Armenta v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-06013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 13, 2020 at 10:12 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alicia Goulbourne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Asher Brim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Demika Hunter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Dwayne Taylor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Elizabeth Donegan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Esther Hazel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Filippo Giambianco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Hanif Mohammed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo I.B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Ismael Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Jasmine Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Jesus Ramos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Julie Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Karla Armenta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Keith Goulbourne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo L. P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Maria Dominguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Maria Magdelena Astacio Castillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Marie Gregoire, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Russell Brim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Shirley Espinosa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Tamara Castillo Aponte, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Walton Serrano-Colon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Yaana Pena, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Yastany Astacio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Yenny Cruz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
No Logo Yunissa Soto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 411

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Gitlin +1 212 757 2800 +1 212 757 7042 bgitlin@lawjusticecenter.org
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov
New York City Department Of Homeless Services New York City Department Of Homeless Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendants' anticipated partial motion to dismiss the Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gitlin, Bruce) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Letter MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Margo K. Brodie by Karla Armenta. (Gitlin, Bruce)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Letter MOTION to Reassign Case to Judge Margo K. Brodie by Karla Armenta. (Gitlin, Bruce)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                            In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9029117 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Maria Dominguez, Esther Hazel, Asher Brim, Julie Lopez, Yaana Pena, Karla Armenta, Elizabeth Donegan, L. P., Hanif Mohammed, Marie Gregoire, Ismael Garcia, Jasmine Johnson, Russell Brim, Filippo Giambianco, Demika Hunter, Tamara Castillo Aponte, Walton Serrano-Colon, Shirley Espinosa, Dwayne Taylor, Alicia Goulbourne, Keith Goulbourne, I. B., Maria Magdelena Astacio Castillo, Jesus Ramos, Yunissa Soto, Yenny Cruz, Yastany Astacio. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Gitlin, Bruce)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?