Tyler Barnett PR, LLC v. Facebook Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-06232-JSW
District Judge Jeffrey S. White, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Last Updated March 29, 2021 at 9:07 PM DT (3.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greg Agustin, Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo LLE One, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Philip Reichmann +1 415 373 8849 +1 855 780 6405 cpreichmann@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Aaron Graber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ggraber@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Alfred Kafka +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ekafka@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by EGLET PRINCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Adams +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 badams@egletlaw.com.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Eglet +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 reglet@egletlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica D. Entsminger +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Artemus W. Ham, IV +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 aham@egletlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dylan Hughes +1 415 981 4800 +1 415 981 4846 dsh@girardgibbs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Law Group Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Blumenthal +1 510 350 9700 +1 510 350 9701 ab@classlawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric H. Gibbs +1 510 350 9700 +1 510 350 9701 ehg@classlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Anthony Motta +1 925 602 3400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo Mark Fierro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo Randy Sutton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EGLET PRINCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Adams +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 badams@egletlaw.com.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Eglet +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 reglet@egletlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica D. Entsminger +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Artemus W. Ham, IV +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 aham@egletlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Anthony Motta +1 925 602 3400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo The Abbi Agency, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EGLET PRINCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Adams +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 badams@egletlaw.com.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Eglet +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 reglet@egletlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica D. Entsminger +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Artemus W. Ham, IV +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 aham@egletlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Anthony Motta +1 925 602 3400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo Thomas Letizia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EGLET PRINCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Adams +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 badams@egletlaw.com.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Eglet +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 reglet@egletlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica D. Entsminger +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Artemus W. Ham, IV +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 aham@egletlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Anthony Motta +1 925 602 3400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo Tom Letizia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo Tony Felice PR, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EGLET PRINCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Adams +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 badams@egletlaw.com.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Eglet +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 reglet@egletlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica D. Entsminger +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Artemus W. Ham, IV +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 aham@egletlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Anthony Motta +1 925 602 3400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
No Logo Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EGLET PRINCE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Adams +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 badams@egletlaw.com.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T Eglet +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 reglet@egletlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica D. Entsminger +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Artemus W. Ham, IV +1 702 450 5400 +1 702 450 5451 aham@egletlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rueb & Motta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Anthony Motta +1 925 602 3400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory David Rueb +1 925 602 3400 +1 925 602 0622 greg@rmmprolaw.com
v.
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ActBlue Technical Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Ashok Ramani +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 axr@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Ian Asher Kanig +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 ikanig@keker.com
a Delaware corporation Paven Malhotra +1 415 676 2238 +1 415 387 7188 pmalhotra@keker.com
a Delaware corporation Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 emccloskey@keker.com
No Logo Quirky, Inc., Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Philip Reichmann +1 415 373 8849 +1 855 780 6405 cpreichmann@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 meisenkraft@cohenmilstein.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW NEIL FRIEDMAN +1 202 408 4600 +4084 408 408 4699 afriedman@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Aaron Graber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ggraber@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Alfred Kafka +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ekafka@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dylan Hughes +1 415 981 4800 +1 415 981 4846 dsh@girardgibbs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Law Group Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Blumenthal +1 510 350 9700 +1 510 350 9701 ab@classlawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric H. Gibbs +1 510 350 9700 +1 510 350 9701 ehg@classlawgroup.com
No Logo Wink Inc., Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Philip Reichmann +1 415 373 8849 +1 855 780 6405 cpreichmann@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 meisenkraft@cohenmilstein.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ANDREW NEIL FRIEDMAN +1 202 408 4600 +4084 408 408 4699 afriedman@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Aaron Graber +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ggraber@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Alfred Kafka +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 ekafka@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dylan Hughes +1 415 981 4800 +1 415 981 4846 dsh@girardgibbs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Law Group Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Blumenthal +1 510 350 9700 +1 510 350 9701 ab@classlawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric H. Gibbs +1 510 350 9700 +1 510 350 9701 ehg@classlawgroup.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (238) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 211 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Attorney Fees
