Pierson v. National Institute for Labor Relations Research
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00449

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2019 at 12:36 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Hearing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES defendants' motion to dismiss 6 . Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 3/25/2018. (jss)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?