Al Hatem v. USCIS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:16-cv-03237

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 29, 2018 at 4:32 PM DT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mahmood Shakir Nassrulla Al Hatem, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Breston +1 713 224 4040 +1 713 223 1875 david@davidbreston.com
v.
No Logo Dhs - Ice, Defendant
No Logo Lynch, Loretta E., Defendant
Officially listed as "Loretta Lynch"
No Logo US Attorneys Office for the Southern District of Texas, Defendant
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Amended Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Exhibits
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 10 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?