Cook v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:16-cv-81733

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 2:41 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OPINION AND ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: 19 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., American Home Mortgage Corp., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/17/2017. (yha) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None extension of time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None extension of time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?