National labor Relations Board v. DT Management LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-02072

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 6:34 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Dean Gee +1 310 235 7351 +1 310 235 7420 brian.gee@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Wren Laufer +1 310 235 7317 +1 310 235 7420 amanda.laufer@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Portia Elaine Shizuyo Gant +1 202 273 1921 +1 202 273 4244 portia.gant@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna F Silverman +1 310 235 7459 +1 310 235 7420 joanna.silverman@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo DT Management LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sami Hasan +1 949 705 3000 +1 949 724 1201
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne Alfred Hersh +1 949 705 3000 +1 949 724 1201 whersh@littler.com
No Logo Extreme Services, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Steven E Wohn APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven E Wohn +1 424 237 2699 +1 424 237 2896 steve@lawofficeofsew.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 18 filed by DT Management LLC. CCA # 16-56731. This appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties stipulation. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (mat) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: 2/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: 20 MOTION to Stay. For the foregoing reasons, DoubleTree's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal is denied. DoubleTree and Extreme are ordered to comply with the Court's November 4, 2016, Order by February 16, 2017. (See document for specifics) (mrgo)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Percy Anderson. On the Court's own motion, the Court vacates the hearing on the Motion to Stay Pending Court's Order Granting NLRB's Application for an Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Pending Appeal 20, previously scheduled for 1/30/2017 at 1:30 p.m. No appearance is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
        REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Court's Order Granting NLRB's Application for an Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Pending Appeal Order on Motion for Order,, 17 20 filed by Respondent DT Management LLC. (Hasan, Sami)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: 1/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
          OPPOSITION In Opposition To re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Court's Order Granting NLRB's Application for an Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Pending Appeal Order on Motion for Order,, 17 20 filed by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Laufer, Amanda)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER Granting Continuance or Extension of Time by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Continue 22 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. The hearing on Respondent's Motion to Stay Courts Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Pending Appeal iscontinued to January 30, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Applicant shall file its opposition to Respondent's motion by January 9, 2017. Respondent shall file its reply by January 16, 2017. (smo) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 21 Non-Resident Attorney Portia-Elaine S. Gant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff National Labor Relations Board, designating Amanda W. Laufer as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Stay Court's Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Pending Appeal from January 23, 2017 to January 30, 2017 filed by Applicant National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Joint Stip)(Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Portia-Elaine S. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner National Labor Relations Board (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Applicant National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Application) (Laufer, Amanda)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Court's Order Granting NLRB's Application for an Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum Pending Appeal Order on Motion for Order,, 17 filed by Respondent DT Management LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Declaration of Sami Hasan, # 4 Proposed Order) (Hasan, Sami)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 16-56731 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 18 as to RESPONDENTS DT Management LLC, Extreme Services, Inc.. (mat) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Respondent DT MANAGEMENT D/B/A DOUBLETREE BY DT Management LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion for Order,, 17 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18923782.) (Hasan, Sami) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCEWITH ADMINISTRATIVESUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM by Judge Percy Anderson that the Board Application for an Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum 7 is GRANTED. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). The Board request for attorney fees is DENIED, as FRCP 37 does not apply to an application to require obedience with administrative subpoenas duces tecum because such an application is not a motion to compel disclosure or discovery under the FRCP. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (jp)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Percy Anderson. On the Court's own motion, the Court vacates MOTION re Application for a Summary Order Requiring Obedience with Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum 7, previously scheduled for 11/7/2016 at 10:30 a.m. No appearance is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sami Hasan counsel for Respondent DT Management LLC. Adding Sami Hasan as counsel of record for Respondent for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent DT Management LLC. (Attorney Sami Hasan added to party DT Management LLC(pty:res))(Hasan, Sami) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REPLY for Order 7 Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Application filed by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board. (Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REPLY filed by Respondent Extreme Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration and Exhibit, # 2 Proof of Service)(Wohn, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to for Order 7 to Application for an Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Respondent DT Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan I. Model in Support of Application for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas Duces Tecum, # 2 Exhibit A in Support of Alan I. Model, # 3 Exhibit B in Support of Alan I. Model, # 4 Exhibit C in Support of Alan I. Model, # 5 Exhibit D in Support of Alan I. Model, # 6 Exhibit E in Support of Alan I. Model)(Attorney Wayne Alfred Hersh added to party DT Management LLC(pty:res))(Hersh, Wayne)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven E Wohn on behalf of Respondent Extreme Services, Inc. (Attorney Steven E Wohn added to party Extreme Services, Inc. (pty:res))(Wohn, Steven) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Applicant National Labor Relations Board, re Order 8 served on 10/4/2016. (Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Applicant National Labor Relations Board, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2, Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1, Miscellaneous Document 4, Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 6, Notice (Other) 3, for Order 7, Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 5 served on 10/3/2016. (Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Notice of Motion re: Application for a Summary Order Requiring Obedience with Administrative Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Petitioner National Labor Relations Board re: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 (Laufer, Amanda) Modified on 10/3/2016 (mrgo). (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jp) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Movant NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD, REGION 31 (Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE Notice of Motion re: Application for Subpoena Enforcement filed by Applicant NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD, REGION 31. (Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD, REGION 31. (Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              APPLICATION to Enforce Subpoenas Duces Tecum No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Applicant NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD, REGION 31. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 7 to Application [Part 1 of 3], # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 8 - 15 to Application [Part 2 of 3], # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 16 - 22 to Application [Part 3 of 3], # 4 Declaration Laufer Declaration in Support of Application, # 5 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Amanda Wren Laufer added to party NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD, REGION 31(pty:mov))(Laufer, Amanda) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?