Ryan Akky v. Daric, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CPF 16 515260
Superior Court Judge Harold E. Kahn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Akky, Ryan, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Futterman Dupree Dodd Croley Maier LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie L. Dupree +1 415 399 3840 +1 415 399 3838 jdupree@fddcm.com
v.
No Logo Daric, Inc., Respondent
Cause of Action Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Law And Motion 302, Petitioner Ryan Akky's Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award. The Court Confirmed Its Tentative Ruling. Granted. Mr. Akky Is Entitled To Judgment In His Favor In The Principal Amount Of $191,521.86 With Interest From September 13, 2016 Plus Costs Of $600. No Attorney's Fees Are Awarded Because The Petition Does Not Specify A Particular Amount Of Fees. Petitioner May File A Post-judgment Motion For Fees. No Opposition Filed. Order And Judgment Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn. Clerk: Rosie Noguera. Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Court Judgment - General
    The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Petitioner Akky, Ryan Recover From Respondent Daric, Inc. $191,121.86 Principal, $1,526.45 Interest, $600.00 Costs, Total Judgment $193,248.31, See Scanned Doc
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016
      Order Confirming Tentative Ruling Granting Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 12 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Mini Minutes For Oct-12-2016 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: 10/5/2016
          Order (amended) Granting Petitioner's Ex-parte Application For Order Replacing Filed Documents With Redacted Versions
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016
            Order Granting Petitioner's Ex Parte Application For Order Replacing Filed Documents With Redacted Versions
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Proof of Service
              Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59631416) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Proof of Service
                Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 59631158) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016
                  Notice Of Petitions Ex Parte Application For Order Replacing Filed Documents With Redacted Versions (transaction Id # 59631158) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016
                    Declaration Of Jaime G Touchstone In Support Of Petitioners Ex Parte Application And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Replacing Filed Documents With Redacted Versions (transaction Id # 59631158) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016
                      Notice Of Petitioners Ex Parte Application For Order Replacing Filed Documents With Redacted Versions (transaction Id # 59631158) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour (transaction Id # 16257017) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016
                          Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award (transaction Id # 16257017) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan Hearing Set For Oct-12-2016 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                            Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (unredacted) (sealed Document) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
                              Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (redacted) Filed By Petitioner Akky, Ryan As To Respondent Daric, Inc. Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 617 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?