TX Health and Human Svc Cmsn v. USA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 16-11241

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2016 at 2:21 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2190 - Contract: Other Contract Action
  Entries (248) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 00503601993 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Armando Armendariz, Mr. Hector Armendariz and Ms. Yvette Armendariz advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [16-50905] (MFY)
    LREF
    Blank 00503596079 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Armando Armendariz, Mr. Hector Armendariz and Ms. Yvette Armendariz [16-50905] (CAS)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503480289 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the petition for rehearing filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated in 15-60205 [8186052-2]. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 05/02/2016 for Appellee Google, Incorporated. [15-60205] (SBS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503479858 Filed: 4/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to File Petition for Rehearing Out of Time received from Appellee Google, Incorporated as it is unnecessary. The Clerk has authorized acceptance of all filings attempted on Friday evening that were unsuccessful due to our filing system being down. [15-60205] (AGL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 00503477858 Filed: 4/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PETITION filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated for rehearing [8186052-2]. Date of Service: 04/23/2016 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, Stoltz, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile, Tapley; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts, Rommel [15-60205] (Peter Gillies Neiman )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503458186 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-60205] (JMA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503458158 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-60205 Vacated and Remanded] Judge: CES , Judge: CDK , Judge: SAH Mandate pull date is 04/29/2016 [15-60205] (JMA)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503292184 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE filed by Appellant Mr. James M. Hood, III to the 28j letter filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated in 15-60205 [8069433-2] Date of Service: 12/02/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, Stoltz, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile, Tapley; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts, Rommel [15-60205] (Krissy C. Nobile )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503288708 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellee Google, Incorporated Date of Service: 11/30/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, Stoltz, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile, Tapley; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts, Rommel [15-60205] (Peter Gillies Neiman )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503284048 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    COURT ORDER filed DENYING motion for reconsideration of the court's order of November 13, 2015 granting the motion of amicus curiae to participate in oral argument on time ceded by appellant, filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated [8061201-2] [15-60205] (SME)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503276626 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Digital Citizens Alliance, Ryan United and Taylor Hooton Foundation and 40 State Attorneys General [8062082-1] to the motion for reconsideration filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated in 15-60205 [8061201-2] Date of Service: 11/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, Stoltz, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile, Tapley; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts, Rommel. [15-60205] (Paul D. Clement )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503275341 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated for reconsideration of the Order dated 11/13/2015 [8061201-2]. Date of service: 11/17/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, Stoltz, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile, Tapley; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts, Rommel [15-60205] (Peter Gillies Neiman )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503269275 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          COURT ORDER granting motion participate in oral argument on time ceded by appellant, filed by Amici Curiae Digital Citizens Alliance, Taylor Hooton Foundation and Ryan United [8055892-2] [15-60205] (SME)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503266329 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            OPPOSED MOTION filed by Amici Curiae Digital Citizens Alliance, Ryan United and Taylor Hooton Foundation and 40 State Attorneys General to participate in oral argument [8055892-2]. Date of service: 11/11/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, Stoltz, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Paul D. Clement )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503247791 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Oral argument moved from the 2nd position in the East Courtroom on 12/01/15 to the 3rd position in the West Courtroom on 12/01/15. [15-60205] (GAM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503225645 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                LETTER filed referencing letter filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated in 15-60205 [8030580-2]. re: Supplemental Certificate of Interested Persons. (SEND TO ORAL ARGUMENT PANEL) [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellee Google, Incorporated re: Supplemental Certificate of Interested Persons. Date of Service: 10/08/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Fakhoury, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Peter Gillies Neiman )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503221986 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 11/30/2015. [15-60205] (GAM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503186236 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/19/2015 for Appellant Wren Thomas. [15-20490] (SMH)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503183021 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8005184-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [15-20490] (RLL)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503174532 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Wren Thomas [15-20490] (RLL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503154771 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SHOW CAUSE ORDER issued to Mrs. Stacie Lambert deBlieux, Esq. for State of Tennessee, State of Montana, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Alaska, State of Oregon, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Rhode Island, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of Washington, State of West Virginia, State of New York, State of Colorado, State of Pennsylvania, State of Iowa, State of Arizona, State of Massachusetts, State of Vermont, State of Kentucky, State of Indiana, State of Michigan, State of Idaho, State of North Dakota, State of New Hampshire, State of Maine, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey and State of District of Columbia for failure to submit sufficient paper copies of amicus brief [7986583-2] Sufficient paper Copies of Brief due on 08/19/2015 for Amici Curiae State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of District of Columbia, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of New Hampshire, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin. [15-60205] (AGL)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503153943 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/24/2015 for Appellee Google, Incorporated. [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. James M. Hood, III Date of service: 08/13/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Fakhoury, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Krissy C. Nobile )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503149311 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi, Incorporated in 15-60205 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes, however, the copies have double-sided pages which must be corrected. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. Sufficient Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/17/2015 for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi, Incorporated [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503144476 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi, Incorporated in 15-60205 [7977687-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/11/2015 for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi, Incorporated. [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503142256 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Computer & Communications Industry Association, Consumer Electronics Association and Engine. Consent is Not Necessary as a Motion has been Granted. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/10/2015 for Amici Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, Consumer Electronics Association and Engine. [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503141822 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi, Incorporated. Consent is Not Necessary as a Motion has been Granted. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires both attorneys to sign the brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 08/19/2015 for Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi, Incorporated. [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Civil Liberties Union. Date of service: 08/04/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Band, Bhandari, Clement, Dinh, Harris, Hossain, Irvin, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Esha Bhandari )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503141698 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      COURT ORDER granting motion to file amicus brief [7976136-2] filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi, Incorporated, granting motion to file amicus brief [7976205-2] filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association and Consumer Electronics Association in 15-60205 Judge(s): JES. [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503141457 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Paper copies of amicus brief filed by State of Tennessee, State of Montana, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Alaska, State of Oregon, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Rhode Island, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of Washington, State of West Virginia, State of New York, State of Colorado, State of Pennsylvania, State of Iowa, State of Arizona, State of Massachusetts, State of Vermont, State of Kentucky, State of Indiana, State of Michigan, State of Idaho, State of North Dakota, State of New Hampshire, State of Maine, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey and State of District of Columbia in 15-60205 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes, however, the brief should have green, durable covers and be bound. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied.. Sufficient Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/10/2015 for Amici Curiae State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of District of Columbia, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of New Hampshire, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503139656 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by R Street Institute, Public Knowledge, New America's Open Technology Institute, Center for Democracy and Technology and Electronic Frontier Foundation. The Consent is Included in the Brief. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief (Hanni Fakhoury). Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 08/19/2015 for Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Center for Democracy and Technology, New America's Open Technology Institute, Public Knowledge and R Street Institute.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/10/2015 for Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Center for Democracy and Technology, New America's Open Technology Institute, Public Knowledge and R Street Institute. [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Center for Democracy & Technology, New America's Open Technology Institute, Public Knowledge, and R Street. in Support of Appellee Google, Inc. and Affirmance Date of service: 08/03/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Clement, Dinh, Harris, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts; Attorney for Not Parties: Bhandari, Irvin [15-60205] (Hanni Meena Fakhoury )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503139463 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION by Not Parties Computer & Communications Industry Association, Engine and Consumer Electronics Association to file amicus brief [7976205-2] Date of Service: 08/03/2015 [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION by Computer & Communications Industry Ass'n (CCIA); Consumer Electronics Ass'n (CEA); & Engine to file amicus brief [7976205-2] Date of service: 08/03/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Clement, Dinh, Harris, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Jonathan Band )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503139336 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION by Not Parties American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Mississippi to file amicus brief in support of Appellee [7976136-2] Date of Service: 08/03/2015 [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION by ACLU to file amicus brief [7976136-2] Date of service: 08/03/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Clement, Dinh, Harris, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Esha Bhandari )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503131144 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 08/10/2015 for Appellee Google, Incorporated. [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee Google, Incorporated. Date of service: 07/27/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Clement, Dinh, Harris, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Peter Gillies Neiman )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503131138 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 08/13/2015 for Appellant James M. Hood III. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/10/2015 for Appellee Google, Incorporated. [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee Google, Incorporated. Date of service: 07/27/2015 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Clement, Dinh, Harris, deBlieux; Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Peter Gillies Neiman )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503121701 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by State of Tennessee, State of Montana, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Alaska, State of Oregon, State of South Carolina, State of Alabama, State of Louisiana, State of Oklahoma, State of Florida, State of Arkansas, State of Nevada, State of Wisconsin, State of Rhode Island, State of South Dakota, State of Georgia, State of Missouri, State of Utah, State of Kansas, State of Washington, State of West Virginia, State of New York, State of Colorado, State of Pennsylvania, State of Iowa, State of Arizona, State of Massachusetts, State of Vermont, State of Kentucky, State of Indiana, State of Michigan, State of Idaho, State of North Dakota, State of New Hampshire, State of Maine, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey and State of District of Columbia in 15-60205 [7949631-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/27/2015 for Amici Curiae State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of District of Columbia, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of New Hampshire, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin. [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503102766 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Mr. James M. Hood, III in 15-60205 [7943598-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 07/07/2015 for Appellant James M. Hood III. [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503101250 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Digital Citizens Alliance, Ryan United and Taylor Hooton Foundation. Consent is Not Necessary as a Motion has been Granted. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/06/2015 for Amici Curiae Digital Citizens Alliance, Ryan United and Taylor Hooton Foundation. [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503101134 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          COURT ORDER granting motion to file amicus brief [7949730-2] filed by Digital Citizens Alliance, Taylor Hooton Foundation and Ryan United in 15-60205 Judge(s): JES. [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503098009 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION by Not Parties Digital Citizens Alliance, Taylor Hooton Foundation and Ryan United to file amicus brief [7949730-2] Date of Service: 06/29/2015 [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION by Digital Citizens Alliance, Taylor Hooton Foundation, Ryan United to file amicus brief [7949730-2] Date of service: 06/29/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Paul D. Clement )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503097878 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by State of District of Columbia, State of Wisconsin, State of West Virginia, State of Washington, State of Vermont, State of Utah, State of Tennessee, State of South Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of Oregon, State of Oklahoma, State of North Dakota, State of New York, State of New Jersey, State of New Hampshire, State of Nevada, State of Montana, State of Missouri, State of Minnesota, State of Michigan, State of Maryland, State of Maine, State of Kansas, State of Iowa, State of Indiana, State of Illinois, State of Idaho, State of Georgia, State of Florida, State of Connecticut, State of Colorado, State of Arkansas, State of Alaska, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Pennsylvania, State of Massachusetts, State of Kentucky and State of Louisiana. Consent is Not Necessary as Amicus is a Government Entity. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a Certificate of Interested Parties. Additionally the Brief requires a summary of the argument and a clearly labeled argument. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief due on 07/23/2015 for Amici Curiae State of Louisiana, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Pennsylvania, State of Arizona, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of New Hampshire, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Utah, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of District of Columbia, Digital Citizens Alliance, Ryan United and Taylor Hooton Foundation, Appellee Google, Incorporated and Appellant James M. Hood III. [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by State of Louisiana State of Kentucky State of Arizona. Date of service: 06/29/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Stacie Lambert deBlieux )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503088663 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require table of contents. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 07/15/2015 for Appellant James M. Hood III [15-60205] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. James M. Hood, III. Date of service: 06/22/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Krissy C. Nobile )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503088659 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 07/27/2015 for Appellee Google, Incorporated. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/06/2015 for Appellant James M. Hood III. [15-60205]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. James M. Hood, III. Date of service: 06/22/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Miracle, Nobile; Attorney for Appellees: Bouchoux, Johnstone, Krutz, Mulholland, Neiman, Roberts [15-60205] (Krissy C. Nobile )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503042004 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/22/2015 for Appellant James M. Hood III. [15-60205] (MRB)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503029724 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. James M. Hood, III for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/04/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Miracle; Attorney for Appellee: Mulholland. [15-60205] (Douglas T. Miracle )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502999639 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502999001 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502998637 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process as to amended notice of appeal filed 03/31/15. [7883946-2] [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502998627 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7883941-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 04/23/2015 for Appellant James M. Hood III [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502997624 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502992779 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7880342-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James M. Hood, III. [7880342-1] [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502988420 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502983938 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James M. Hood, III [15-60205] (SBS)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502983063 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502982980 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502971547 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [14-60152] (JMA)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502971520 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [14-60152 Affirmed ] Judge: CDK , Judge: WED , Judge: PRO Mandate pull date is 04/07/2015 [14-60152] (JMA)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502923923 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated Date of Service: 02/02/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Sparks, Taylor; Attorney for Appellees: Quin, Sanders, Williams [14-60152] (Glenn Gates Taylor )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502910134 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SHOW CAUSE ORDER issued to Mr. John Christopher Alexander, Sr., Esq. for Mr. Robert Polanco, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Gabriel Thompson, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Ms. Regina Briscoe, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Donald Ceaser, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr., Ms. Rachel Roberts and Mr. Scott Poiencot in 14-31043 for failure to submit paper copies of the appellants' brief [7824342-2] Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/26/2015 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceaser, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [14-31043, 14-31213] (AGL)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502898689 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 02/18/2015 for Appellees George Jackie Alfred, City Police of Lafayette, James P. Craft, Ray Domingue, Lester Joseph Durel Jr., Levy J. Firmin, Keith Gremillion, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Dwayne Prejean, U. J. Prevost, Dee Edward Stanley, Randy Vincent and Ted Vincent. Record Excerpts due on 01/26/2015 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceaser, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/20/2015 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceaser, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [14-31213, 14-31043]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceaser, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson in 14-31213, 14-31043. Date of service: 01/12/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Alexander, Spring; Attorney for Appellees: Briney, Coreil, Corry; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Alexander [14-31213, 14-31043] (John Christopher Alexander Sr.)