DISH Network L.L.C. v. McCarty
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00270

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 7:12 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of DISH Network L.L.C., EchoStar Technologies L.L.C., NagraStar LLC against David McCarty. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/30/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Paul Craven for DISH Network L.L.C., EchoStar Technologies L.L.C., and NagraStar LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/21/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kevin Avi Goldberg for DISH Network L.L.C., EchoStar Technologies L.L.C., and NagraStar LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/21/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None PSAP Notice to Opt In/Out
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?