J & J SPORTS PRODUCTIONS v. HARRIS
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-05250

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 10, 2018 at 4:50 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Joint Discovery Plan
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Opinion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 10/6/17. (sr, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Bono Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Bono Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Order Granting Pro Bono Application
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Appoint Pro Bono
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?