              LREF
              Legal Document 210 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 200 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 198 Filed: 10/5/2019, Entered: None Settlement
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 189 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 188 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Alan Munroe on behalf of Plaintiffs LLE One, LLC and Jonathan Murdough (Munroe, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON [160] MOTION TO DISMISS (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                          REPLY (re [160] MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED [171] STIPULATION To Modify Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/18. Motions due by 6/14/2019. Replies due by 10/18/2019. Responses due by 8/16/2019. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Letter Brief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018, Terminated: 11/14/2018 stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER To Modify Case Schedule filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Facebook Inc. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/9/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [160] MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byLLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Stein, David) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/31/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Response to order to show cause
                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough . (Stein, David) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/30/18. Show Cause Response due by 11/5/2018. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Brief
                                                                                                    Unsealed Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to Sealing the Fourth Amended Complaint filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 10/16/2018) Modified on 10/17/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 165 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      Unsealed Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint (with jury demand) against Facebook Inc. Filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 10/16/2018) Modified on 10/17/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [163] Stipulation Lifting Provisional Seal of Documents. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018, Terminated: 10/16/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                          Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Lifting Provisional Seal of Documents filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Facebook Inc. (Stein, David) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [156] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re [160] MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[160]) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Third Cause of Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/19/2018. Replies due by 10/26/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Michelle Ybarra, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Proposed Order)(Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Facebook Inc. re [146] Brief Withdrawal of Its Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Provisionally file Documents Under Seal (Silbert, David) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Granting Admin. Motions to Provisionally File under Seal Redacted Portions of ECF No.153-2 and ECF No. 156-2 by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Blumenthal, Aaron) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                      Brief re [146] Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion [Dkt. 153 and 156] to File Documents Under Seal filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Paven Malhotra)(Related document(s)[146]) (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Sealing Fourth Amended Complaint - CORRECTION OF # [153] filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs iso Filing under Seal - CORRECTION OF #[153-1], # (2) Redacted Opposition to Sealing Fourth Amended Complaint - CORRECTION OF #[153-2], # (3) Unredacted Opposition to Sealing Fourth Amended Complaint, # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [152] MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/27/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ***SEE CORRECTED ENTRY AT DOCKET #155*** ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [152] Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018) Modified on 9/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 9/28/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                              ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY 156 FOR CORRECTED FILING*** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Sealing Fourth Amended Complaint - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [151] filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration iso Admin. Motion to File under Seal - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [151-1], # (2) Redacted Opposition to Sealing Fourth Amended Complaint - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [151-2], # (3) Unredacted Opposition to Sealing Fourth Amended Complaint, # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/26/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 9/27/2018 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Blumenthal, Aaron) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018, Terminated: 9/26/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                  ***PDF REMOVED PER ORDER OF THE COURT FILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #155*** Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Sealing the 4th Amended Complaint filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Eric H Gibbs ISO Sealing, # (2) Redacted Opposition to Sealing 4th Amended Complaint, # (3) Unredacted Opposition to Sealing 4th Amended Complaint, # (4) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Main Document 151 replaced on 9/27/2018) (napS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/27/2018) (napS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/27/2018) (napS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/27/2018) (napS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/27/2018) (napS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [149] Stipulation to Extend Deadlines for Motion to Seal Briefing. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018, Terminated: 9/20/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Motion to Seal Briefing filed by Facebook Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, LLE One, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher S. Sun)(Sun, Christopher) (Filed on 9/20/2018) Modified on 9/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [147] Stipulation to Extend ADR Deadline. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018, Terminated: 9/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend ADR Deadline filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs iso Stip. to Extend ADR Deadline)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/10/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Brief
