Coach, Inc. et al v. Bee Sales Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court,
Case No. 1:16-cv-10066
|
|
|
Last Updated December 12, 2017 at 10:20 AM EST (7.4 years ago) |
Update Alerts Jump |
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline |
Summary |
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
|
|
Parties |
|
|
Attributes |
Timeline |
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None |
Order on Motion to Stay |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None |
Stay |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None |
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None |
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Lauren Jennifer Caisman (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CIVIL Cover Sheet (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None |
Complaint |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
No calendar events were found for this docket.
|
|
Statistics
This case has been viewed 21 times.
|
|
|
|