Triad Catalog Co., L.L.C. v. Landmark Technology, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-01690

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 11:29 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Triad Catalog Co, L.lc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Haar & Woods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa A. Pake +1 314 241 2224 +1 314 241 2227 lpake@haar-woods.com
v.
No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Defendant
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Report (Final) re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Extension
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Notice of Process Server
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Disclosure of Organizational Interests
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Process Server
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Process Server
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 3 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?