Mitchell et al v. Gautreaux
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00722

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2017 at 11:34 AM EDT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gregory Mitchell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal G. Bounds +1 225 663 2612 cbounds@craftlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
No Logo Shontelle Griffin Mitchell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal G. Bounds +1 225 663 2612 cbounds@craftlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net
v.
No Logo Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Erlingson Banks, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary G. Erlingson +1 225 218 4446 +1 225 246 2876 merlingson@erlingsonbanks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara Lynn Johnston +1 225 218 4446 +1 225 246 2876 tjohnston@erlingsonbanks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Susan St. Pierre +1 225 218 4446 cstpierre@erlingsonbanks.com
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None 60 Day Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Order on motion to stay discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum in Support
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Stay discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before 11/28/16 and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (DCB) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Sid J. Gautreaux, III re 1 Notice of Removal (Johnston, Tara) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?