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502856609 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/12/2015 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceaser, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [14-31043, 14-31213] (MRB)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502856102 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appellants' brief in light of the court order consolidating the two appeals [14-31043] (SBS)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502855232 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 02/02/2015. [14-60152] (GAM)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502851090 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          PAPER COPIES REQUESTED for the petition for rehearing en banc filed by Appellees Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell in 13-60754 [7786078-2]. Mandate pull date canceled.. Paper Copies of Rehearing due on 12/03/2014 for Appellees Sharon Bynum, Matthew Johnson, Gordon Vance Justice Jr., Alison Kinnaman and Stanley O'Dell. [13-60754] (DDV)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502850957 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            PETITION filed by Appellees Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell for rehearing en banc [7786078-2]. Date of Service: 11/26/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502844467 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              CLERK ORDER granting motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellees City Police of Lafayette, Mr. Dwayne Prejean, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Mr. Lester Joseph Durel, Jr., Mr. Dee Edward Stanley, Mr. James P. Craft, Mr. George Jackie Alfred, Mr. Ted Vincent, Mr. Randy Vincent, Mr. Levy J. Firmin, Mr. Ray Domingue, Mr. U. J. Prevost and Mr. Keith Gremillion [7780296-2] in 14-31213. [14-31043, 14-31213] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502842344 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                BILL OF COSTS filed by Appellants Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann. [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502837102 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [13-60754] (JRC)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502837092 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-60754 Reversed and Rendered] Judge: WED , Judge: JLD , Judge: GJC. Mandate pull date is 12/05/2014 [13-60754] (JRC)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502834646 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Mr. Robert Polanco, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Gabriel Thompson, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Ms. Regina Briscoe, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Donald Ceaser, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr., Ms. Rachel Roberts and Mr. Scott Poiencot [7775201-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/19/2014 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceaser, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [14-31043] (AGL)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502834576 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceaser, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson to extend time to file brief as appellant until 11/19/2014 at 11:59 pm [7775201-2]. Date of service: 11/12/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Alexander, Spring; Attorney for Appellees: Briney, Coreil, Corry; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Alexander [14-31043] (John Christopher Alexander Sr.)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502805877 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated in 14-60152 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. However, the paper copies are insufficient due to the wrong color front cover (White front covers were received, yet gray front covers are required). # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. Sufficient Paper Copies of Brief due on 10/21/2014, for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. [14-60152] (DLJ)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502802565 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell Date of Service: 10/14/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502801938 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated in 14-60152 [7751453-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies remain due 10/20/2014. [14-60152] (DLJ)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502800763 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Zenergy, Incorporated. Date of service: 10/10/2014, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Sparks, Taylor; Attorney for Appellees: Quin, Sanders, Williams [14-60152] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Brief NOT Sufficient as it must be converted to a searchable .PDF image. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due via e-mail on 10/27/2014, for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. Paper Copies of Brief due on 10/20/2014, for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. [14-60152] (Glenn Gates Taylor )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502797271 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 12/01/2014. [14-30410] (GAM)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502790411 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/12/2014 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceaser, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [14-31043] (MRB)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502789208 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NON DISPOSITIVE UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. Judge: EHJ , Judge: EBC , Judge: ECP; granting motion to place appendix under seal filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated [7664049-2]; denying motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated [7664048-2] [14-20267] (RMF)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502788863 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        COURT ORDER filed DENYING as moot the incorporated alternative request of appellee MM Steel, L.P. that if the Court concludes that Texas law regarding supersedeas bonds applies, it hold that JSW and each defendant that is required to post a bond, must post a $25 million bond [7671140-3]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellants Arthur J. Moore and American Alloy Steel, Inc. to join in the June 20, 2014, motion of appellant JSW Steel (USA) for stay pending appeal is DENIED as moot [7671100-2]. Judge(s): EHJ, EBC and ECP. [14-20267] (CAG)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502773976 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee Performance Drilling Company, L.L.C. Date of service: 09/18/2014, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Sparks, Taylor; Attorney for Appellees: Sanders, Williams [14-60152] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/29/2014, for Appellee Performance Drilling Company, L.L.C. Reply Brief due on 10/06/2014, for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. [14-60152] (Robert Evans Sanders )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502765274 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7727610-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Electronic ROA due on 09/26/2014. [14-31043] (RLL)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502760546 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceaser, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson [14-31043] (RLL)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502759262 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER filed by Appellants Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann Date of Service: 09/05/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. LETTER filed referencing letter filed by Appellees Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell in 13-60754 [7720598-2]. responding to appellants' letter correcting a misstatement of the record during oral argument. [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502759078 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated Date of service: 09/05/2014 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Oake; Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Bartlett, Bludworth, Garner, Hilbert, Jones, McGlone, Swanson; Attorney for Appellees: Anada, Casey, Cunningham, McKay, Radlauer [14-30410] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/15/2014 for Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated. [14-30410] (James M. Garner )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502755278 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER filed by Appellees Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell to correct a misstatement of the record made by the State in its rebuttal argument on 9/3/14. Date of Service: 09/03/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. LETTER filed correcting a misstatement of the record made by the State in its rebuttal argument. [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502751981 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER filed by Appellees Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell to alert Court that Plaintiff-Appellee Sharon Bynum has moved. Date of Service: 08/29/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. LETTER filed advising the court that appellee, Sharon Bynum moved out of the State of Mississippi and became a resident of Arkansas. [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502746650 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees General Motors, L.L.C., All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C. and All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated in 14-30410 [7709236-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 09/02/2014 for Appellees All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C., All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated and General Motors, L.L.C.. [14-30410] (DDV)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502746645 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees General Motors, L.L.C., All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C. and All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated in 14-30410 [7709113-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/02/2014 for Appellees All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C., All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated and General Motors, L.L.C.. [14-30410] (DDV)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502746061 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/06/2014 for Appellants American Alloy Steel, Incorporated, Chapel Steel Corporation, JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated, Arthur J. Moore, Nucor Corporation and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company. [14-20267] (MRB)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502745720 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated in 14-60152 [7707135-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 09/02/2014 for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. [14-60152] (DDV)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502743819 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Amicus Curiae Center for Competitive Politics. Date of Service: 08/22/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. [13-60754] (Allen Joseph Dickerson )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502743797 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann. Date of service: 08/22/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502743789 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell Date of service: 08/22/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502743489 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Amicus Curiae Campaign Legal Center. Date of Service: 08/22/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. [13-60754] (J. Gerald Hebert )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502739430 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Amicus Curiae James Madison Center for Free Speech Date of Service: 08/20/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.