Doe No. 1 et al v. Putnam County et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:16-cv-08191
District Judge Kenneth M. Karas, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2021 at 10:06 PM ST (6.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Doe No. 1, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo John Doe No. 2, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
Space David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
No Logo Michael C. Bartolotti, Defendant
No Logo Putnam County, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Preclude
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Pre-Conference Statement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/7/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 16 Motion for Peter A. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/24/16) (yv) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 15 Motion for David H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/24/16) (yv) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michael C. Bartolotti served on 10/20/2016, answer due 11/10/2016. Service was accepted by Maureen Bernard, Designated Agent. Document filed by John Doe No. 1; New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc. ; John Doe No. 2. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Putnam County served on 10/20/2016, answer due 11/10/2016. Service was accepted by Maureen Bernard, Designated Agent. Document filed by John Doe No. 1; New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc. ; John Doe No. 2. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Peter A. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12902837. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Ohio, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Peter) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for David H. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12902701. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing New York, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Constitutional Question re: 1 Complaint, 12 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Charles J. Cooper dated 10/21/2016 re: Premotion Conference. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc..(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Gannett Supreme Court Decision, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Dennis J. Sant, # 3 Declaration of John Doe No. 1, # 4 Declaration of John Doe No. 2, # 5 Declaration of Thomas H. King)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc..(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Alabama, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Georgia, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael C. Bartolotti. (vf) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Putnam County. (vf) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc..(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Charles J. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12893141. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Alabama Bar, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Georgia Bar, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia Bar)(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 10/20/2016 (bcu). (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael C. Bartolotti, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Putnam County, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 10/20/2016 (vf). (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Michael C. Bartolotti, Putnam County. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12893094)Document filed by John Doe No. 1, New York State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc., John Doe No. 2.(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?