix.netcom.com
No Logo Lalanne, Maribel, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas John Lalanne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas John LaLanne +1 415 434 1122 +1 415 434 1125 lalanne@ix.netcom.com
v.
No Logo Ming, Harry, Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Real Property/housing Motion 501, Petitioner Lalanne Fitness Llc, Maribel Lalanne, Christopher Lalanne's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Off Calendar. Moving Party Failed To Comply With Sfrl 2.7b And Court's September 29, 2016 Minute Order. Judge: Suzanne R. Bolanos; Clerk: J. Murphy; Not Reported. (501)
    Blank 6 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: 10/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
    Mini Minutes For Oct-06-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 501
      Blank 5 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Real Property/housing Motion 501, Petitioner Lalanne Fitness Llc, Maribel Lalanne, Christopher Lalanne Notice Of Hearing Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Is Continued To October 6, 2016 For The Moving Party To Comply With Sflr 2.7b And Provide Courtesy Copies To Department 501 No Later Than September 30, 2016 With A Cover Letter Reflecting The New Hearing Date. Judge: Suzanne R. Bolanos, Clerk: M. Goodman, Not Reported. (d501)
        Blank 4 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Sep-29-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 501
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm
          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59485974) Filed By Petitioner Lalanne Fitness Llc Lalanne, Maribel Lalanne, Christopher
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016
            Notice Of Hearing Of Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 59485974) Filed By Petitioner Lalanne Fitness Llc Lalanne, Maribel Lalanne, Christopher Hearing Set For Sep-29-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 501
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
              Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed By Petitioner Lalanne Fitness Llc Lalanne, Maribel Lalanne, Christopher As To Respondent Ming, Harry Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                Request RequestSpace

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 144 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?