# of Copies Provided: 0 [13-60754] (Randy Elf )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502738939 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellee General Motors, L.L.C.. Date of service: 08/19/2014 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Oake; Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Bartlett, Bludworth, Garner, Hilbert, Jones, McGlone, Swanson; Attorney for Appellees: Anada, Casey, Cunningham, Radlauer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: McKay [14-30410] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellees All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C. and All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require IN EXCESS PAGES. Optional contents exceed page limitations by 75 pages. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 09/03/2014 for Appellees All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C., All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated and General Motors, L.L.C. [14-30410] (Mark Aaron Cunningham )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502738738 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee General Motors, L.L.C.. Date of service: 08/19/2014 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Oake; Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Bartlett, Bludworth, Garner, Hilbert, Jones, McGlone, Swanson; Attorney for Appellees: Anada, Casey, Cunningham, Radlauer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: McKay [14-30410] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. by Appellees All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C. and All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated . Additionally the Brief requires ONE ATTORNEY FOR EACH PARTY MUST SIGN THE BRIEF; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MCKAY MUST FILE AN APPEARANCE FORM. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 09/03/2014 for Appellees All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C., All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated and General Motors, L.L.C... Reply Brief due on 09/05/2014 for Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated [14-30410] (Mark Aaron Cunningham )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502735916 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. Date of service: 08/15/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Sparks, Taylor; Attorney for Appellees: Quin, Sanders, Williams [14-60152] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they appear to be over the page limitation, and multiple pdf images are attached. Optional contents exceed page limitations by over 25 pages. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 08/29/2014 for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated [14-60152] (Glenn Gates Taylor )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502735913 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Zenergy, Incorporated. Date of service: 08/15/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Sparks, Taylor; Attorney for Appellees: Quin, Sanders, Williams [14-60152] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 09/17/2014 for Appellee Performance Drilling Company, L.L.C.. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/26/2014 for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. [14-60152] (Glenn Gates Taylor )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502732831 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT panel has requested of the parties the following: Letter Brief addressing the court's decision yesterday in Catholic Leadership Coal. of Tex. v. Reisman, -- F.3d --, No. 13-50582 (5th Cir. Aug. 12, 2014). Miscellaneous due on 08/22/2014 for Appellees Sharon Bynum, Matthew Johnson, Gordon Vance Justice Jr., Alison Kinnaman and Stanley O'Dell, Amici Curiae Campaign Legal Center, Center for Competitive Politics and James Madison Center for Free Speech and Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann [13-60754] (PFT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502730434 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    COURT ORDER granting motion to withdraw the motion for stay pending appeal, filed by Appellants Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company and Chapel Steel Corporation [7702298-2] Judge(s): ECP. [14-20267] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502728391 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Chapel Steel Corporation and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company to withdraw the motion for stay pending appeal [7670347-3], motion for extraordinary relief [7670347-4], motion for extraordinary relief [7670347-5] [7702298-2]. Date of service: 08/08/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Vance, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky, Yetter [14-20267] (Travis Ryan Wimberly )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502712030 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7691094-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [14-20267] (AJV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502704655 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7686170-2] NOA filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated. [7686170-1] [14-20267] (AJV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502702609 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COURT ORDER granting motion to suspend briefing notice filed by Appellants Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company, Chapel Steel Corporation, American Alloy Steel, Incorporated and Mr. Arthur J. Moore. The 7/15/14 briefing notice is withdrawn. [7683752-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled for Reliance, Chapel, American Alloy, and Moore. (IN DETAIL) A new briefing notice will issue 30 days from the date of this order. Judge(s): ECP. [14-20267] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502702587 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURT ORDER granting motion to suspend briefing notice filed by Appellants Nucor Corporation and JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated. The 6/25/14 briefing notice is withdrawn [7679568-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled for Nucor and JSW; granting motion to view and for rekease of sealed documents to counsel for all parties, filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation (IN DETAIL) [7680462-2] Judge(s): ECP. [14-20267] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502702434 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Appellants Chapel Steel Corporation and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company [7684633-1] to the response/opposition filed by Appellee MM Steel, L.P. in 14-20267 [7679256-2]. Date of Service: 07/17/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Vance, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky. [14-20267] (Marie Roach Yeates )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502701458 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT ORDER denying motion to strike brief filed by Appellee General Motors, L.L.C. [7681373-2] Judge(s): LHS. [14-30410] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502701093 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION filed by Appellants Chapel Steel Corporation and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company to suspend briefing notice of 7/15/14 [7682755-2] [7683752-2]. Date of service: 07/16/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Vance, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky [14-20267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. MOTION also filed by Appellants American Alloy Steel, Incorporated and Mr. Arthur J. Moore [7683752-2]. [14-20267] (Marie Roach Yeates )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502699529 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/25/2014 for Appellants American Alloy Steel, Incorporated, Chapel Steel Corporation, Arthur J. Moore and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company. [14-20267] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502697485 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee General Motors, L.L.C.All Star Advertising Agency, Inc., All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C., and All Star Chevrolet, Inc. to strike Amicus Brief filed by Automotive Body Parts Association brief [7681373-2]. Date of service: 07/14/2014 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Oake; Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Bartlett, Bludworth, Garner, Hilbert, Jones, McGlone, Swanson; Attorney for Appellees: Anada, Casey, Cunningham, Radlauer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: McKay [14-30410] (Tarak Anada )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502696486 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from Attorney Susan Vance for Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated. The document was submitted under another attorney's electronic filing account, which is not allowed. [14-20267] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502696221 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation to view sealed documents and that the seal portions be released to counsel [7680462-2]. Date of service: 07/11/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky [14-20267] (Robert J. Katerberg )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502694839 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated to suspend briefing notice dated 06/25/2014 [7679568-2]. Date of service: 07/11/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky [14-20267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Also filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation [7679568-2]. [14-20267] (Roger Dale Townsend )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502694489 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by MM Steel, L.P. [7679273-1] to the memo supporting document filed by Appellants American Alloy Steel, Incorporated and Mr. Arthur J. Moore in 14-20267 [7671463-2] Date of Service: 07/10/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stern. [14-20267] (Marc S. Tabolsky )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502694450 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by MM Steel, L.P. [7679256-1] to the motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company and Chapel Steel Corporation in 14-20267 [7670347-3], motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company and Chapel Steel Corporation in 14-20267 [7670347-4], motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company and Chapel Steel Corporation in 14-20267 [7670347-5] Date of Service: 07/10/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stern. [14-20267] (Marc S. Tabolsky )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502693775 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Automotive Body Parts Association. Consent is Not Necessary as a Motion has been Granted. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/15/2014 for Amicus Curiae Automotive Body Parts Association. [14-30410] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502693767 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COURT ORDER granting motion to file amicus brief [7678042-2] filed by Automotive Body Parts Association in 14-30410 Judge(s): LHS. [14-30410] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502692597 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSED MOTION filed by Not Party Automotive Body Parts Association to file amicus brief in support of Appellants [7678042-2]. Date of service: 07/07/2014 Response/Opposition due on 07/21/2014 [14-30410] (CMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502690844 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of appellants received from Not Party Automotive Body Parts Association because attorney must file through the ECF system with the amicus brief as an attachment to the motion [14-30410] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502688949 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of motion for stay pending appeal [7664048-2] filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated Date of Service: 07/07/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky [14-20267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. [7670347-3] [14-20267] (Roger Dale Townsend )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502688943 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated [7675660-1] to the response/opposition filed by Appellee MM Steel, L.P. in 14-20267 [7671140-2],to the motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellee MM Steel, L.P. in 14-20267 [7671140-3], to the motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated in 14-20267 [7664048-2]. Date of Service: 07/07/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Heidler, Huffman, Johnston, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stern, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly, Yeates; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stern. [14-20267] (Roger Dale Townsend )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502687670 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated in 14-30410 [7671022-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/14/2014 for Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated. [14-30410] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502682745 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of "joinder" filed by Appellants American Alloy Steel, Incorporated and Mr. Arthur J. Moore Date of Service: 06/30/2014 [14-20267] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502682678 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of motion for stay pending appeal [7670347-3] filed by Appellants Chapel Steel Corporation and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company Date of Service: 06/30/2014 [14-20267] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502682399 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by MM Steel, L.P. [7671140-1] to the motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated in 14-20267 [7664048-2] Date of Service: 06/30/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Huffman, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stern. [14-20267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.and INCORPORATED ALTERNATIVE MOTION requesting that if the Court concludes that Texas law regarding supersedeas bonds applies, it hold that JSW Steel (USA), Inc. and each defendant that is required to post a bond, must post a $25 million bond [7671140-3] [14-20267] (Marc S. Tabolsky )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502682320 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINDER filed by Appellants American Alloy Steel, Incorporated and Mr. Arthur J. Moore to the motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated in 14-20267 [7664048-2]. Date of Service: 06/30/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Huffman, Katerberg, Livingston, Rodgers, Soloway, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stern [14-20267] (Anne M. Rodgers )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502682188 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated. Date of service: 06/30/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Bartlett, Bludworth, Garner, Hilbert, Jones, McGlone, Swanson; Attorney for Appellees: Anada, Casey, Cunningham, McKay, Radlauer [14-30410] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 07/07/2014 for Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated. [14-30410] (James M. Garner )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502682171 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated. Date of service: 06/30/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Adams, Bartlett, Bludworth, Garner, Hilbert, Jones, McGlone, Swanson; Attorney for Appellees: Anada, Casey, Cunningham, McKay, Radlauer [14-30410] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Brief NOT Sufficient as the use if "id" is not allowed as the court's system does not recognize it. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 07/16/2014 for Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated.. Appellee's Brief due on 08/04/2014 for Appellees All Star Advertising Agency, Incorporated, All Star Chevrolet North, L.L.C., All Star Chevrolet, Incorporated and General Motors, L.L.C. [14-30410] (James M. Garner )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502681689 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7670673-2] [14-20267] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502681667 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7670655-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [14-20267] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502681180 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Chapel Steel Corporation and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company [7670347-2], for stay pending appeal [7670347-3]. Date of service: 06/30/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Hanslik, Huffman, Katerberg, Livingston, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams, Wimberly; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Stern [14-20267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. ALTERNATIVELY, if this Court requires Reliance and Chapel to post a bond, Reliance and Chapel request that the Court set the amount at $25 million pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 69(f) and Texas law. ALTERNATIVELY if Reliance and Chapel are required to post a bond in any amount, Reliance and Chapel request that this Court order MM Steel to maintain sufficient funds to pay an award of the costs of supersedeas bond premiums pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 39(e)(3) in the event Reliance and Chapel prevail in this appeal. [7670347-4], . [14-20267] (Travis Ryan Wimberly )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502678280 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 09/01/2014. [13-60754] (GAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502677962 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7668053-2] Amended NOA filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation. [7668053-1] [14-20267] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502677168 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7667328-2] Parties added: Appellants Arthur J. Moore and American Alloy Steel, Incorporated. NOA filed by Appellants American Alloy Steel, Incorporated and Mr. Arthur J. Moore. [7667328-1] [14-20267] (MAC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502675815 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7666325-2] Parties added: Appellants Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company and Chapel Steel Corporation. NOA filed by Appellants Chapel Steel Corporation and Reliance Steel & Aluminum Company. [7666325-1] [14-20267] (MAC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502675793 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/04/2014 for Appellants JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated and Nucor Corporation. [14-20267] (MRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502675029 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT (Vol 2) IN SUPPORT of motion for stay pending appeal [7664048-2] filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated [14-20267] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502675017 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT (Vol 1) IN SUPPORT of motion for stay pending appeal [7664048-2] filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated [14-20267] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502672893 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7664300-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [14-20267] (RLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502672551 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated Appendix Volume 2 Date of service: 06/20/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Huffman, Katerberg, Livingston, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky [14-20267] (Roger Dale Townsend )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502672545 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated to place appendix under seal [7664049-2]. Date of service: 06/20/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Huffman, Katerberg, Livingston, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky [14-20267] (Roger Dale Townsend )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502672541 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated for stay pending appeal [7664048-2]. Date of service: 06/20/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Blatt, Greer, Huffman, Katerberg, Livingston, Stolley, Theodore, Townsend, Williams; Attorney for Appellees: Simpson, Tabolsky [14-20267] (Roger Dale Townsend )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502671085 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7663031-2] NOA filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated. [7663031-1] [14-20267] (RLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502657957 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/21/2014 for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated. [14-60152] (SMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502649857 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Fred Warner. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred Warner, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 05/16/2014. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript due on 06/16/2014 for Fred Warner, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 06/16/2014 for Fred Warner, Court Reporter [14-20267] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502649845 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIVED for Ms. Katherine Lee Metzger. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Katherine Lee Metzger, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 05/16/2014. