Common Cause New York et al v. Board of Elections in the City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-06122

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 1, 2019 at 10:39 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew Gerald, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May K Chiang +1 212 649 8734 +1 212 698 3599 may.chiang@dechert.com
No Logo Benjamin Buscher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May K Chiang +1 212 649 8734 +1 212 698 3599 may.chiang@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mauricio Alejandro Espana +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 mauricio.espana@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Rachel Hacker +1 212 641 5636 jamie.hacker@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Negin Hadaghian +1 212 649 8787 +1 212 698 3599 negin.hadaghian@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A Steiner +1 212 698 3822 +1 212 698 3599 neil.steiner@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LatinoJustice PRLDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram +1 212 739 7576 +1 212 431 4276 jcuevas@latinojustice.org
No Logo Common Cause New York, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May K Chiang +1 212 649 8734 +1 212 698 3599 may.chiang@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mauricio Alejandro Espana +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 mauricio.espana@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Rachel Hacker +1 212 641 5636 jamie.hacker@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Negin Hadaghian +1 212 649 8787 +1 212 698 3599 negin.hadaghian@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A Steiner +1 212 698 3822 +1 212 698 3599 neil.steiner@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LatinoJustice PRLDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram +1 212 739 7576 +1 212 431 4276 jcuevas@latinojustice.org
No Logo Rebecca Libed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May K Chiang +1 212 649 8734 +1 212 698 3599 may.chiang@dechert.com
No Logo Sarah Milam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May K Chiang +1 212 649 8734 +1 212 698 3599 may.chiang@dechert.com
No Logo Sean Hennessey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May K Chiang +1 212 649 8734 +1 212 698 3599 may.chiang@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mauricio Alejandro Espana +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 mauricio.espana@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Rachel Hacker +1 212 641 5636 jamie.hacker@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Negin Hadaghian +1 212 649 8787 +1 212 698 3599 negin.hadaghian@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A Steiner +1 212 698 3822 +1 212 698 3599 neil.steiner@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LatinoJustice PRLDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram +1 212 739 7576 +1 212 431 4276 jcuevas@latinojustice.org
No Logo SUSAN MILLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED May K Chiang +1 212 649 8734 +1 212 698 3599 may.chiang@dechert.com
v.
No Logo Alan Schulkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City Board Of Elections, Defendant
Officially listed as "Board of Elections in the City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Frederic M. Umane, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John Flateau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Jose Miguel Araujo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Lisa Grey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Maria R. Guastella, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Michael A. Rendino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Michael J. Ryan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Michael Michel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Rosanna Vargas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Simon Shamoun, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Goldberger +1 718 254 6052 +1 718 254 6083 Michael.Goldberger@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaycee Sullivan +1 202 305 6838 +1 202 307 3961 kaycee.sullivan@usdoj.gov
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 29 Intervenor Complaint, 23 Intervenor Complaint by Jose Miguel Araujo, Board of Elections in the City of New York, John Flateau, Lisa Grey, Maria R. Guastella, Michael Michel, Michael A. Rendino, Michael J. Ryan, Alan Schulkin, Simon Shamoun, Frederic M. Umane, Rosanna Vargas. (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Intervenor Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Intervenor Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/10/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unsigned Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?