Kittos v. Donald J. Trump For President, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-09818

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2017 at 12:01 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Kittos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Heather L. Blaise, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather L Blaise +1 323 637 3815 +1 312 803 1940 heather.blaise@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L Blaise +1 323 637 3815 +1 312 803 1940 heather.blaise@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Shonkwiler +1 708 794 0022 jshonkwiler@lelandgrovelaw.com
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Shonkwiler +1 708 794 0022 jshonkwiler@lelandgrovelaw.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Sr."
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Shonkwiler +1 708 794 0022 jshonkwiler@lelandgrovelaw.com
Pence, Michael Richard Pence, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Pence"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Shonkwiler +1 708 794 0022 jshonkwiler@lelandgrovelaw.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal 10 , the terms of which are set forth therein. Status hearing set for 1/5/2017 5 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Kittos (Blaise, Heather) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time 7 is granted. By agreement, the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint is extended to 12/15/2016. Motion hearing set for 11/7/2016 8 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Motion by John F. Shonkwiler for presentment of extension of time 7 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/7/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Shonkwiler, John) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
          MOTION by Defendants Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Michael Pence, Donald Trump, Jr., Donald Trump, Sr. for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Shonkwiler, John)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Michael Pence, Donald Trump, Jr., Donald Trump, Sr. by John F. Shonkwiler (Shonkwiler, John) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 1/5/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 12/29/2016. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 400.00, receipt no. 0752-12479461, (Blaise, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (sxn, ) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Kittos by Heather Lea Blaise (Blaise, Heather) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT filed by David Kittos; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12479481. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blaise, Heather)
                      LREF

                      Space Space

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 175 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?