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript due on 06/16/2014 for Katherine Lee Metzger, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 06/16/2014 for Katherine Lee Metzger, Court Reporter [14-20267] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502644134 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell Date of Service: 05/28/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Date of Service: 05/28/2014 [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502641179 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received from Court Reporter Mr. Johnny Sanchez. from Part III Acknowledgement DKT-13 in 12cv1227. [14-20267] (Shelia Marie Roque )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502635714 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/30/2014 for Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated. [14-30410] (SMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502632588 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/16/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Huffman, Katerberg, Stolley, Williams; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky. [14-20267] (Robert J. Katerberg )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502632580 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/16/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Huffman, Katerberg, Stolley, Williams; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky. [14-20267] (Robert J. Katerberg )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502632556 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/16/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Huffman, Katerberg, Stolley, Williams; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky. [14-20267] (Robert J. Katerberg )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502628346 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the paper transcript order forms received from Appellant Nucor Corporation because they must be electronically filed [14-20267] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502626224 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/12/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Katerberg, Stolley; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Katerberg; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky. [14-20267] (Scott Patrick Stolley )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502626218 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/12/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Katerberg, Stolley; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Katerberg; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky. [14-20267] (Scott Patrick Stolley )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502626208 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/12/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barrow, Katerberg, Stolley; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Katerberg; Attorney for Appellee: Tabolsky. [14-20267] (Scott Patrick Stolley )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502624396 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the transcript order forms received from Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated because they must be electronically filed [14-20267] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502624166 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend the time for filing the transcript and waive discount filed by Ms. Gina Morris [7627959-2] Transcript deadline updated to 05/28/2014 for Gina Morris, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 05/28/2014 for Gina Morris, Court Reporter. [14-60152] (CMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502623872 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7629824-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 05/23/2014 for Appellants JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated and Nucor Corporation [14-20267] (RLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502620797 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION OF COURT REPORTER filed by Ms. Gina Morris to extend the time for filing the transcript until 05/28/2014 at 05:00 pm and to waive the discount date [7627959-2]. Date of Service: 05/06/2014 via email - Court Reporter Morris; District Judge Wingate; Originating Clerk/Ag Johnston; Attorney for Appellants: Sparks, Taylor; Attorney for Appellees: Quin, Sanders [14-60152] (Gina Morris )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502619798 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7627339-2] Parties added: Appellant Nucor Corporation. NOA filed by Appellant Nucor Corporation. [7627339-1] [14-20267] (RLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502617580 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7625802-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Electronic ROA due on 05/20/2014. [14-30410] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502615363 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant JSW Steel (USA) Incorporated [14-20267] (MAC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502614067 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Felder's Collision Parts, Incorporated [14-30410] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502607585 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann Date of service: 04/24/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/30/2014 for Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann. [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502601250 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Center for Competitive Politics in 13-60754 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes. However, the paper copies are insufficient in the following ways: The brief is not properly bound, brief requires green covers, text must be printed on one side of the page only. # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied.. Sufficient Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/22/2014 for Amicus Curiae Center for Competitive Politics. [13-60754] (SEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502595124 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Gina Morris. [14-60152] (Gina Morris )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502594053 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell Date of Service: 04/11/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Dickerson, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Date of Service: 04/11/2014 (SEND TO SCREENING JUDGE AND PANEL) [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502593240 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Center for Competitive Politics. Consent is Not Necessary as a Motion has been Granted. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/16/2014 for Amicus Curiae Center for Competitive Politics. [13-60754] (SDH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502593236 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURT ORDER granting motion to file amicus brief [7605363-2] filed by Center for Competitive Politics in 13-60754 Judge(s): EGJ. [13-60754] (SDH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502592172 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell in 13-60754 [7599544-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/15/2014 for Appellees Sharon Bynum, Matthew Johnson, Gordon Vance Justice Jr., Alison Kinnaman and Stanley O'Dell. [13-60754] (SDH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502590637 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann [7607205-1] to the motion to file amicus brief [7605363-2] Date of Service: 04/09/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson. [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [7607205-1] to the motion to file amicus brief. [7605363-2] Date of Service: 04/09/2014. [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502588175 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Center for Competitive Politics to file amicus brief [7605363-2] Date of service: 04/07/2014 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Bopp, Elf, Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. MOTION by Not Party Center for Competitive Politics to file amicus brief [7605363-2] Date of Service: 04/07/2014 [13-60754] (Allen Joseph Dickerson )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502587555 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to File Amicus Brief received from Amicus Curiae James Madison Center for Free Speech because it is unnecessary as consent of all parties is included in the brief. [13-60754] (SDH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502587540 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by James Madison Center for Free Speech. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/14/2014 for Amicus Curiae James Madison Center for Free Speech. [13-60754] (SDH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502584512 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT received from Court Reporter Mr. Fred Jeske. [14-60152] (Fred Jeske )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502583116 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated for the Court to process. [14-60152] (Christy Michelle Sparks )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502583107 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated for the Court to process. [14-60152] (Christy Michelle Sparks )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502583095 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated for the Court to process. [14-60152] (Christy Michelle Sparks )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502581760 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated and returned because separate order forms are required for each court reporter and should be obtained from the ECF Home Page located on the Fifth Circuit website. Transcript Order deadline updated to 04/16/2014 for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated [14-60152] (CMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502580873 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated for the Court to process. [14-60152] (Christy Michelle Sparks )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502579762 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellees Ms. Sharon Bynum, Mr. Matthew Johnson, Mr. Gordon Vance Justice, Jr., Ms. Alison Kinnaman and Mr. Stanley O'Dell. Date of service: 03/31/2014 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Hebert; Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a single statement of the case for appellant's brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 04/14/2014 for Appellees Sharon Bynum, Matthew Johnson, Gordon Vance Justice Jr., Alison Kinnaman and Stanley O'Dell.. Reply Brief due on 04/17/2014 for Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann [13-60754] (Paul Vincent Avelar )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502556647 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7583675-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 03/26/2014 for Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated [14-60152] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502552490 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Zenergy, Incorporated [14-60152] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502549656 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by The Campaign Legal Center. Date of service: 03/03/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Campaign Legal Center. The Consent is Included in the Brief. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/24/2014 for Amicus Curiae Campaign Legal Center. [13-60754] (J. Gerald Hebert )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502542781 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann. Date of service: 02/24/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 03/03/2014 for Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann. [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502542763 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann. Date of service: 02/24/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Pizzetta; Attorney for Appellees: Avelar, Latino, Simpson [13-60754] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires an Appearance Form from counsel signing the brief. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 03/10/2014 for Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann.. Appellee's Brief due on 03/31/2014 for Appellees Sharon Bynum, Matthew Johnson, Gordon Vance Justice Jr., Alison Kinnaman and Stanley O'Dell. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/03/2014 for Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann. [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502499620 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/24/2014 for Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann. [13-60754] (CB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502457617 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Phyllis K. McLarty, Est. Completion Dt: 12/27/2013, Est. No.of Pgs: 98, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 11/26/2013, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 12/26/2013, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 02/06/2013 , Hearing 11/01/2011. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript due on 12/26/2013 for Phyllis K. McLarty, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 12/26/2013 for Phyllis K. McLarty, Court Reporter. [13-60754] (SEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502451745 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann for the Court to process. [13-60754] (Harold Edward Pizzetta III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502429219 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7496686-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 11/19/2013 for Appellants James M. Hood III and Delbert Hosemann. [13-60754] (SEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502417520 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. James M. Hood, III and Mr. Delbert Hosemann [13-60754] (SBS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502298117 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 09/02/2013. [12-11107] (GAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502279214 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees City Police of Lafayette, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Mr. Lester Joseph Durel, Jr., Mr. Dee Edward Stanley, Mr. James P. Craft and Mr. George Jackie Alfred in 13-30332 [7390790-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/24/2013 for Appellees George Jackie Alfred, City Police of Lafayette, James P. Craft, Lester Joseph Durel Jr., Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government and Dee Edward Stanley. [13-30332] (MLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502278451 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellees Mr. George Jackie Alfred, City Police of Lafayette, Mr. James P. Craft, Mr. Lester Joseph Durel, Jr., Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government and Mr. Dee Edward Stanley. Date of service: 06/18/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Alexander, Spring; Attorney for Appellees: Briney, Coreil, Corry; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Alexander [13-30332] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a corrected brief cover with the court's official case caption. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 06/24/2013 for Appellees George Jackie Alfred, City Police of Lafayette, James P. Craft, Lester Joseph Durel Jr., Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government and Dee Edward Stanley. [13-30332] (Michael P. Corry )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502276874 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceasar, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson. Date of service: 06/17/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Alexander, Spring; Attorney for Appellees: Briney, Coreil, Corry; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Alexander [13-30332] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 06/24/2013 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceasar, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [13-30332] (John Christopher Alexander Sr.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502256559 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceasar, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson. Date of service: 05/29/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Alexander, Spring; Attorney for Appellees: Briney, Coreil, Corry; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Alexander [13-30332] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/04/2013 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceasar, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. Record Excerpts due on 06/10/2013 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceasar, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [13-30332] (John Christopher Alexander Sr.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502236547 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 07/08/2013. [13-30332] (GAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502236507 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. EXPEDITED SCHEDULE. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/29/2013 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceasar, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson.. Appellee's Brief due on 06/18/2013 for Appellees George Jackie Alfred, City Police of Lafayette, James P. Craft, Lester Joseph Durel Jr., Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government and Dee Edward Stanley.. Reply Brief due on 06/25/2013 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceasar, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [13-30332] (ADB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502236493 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED suspending briefing notice dated 05/09/2013. The court has directed the appeal to be expedited and to be placed on the next available oral argument calendar. [7360792-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled; [7360792-2] Case should proceed directly to OA Calendar? Yes. [13-30332] (ADB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502236351 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceasar, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson [7360695-1] to the motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees City Police of Lafayette, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Mr. Lester Joseph Durel, Jr., Mr. Dee Edward Stanley, Mr. James P. Craft and Mr. George Jackie Alfred in 13-30332 [7342023-2] [13-30332] (ADB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502236299 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURT ORDER granting motion to file response out of time filed by Appellants Mr. Robert Polanco, Mr. Donald Ceasar, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Gabriel Thompson, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Ms. Regina Briscoe, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr., Ms. Rachel Roberts and Mr. Scott Poiencot [7355733-2] Judge(s): SAH. [13-30332] (ADB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502236015 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/18/2013 for Appellants Regina Briscoe, Donald Ceasar, Greg Cormier, Aleeta M. Harding, Uletom P. Hewitt, Kencil D. Joseph, Kane Marceaux, Norbert Myers, Scott Poiencot, Robert Polanco, Rachel Roberts, Gus Sanchez, Novey Stelly, Paul Taylor Jr. and Gabriel Thompson. [13-30332] (ADB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502236008 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT ORDER denying motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees City Police of Lafayette, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Mr. Lester Joseph Durel, Jr., Mr. Dee Edward Stanley, Mr. James P. Craft and Mr. George Jackie Alfred [7342023-2] Judge(s): JES, ECP and SAH. [13-30332] (ADB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502229025 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceasar, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson to file an out of time response [7355733-2] to the motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees City Police of Lafayette, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Mr. Lester Joseph Durel, Jr., Mr. Dee Edward Stanley, Mr. James P. Craft and Mr. George Jackie Alfred in 13-30332 [7342023-2]. Date of service: 05/02/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Alexander, Spring; Attorney for Appellee: Corry; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Alexander [13-30332] (John Christopher Alexander Sr.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502228185 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the response to Appellees' motion to dismiss received from Appellants Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceasar, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson because it is out of time [13-30332] (ADB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 00502225952 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney Eileen O'Connor for Amicus Curiae National Black Chamber of Commerce, Sixty plus Association, National Grange, Taxpayers Protection Alliance, Center for Individual Freedom, National Taxpayers Union is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [12-20804] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502224429 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Johnson C. Smith University, Barber-Scotia College, Bennett College, Clinton Junior College, and Wilberforce University. in Support of Defendants-Appellants and Reversal Date of service: 04/29/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Hardin, Jackson, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellees: Dale, Sobotka [12-20804] (Bennett Evan Cooper )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502224353 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by National Black Chamber of Commerce, Sixty Plus Association, National Grange, Taxpayers Protection Alliance, Center for Individual Freedom, and National Taxpayers Union. Date of service: 04/29/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale [12-20804] (Eileen Janette O'Connor )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502223728 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Tax Foundation & Law Professors. Date of service: 04/29/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] (Marcus J. Brooks )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502216804 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee Jason Pharmaceuticals. Date of service: 04/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hommel; Attorney for Appellee: Bauer [12-11107] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 05/09/2013 for Appellant Mary Kat Coleman. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/29/2013 for Appellee Jason Pharmaceuticals. [12-11107] (Kristin Leigh Bauer )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502216801 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Preston Marshall. Date of service: 04/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; 3rd party - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 04/30/2013 for Appellant Preston Marshall. [12-20804] (Jeffrey D. Watters )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502216798 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Preston Marshall. Date of service: 04/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; 3rd party - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/30/2013 for Appellant Preston Marshall. Appellee's Brief due on 05/28/2013 for Appellee United States of America [12-20804] (Jeffrey D. Watters )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502216795 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Mr. Finley L. Hilliard and Mr. E. Pierce Marshall, Jr.. Date of service: 04/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they CONTAIN MATERIAL NOT FOUND THE RECORD ON APPEAL. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 05/10/2013 for Appellants Finley L. Hilliard and E. Pierce Marshall Jr. [12-20804] (Scott Patrick Stolley )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502216792 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Finley L. Hilliard and Mr. E. Pierce Marshall, Jr.. Date of service: 04/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. . # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/30/2013 for Appellants Finley L. Hilliard and E. Pierce Marshall Jr.. [12-20804] (Scott Patrick Stolley )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502216360 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. Marshall. Date of service: 04/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 04/30/2013 for Appellant Elaine T. Marshall. [12-20804] (William R. Cousins III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502216332 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Elaine T. Marshall. Date of service: 04/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 04/30/2013 for Appellant Elaine T. Marshall. [12-20804] (William R. Cousins III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502212011 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7343146-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Notice of Certified ROA due on 05/02/2013. [13-30332] (DDV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502210640 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. George Jackie Alfred, City Police of Lafayette, Mr. James P. Craft, Mr. Lester Joseph Durel, Jr., Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government and Mr. Dee Edward Stanley to dismiss the appeal [7342023-2]. Date of service: 04/16/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Alexander, Spring; Attorney for Appellee: Corry; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Alexander [13-30332] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. MOTION to dismiss the appeal [7342023-2]. Date of service: 04/16/2013 Response/Opposition due on 04/29/2013 [13-30332] (Michael P. Corry )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502208648 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK ORDER GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. Marshall [7340121-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/22/2013 for Appellant Elaine T. Marshall. [12-20804] (LBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502207815 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Mr. Finley L. Hilliard and Mr. E. Pierce Marshall, Jr. [7339601-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/22/2013 for Appellants Finley L. Hilliard and E. Pierce Marshall Jr.. [12-20804] (JMW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502207802 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. MarshallMarshall Unopposed Motion of 5 Day Extension to extend the time to file appellant's brief [7339601-2] filed by Appellants Mr. Finley L. Hilliard and Mr. E. Pierce Marshall, Jr. in 12-20804 until 04/22/2013 [7340121-2]. Date of service: 04/15/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] (Robert Don Collier )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502207222 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Finley L. Hilliard and Mr. E. Pierce Marshall, Jr. to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/22/2013 at 11:00 pm [7339601-2]. Date of service: 04/12/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] (Scott Patrick Stolley )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502202887 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Regina Briscoe, Mr. Donald Ceasar, Mr. Greg Cormier, Ms. Aleeta M. Harding, Mr. Uletom P. Hewitt, Mr. Kencil D. Joseph, Mr. Kane Marceaux, Mr. Norbert Myers, Mr. Scott Poiencot, Mr. Robert Polanco, Ms. Rachel Roberts, Mr. Gus Sanchez, Mr. Novey Stelly, Mr. Paul Taylor, Jr. and Ms. Gabriel Thompson [13-30332] (DDV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502186579 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COURT ORDER GRANTING motion view sealed documents filed by Appellant Mr. Preston Marshall [7322714-2] Judge(s): JWE. [12-20804] (LBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502183971 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Preston Marshall to view sealed document.. Date of service: 03/22/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Porter, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley, Watters; Attorney for Appellee: Dale; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] (Jeffrey D. Watters )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502169882 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. SPECIAL ISSUES TO BE BRIEFED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/22/2013 for Appellant Preston Marshall. [12-20804] (PAC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502169847 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT ORDER granting motion to substitute Mr. Preston Marshall, in his capacity as Co-Trustee of the Eleanor Pierce (Marshall) Stevens Living Trust, as an appellant for Mr. Hilliard with respect to the Trust filed by Appellant Mr. Finley L. Hilliard [7305704-2] substituted by Judge(s): EGJ. [12-20804] (PAC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502166537 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Mary Kat Coleman. Date of service: 03/06/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hommel; Attorney for Appellee: Bauer [12-11107] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 03/12/2013 for Appellant Mary Kat Coleman. [12-11107] (William Sam Hommel Jr.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502166531 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Mary Kat Coleman. Date of service: 03/06/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hommel; Attorney for Appellee: Bauer [12-11107] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 04/08/2013 for Appellee Jason Pharmaceuticals. Paper Copies of Brief due on 03/12/2013 for Appellant Mary Kat Coleman. [12-11107] (William Sam Hommel Jr.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502160122 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Finley L. HilliardHilliard to substitute Finley Hilliard, now Former Trustee of the Eleanor Pierce (Marshall) Stevens Living Trust with Preston Marshall, Trustee of the Trust. Date of service: 02/28/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Hardin, Jackson, Parker, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley; Attorney for Appellees: Dale, Sobotka; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] (Emily A. Parker )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502152704 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. Marshall [7299666-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/17/2013 for Appellant Elaine T. Marshall. [12-20804] (AS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502151742 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. Marshall Second Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief [7291953-2] dated 02/14/2013 [7299666-2]. Date of service: 02/21/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Parker, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley; Attorney for Appellee: Hagley; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] (William R. Cousins III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502143902 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. Marshall [7291953-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/18/2013 for Appellant Elaine T. Marshall. [12-20804] (AS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502141339 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. Marshall to extend time to file brief until 3/18/13 [7287434-2] dated 02/05/2013 [7291953-2]. Date of service: 02/12/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Beck, Collier, Cousins, Hardin, Jackson, Parker, Reis, Spiegel, Stolley; Attorney for Appellees: Hagley, Sobotka [12-20804] (William R. Cousins III)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502135176 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/18/2013 for Appellants Finley L. Hilliard and E. Pierce Marshall Jr.. [12-20804] (AS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502132650 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Mary Kat Coleman [7284663-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/06/2013 for Appellant Mary Kat Coleman. [12-11107] (MVM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502131309 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Mary Kat Coleman to extend time to file brief as appellant until 03/01/2013 at 06:00 pm [7284663-2]. Date of service: 01/31/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hommel; Attorney for Appellee: Bauer [12-11107] (William Sam Hommel Jr.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502121074 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney Robert Collier for Appellant Elaine T. Marshall is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: Multiple forms attached. Each attorney must file his/her own form separately. [12-20804] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502108973 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7268402-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [12-20804] (AS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502108879 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Finley L. Hilliard and Mr. E. Pierce Marshall, Jr. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 01/10/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cousins, Stolley; US mail - Attorney for Appellants: Hardin, Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sobotka [12-20804] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [12-20804] (Scott Patrick Stolley )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502098239 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7260956-2] Parties added: Appellants Finley L. Hilliard and E. Pierce Marshall Jr.. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. E. Pierce Marshall, Jr. and Mr. Finley L. Hilliard. [7260956-1] [12-20804] (RJd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502094310 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/04/2013 for Appellant Mary Kat Coleman. [12-11107] (MVM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502092384 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/30/2013 for Appellant Elaine T. Marshall. [12-20804] (AS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502091675 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7256635-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Notice of Certified ROA due on 01/04/2013. [12-20804] (PAC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502083423 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Elaine T. Marshall [12-20804] (LBM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502073656 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney Mr. William Sam Hommel, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Mary Kat Coleman is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [12-11107] (MAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502051662 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7227733-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Notice of Certified ROA due on 11/28/2012. [12-11107] (MVM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502043423 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Mary Kat Coleman [12-11107] (MVM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?