                                                                                                                                            Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Provisionally File Documents Under Seal [140] filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Scott Mellon)(Silbert, David) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 145 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint (Redacted) against Facebook Inc. Filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) - Redline of Fourth Amended Complaint (Redacted))(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 8/20/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting as modified [142] Stipulation. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [140] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting [141] Motion for Leave to File. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018, Terminated: 8/15/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Facebook Inc., LLE ONE. LLC and Jonathan Murdough. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/14/2018) Modified on 8/14/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018, Terminated: 8/15/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) Fourth Amended Complaint (Redacted), # (2) Redline of Fourth Amended Complaint (Redacted), # (3) Proposed Order Granting Leave to Amend)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018, Terminated: 8/15/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , Provisionally, Portions of Fourth Amended Complaint filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Eric A. Kafka in support of Admin. Mot. to File Provisionally under Seal, # (2) Redacted Version of Fourth Amended Complaint, # (3) Unredacted Version of Fourth Amended Complaint, # (4) Redacted Version of Redline of Fourth Amended Complaint, # (5) Unredacted Version of Redline of Fourth Amended Complaint, # (6) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Order, signed 7/17/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting [138] Stipulation Regarding Electronic Discovery and Document Production Format.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018, Terminated: 7/18/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re: Electronic Discovery and Production Format filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Facebook Inc. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 7/16/2018) Modified on 7/17/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint (with jury demand) by Facebook Inc. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 6/22/2018) Modified on 6/25/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 145 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [135] Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Third Amended Class Action Complaint. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018, Terminated: 6/8/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time to Answer Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, LLE One, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher Sun)(Sun, Christopher) (Filed on 6/8/2018) Modified on 6/11/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying [110] Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Complaint. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Tyler Barnett PR, LLC Witthout Prejudice by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC. (Eglet, Robert) (Filed on 5/16/2018) Modified on 5/17/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/12/2018, Entered: 5/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Agreement by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/12/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/4/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Conference (lead trial counsel meet and confer) held on 5/8/2018 re: Joint Discovery Letter Briefs [126] [127] [128]. Parties shall file a joint letter reflecting their resolution.FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2018) Modified on 5/10/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Discovery Conference (lead trial counsel, in person, meet and confer) set for 5/8/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER - in person meet and confer, to occur no later than May 17, 2018 re [128] Joint Letter Brief regarding Privilege Logs filed by Jonathan Murdough, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc., LLE One, LLC, [127] Joint Letter Brief Re Discovery Plan filed by Jonathan Murdough, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc., LLE One, LLC, [126] Joint Letter Brief No. 3: Facebook's First Round Production filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/4/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Letter Brief regarding Privilege Logs filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A and Proposed Order - Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Protocol, # (2) Exhibit B - Facebook's Proposed ESI Stipulation, # (3) Exhibit C - Facebook's Responses to 2nd Set of Interrogatories)(Stein, David) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Letter Brief Re Discovery Plan filed by Facebook Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, LLE One, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3)(Silbert, David) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Letter Brief No. 3: Facebook's First Round Production filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [123] Stipulation Modify the Scheduling Order. Motions due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 2/14/2019. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Conference (lead trial counsel meet and confer) held on 5/8/2018 re: Joint Discovery Letter Briefs 126 127 128 . Parties shall file a joint letter reflecting their resolution.FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2018) Modified on 5/10/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018, Terminated: 4/23/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Stein, David) (Filed on 4/19/2018) Modified on 4/20/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY (re [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/6/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: 3/30/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byLLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC. (Stein, David) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order, signed 3/23/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting [118] Stipulation Withdrawing Joint Letter Brief, ECF [117].(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018, Terminated: 3/23/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation to Withdraw [117] Joint Letter Brief filed by LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Blumenthal, Aaron) (Filed on 3/23/2018) Modified on 3/26/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018, Terminated: 3/23/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Letter Brief B No. 3: Facebook's Custodians filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 3/19/2018) Modified on 3/20/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 3/16/2018) Modified on 3/19/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting [113] Stipulation to Extend Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Opposition to and Defendant's Reply in Support of Third Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 4/13/2018. Responses due by 3/30/2018. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/4/2018, Entered: 3/4/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/16/2018, before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 9:46 a.m. - 10:00 a.m., 10:54 a.m. - 11:04 a.m. and 12:07 p.m. to 12:13 p.m. = 30 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [108] Transcript Order, [109] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (Related documents(s) [108], [109]) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018, Terminated: 3/6/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Opposition to and Defendant's Reply in Support of Third Motion to Dismiss filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Jonathan Murdough, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc., Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration ISO Stipulation and Order to Extend Deadlines)(Blumenthal, Aaron) (Filed on 3/2/2018) Modified on 3/5/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Steven Sun (Sun, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re [110] MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Related document(s)[110]) (Silbert, David) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 110 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018, Terminated: 6/1/2018 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 3/9/2018. Replies due by 3/16/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher S. Sun, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Proposed Order)(Silbert, David) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/16/18 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/20/2018) Modified on 2/20/2018: Corrected hearing 'city'. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/16/2018 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 2/20/2018) Modified on 2/20/2018: Corrected hearing 'city'. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held on 2/16/2018 re: Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Request for Production NO. 4 [105]- Held. Parties shall meet and confer to work out a process for production of high level reports as discussed at the hearing.FTR Time: 10:54-11:04 & 12:07-12:13. Plaintiff Attorney: Erica Entsminger, Eric Kafka, Aaron Blumenthal. Defendant Attorney: David Silbert, Elizabeth McCloskey. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2018) Modified on 2/20/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held on 2/16/2018 as to Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Protective Order [96]. Parties shall meet and confer and redraft the protective orders.FTR Time: 9:46-10:00. Plaintiff Attorney: Erica Entsminger, Eric Kafka, Aaron Blumenthal. Defendant Attorney: David Silbert, Elizabeth McCloskey. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2018) Modified on 2/20/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018, Terminated: 2/20/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Request For Production No. 4 filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, LLE One, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit A)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 2/7/2018) Modified on 2/8/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [101] Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Class Action Complaint.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance of David Jason Silbert as Counsel, filed by Facebook Inc. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 2/2/2018) Modified on 2/5/2018 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES; ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion RE [96] Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Protective Order: Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/1/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018) Modified on 2/2/2018 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018, Terminated: 2/5/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook Inc. Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Jonathan Murdough, LLE One, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Eduardo E. Santacana in Support of Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Third Amended Class Action Complaint)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/31/2018) Modified on 2/1/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASHOK RAMANI AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC. by Facebook Inc. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 1/31/2018) Modified on 2/1/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held on 2/16/2018 re: Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Request for Production NO. 4 105 - Held. Parties shall meet and confer to work out a process for production of high level reports as discussed at the hearing.FTR Time: 10:54-11:04 & 12:07-12:13. Plaintiff Attorney: Erica Entsminger, Eric Kafka, Aaron Blumenthal. Defendant Attorney: David Silbert, Elizabeth McCloskey. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2018) Modified on 2/20/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for All Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/23/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held on 2/16/2018 as to Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Protective Order 96 . Parties shall meet and confer and redraft the protective orders.FTR Time: 9:46-10:00. Plaintiff Attorney: Erica Entsminger, Eric Kafka, Aaron Blumenthal. Defendant Attorney: David Silbert, Elizabeth McCloskey. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2018) Modified on 2/20/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo E. Santacana (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc.. Filed byTyler Barnett PR, LLC, LLE One, LLC, Jonathan Murdough. (Attachments: # (1) Redline of Third Amended Complaint)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 1/19/2018) Modified on 1/22/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018, Terminated: 3/23/2018 Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Protective Order filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 1/18/2018) Modified on 1/19/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Briggs Matheson as Counsel by Facebook Inc. (Matheson, Briggs) (Filed on 1/16/2018) Modified on 1/17/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: 12/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, [79]Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 18, 2017. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Quirky, Inc. (Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS (Correction of hearing date) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [79] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Protective Order filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Kafka, Eric) (Filed on 1/18/2018) Modified on 1/19/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [79] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2017 09:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re [79] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Statement Regarding Initial Discovery Plan by LLE One, LLC, Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc., Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit - Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit - Defendant's Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit - Defendant's Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit - Defendant's Exhibit 3)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 10/27/2017) Modified on 10/30/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [79] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint ) filed byLLE One, LLC, Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/13/17 before Judge Jeffrey S. White by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/13/2017, before Judge White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, telephone number (530)941-2621; sarah_goekler@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [85] Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (Related documents(s) [85]) (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/13/2017 before Judge Jeffrey S. White by LLE One, LLC, Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc., for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (Stein, David) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/13/2017. Motions due by 11/16/2018. Responses due by 1/18/2019. Replies due by 3/22/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2018. Total Time in Court: 14 minutes. Court Reporter: Sarah Goekler. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting [76] Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Case Management Conference Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by LLE One, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Facebook Inc. (Eglet, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to [79] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byFacebook Inc.. Responses due by 10/27/2017. Replies due by 11/17/2017. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey in Support of [79] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[79]) (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017, Terminated: 12/18/2017 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/11/2017. Replies due by 10/18/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Certificate of Interested Entities by LLE One, LLC, Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Laurelie Ezra for LLE One, LLC; Other Affiliate Tyler Barnett for Tyler Barnett PR, LLC; Other Affiliate Ed Klingman for Quirky, Inc., Wink, Inc. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Filing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic filing error. Names of Interested Parties were not entered. [err102]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: [77] Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, LLE One, LLC, Wink, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Certificate of Interested Entities by LLE One, LLC, Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 9/25/2017) Modified on 9/26/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey in Support of 79 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 79 ) (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/27/2017) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017, Terminated: 10/12/2017 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by LLE One, LLC, Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc. and Facebook, Inc. filed by LLE One, LLC, Quirky, Inc., Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Stein, David) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/11/2017. Replies due by 10/18/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 9/27/2017) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Quirky, Inc. and Wink, Inc. (Stein, David) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Adams, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Adams, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 ADR Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Facebook Inc. Filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc., Quirky, Inc., LLE One, LLC. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 8/28/2017) Modified on 8/29/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/14/17. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 14, 2017. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET SCHEDULE RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting [66] Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2017.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017, Terminated: 8/11/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Set Schedule Relating To Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Elizabeth K. McCloskey)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Facebook's [46] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/14/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2017.(tehlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/19/17 before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/19/17, before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re [62] Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 7/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2017. (Related documents(s) [62]) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/19/2017 before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Eglet, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2017 re [46] MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Total Time in Court 58 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Stein (Stein, David) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Briggs James Matheson (Matheson, Briggs) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Sabrina Ybarra (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re [46] MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint); -REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [46] MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint); -REPLY IN SUPPORT OF FACEBOOKS MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to re [47] Request for Judicial Notice filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re [46] MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint) filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: 4/25/2017 Order on motion to appoint counselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Denying [35] Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/25/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting [50] Stipulation. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [46] MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint. Opposition due by 5/15/2017. Reply due by 6/6/2017. Motion Hearing reset to 6/19/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re [35] MOTION to Appoint Counsel); -Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Further Reply in Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Facebook Inc.. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017, Terminated: 4/24/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule for re [46] Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Eric Gibbs in Support of Stipulation to Extend Briefing)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [35] MOTION to Appoint Counsel ) - Plaintiffs' Further Reply in Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed byThe Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: 4/17/2017 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2017. re [35] MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by The Abbi Agency, Randy Sutton, Thomas Letizia, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, LLE One, LLC, Wink, Inc., Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Quirky, Inc., Tony Felice PR, LLC.Court will allow counsel to file brief(s) - 2 page limit - to address In re Nest Labs Litig. 2014 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 115596 (N.D. Cal. 2014):Plaintiffs' response due by April 19, 2017.Defense response due by April 21, 2017.Total Time in Court 21 minutes. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney Eric Gibbs; Andrew Friedman; Robert Eglet. Defendant Attorney Elizabeth McCloskey; Paven Malhotra. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re [46] Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Michael Duffey, #(2) Exhibit A-U, #(3) [Proposed] Order) (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017, Terminated: 7/14/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 5/8/2017. Replies due by 5/30/2017. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND SET HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting [42] Stipulation.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re 46 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Michael Duffey, #(2) Exhibit A-U, #(3) [Proposed] Order) (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 4/10/2017) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re [35] MOTION for Appointment of Counsel) filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 5/8/2017. Replies due by 5/30/2017. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 4/10/2017) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to Opposition due by 5/8/2017. Replies due by 5/30/2017. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re [35] MOTION for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017, Terminated: 4/3/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule and Set Hearing Date for Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Extending Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plantiffs' Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re 35 MOTION for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 3/27/2017) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Briefing Schedule and Set Hearing Date for Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 3/27/2017) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Notice of Firm Name And Email Address Change (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting [38] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Andrew Friedman. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017, Terminated: 3/21/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11237400), Filing Fee Previously Paid on 03/16/2017 filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017, Terminated: 3/21/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11237400) Filing fee previously paid on 3/16/2017 filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-1(A) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines as to [35] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Responses due by 3/27/2017. Replies due by 4/3/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017, Terminated: 4/25/2017 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, LLE One, LLC, Thomas Letizia, Quirky, Inc., Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs, # (2) Declaration of Andrew N. Friedman, # (3) Declaration of Robert T. Eglet, # (4) Proposed Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial against Facebook Inc.. Filed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Wink, Inc., Quirky, Inc., The Abbi Agency, Thomas Letizia, Greg Agustin, Jr, LLE One, LLC. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Mark Fierro, The Abbi Agency, Randy Sutton, Tom Letizia, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Greg Agustin, Jr. All Defendants. Summons in a Civil Action_Facebook, Inc. (Adams, Robert) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES; ENLARGING RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE; CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting (31) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-06232-TEH.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-06232-TEH, 3:17-cv-00233-TEH (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017, Terminated: 2/13/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to: (1) Consolidate Related Actions for all Purposes; (2) Enlarge Responsive Pleading Deadline; (3) Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: 2/9/2017 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to: (1) Consolidate Related Actions for all Purposes; (2) Enlarge Responsive Pleading Deadline; (3) Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 2/9/2017) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 2/9/2017) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE(s): C-16-6232 TEH and C-17-0233 EDL. Motions terminated re: [25] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 filed by Quirky, Inc., Wink, Inc., re [28] MOTION to Withdraw [27] Opposition/Response to Motion; Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Opposition to Quirky Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Greg Agustin, Jr, The Abbi Agency, Randy Sutton, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC, Tony Felice PR, LLC.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/6/17. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: 2/6/2017, Terminated: 2/6/2017 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw [27] Opposition/Response to Motion; --Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Opposition to Quirky Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia, Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2017. Replies due by 2/28/2017. (Eglet, Robert) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re [25] ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12); -Opposition to Quirky Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by The Abbi Agency, Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia, Randy Sutton, Tony Felice PR, LLC, Tyler Barnett PR, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 - Motion to Intervene, # (2) Exhibit Ex. 2 - Case Summary Quirky, # (3) Exhibit Ex. 3 - EDE Declaration, # (4) Errata Ex. 4 - Order Denying Quirkys Admin Mtn to Relate)(Adams, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement of Non-Opposition to re [25] Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017, Terminated: 2/6/2017 Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 3-12 filed by Quirky, Inc., Wink, Inc.. Responses due by 1/30/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Letizia Complaint), # (2) Exhibit B (Quirky Complaint), # (3) Declaration of Eric Gibbs in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, # (4) Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(A) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Paven Malhotra (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey (McCloskey, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Asher Kanig (Kanig, Ian) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Ashok Ramani (Ramani, Ashok) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Defendant Facebook Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Summons. (Adams, Robert) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting [9] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Robert M. Adams. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting [10] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Artemus W. Ham. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting [11] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Robert T. Eglet. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson; granting [12] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Erica D. Entsminger. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Motta, Joseph) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION of Erica D. Entsminger for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11033876) filed by Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia. (Entsminger, Erica) (Filed on 12/27/2016) Modified on 12/28/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION of Robert T. Eglet for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11033839.) filed by Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia. (Eglet, Robert) (Filed on 12/27/2016) Modified on 12/28/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION of Artemus Ham for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11033797) filed by Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia. (Ham, Artemus) (Filed on 12/27/2016) Modified on 12/28/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016, Terminated: 1/3/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11030425.) filed by Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia. (Adams, Robert) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: 12/23/2016 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Greg Agustin, Jr., Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia. (Motta, Joseph) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Thelton E. Henderson upon reassignment. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. For a copy of Judge Henderson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on November 17, 2016. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Greg Agustin, Jr, Mark Fierro, Tom Letizia. (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/10/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Class Action COMPLAINT (with jury trial demand) (no process) against Facebook Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-10886873). Filed by Tom Letizia. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 10/27/2016) Modified on 10/28/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 2/14/2019. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 480 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?