District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Florida Middle District Court Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit United States Supreme Court

Terry Bollea v. Gawker Media, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 12-15959

Tags
Last Updated November 14, 2016 at 1:05 AM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A.j. Daulerio, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Blogwire Hungary Szellemi Alkotatst Hasznosito Kft, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Gawker Entertainment, Llc, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Gawker Media Group Inc., Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Gawker Media, Llc, A.k.a. Gawker Media, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Gawker Sales, Llc, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Gawker Technology, Llc, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Kate Bennert, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Nick Denton, Defendant - Appellee
No Logo Terry Bollea, Professionally Known As Hulk Hogan, A.k.a. Hulk Hogan, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL WALLER AND POER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN H. WALLER
Nature of Suit 4360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
Case Type Private Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=8:12-cv-02348-JDW-TBM
Lower Court Case https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=8:12-cv-02348-JDW-TBM
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106832809 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellant Terry Bollea's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER: The motion to dismiss appeal without prejudice filed by Appellant Terry Bollea is GRANTED. [6753980-2] The motion for injunction pending appeal is MOOT. (RVG) [6743412-2]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106829534 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal without prejudice filed by Terry Bollea. Motion is Unopposed. [6753980-1] (ECF: Kenneth Turkel)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106828037 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice of Appellant's Voluntary Dismissal of District Court Action filed by Attorney Seth D. Berlin for Appellees Gawker Media, LLC, Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Gawker Technology, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC and Gawker Media Group, Inc.. (ECF: Seth Berlin)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106822787 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER: The motion for extension of time to file the appellant's brief and record excerpts, up to and including January 30, 2013, is GRANTED. [6738149-2] (AJ)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106818982 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Certificate of Readiness filed as to Appellant Terry Bollea.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106816727 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE to Motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Appellant Terry Bollea in 12-15959 [6743412-2] filed by Attorney Seth D. Berlin for Appellees Gawker Media, LLC.--[Edited 12/18/2012 by ECM] (ECF: Seth Berlin)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106812766 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION for injunction pending appeal filed by Terry Bollea. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [6743412-1] (ECF: Christina Ramirez)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106805110 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Christina Kizirian Ramirez for Appellant Terry Bollea. (ECF: Christina Ramirez)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106804789 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for extension of time to file appellants brief to 01/30/2013 at 11:55 pm filed by Terry Bollea. Motion is Unopposed. [6738149-1] (ECF: Christina Ramirez)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106797474 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Terry Bollea. (ECF: Christina Ramirez)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Gregg D. Thomas for Appellee Gawker Technology, LLC in 12-15959, Attorney Gregg D. Thomas for Appellee Gawker Sales, LLC in 12-15959, Attorney Gregg D. Thomas for Appellee Gawker Media, LLC in 12-15959, Attorney Gregg D. Thomas for Appellee Gawker Media Group, Inc. in 12-15959, Attorney Gregg D. Thomas for Appellee Gawker Entertainment, LLC in 12-15959 processed.
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Rachel E. Fugate for Appellee Gawker Technology, LLC in 12-15959, Attorney Rachel E. Fugate for Appellee Gawker Sales, LLC in 12-15959, Attorney Rachel E. Fugate for Appellee Gawker Media, LLC in 12-15959, Attorney Rachel E. Fugate for Appellee Gawker Media Group, Inc. in 12-15959 processed.
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106796589 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gregg D. Thomas for Gawker Media, LLC, Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Gawker Technology, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC and Gawker Media Group, Inc.. (ECF: Rachel Fugate)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106796223 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachel E. Fugate for Gawker Media, LLC, Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Gawker Technology, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC and Gawker Media Group, Inc.. (ECF: Rachel Fugate)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Paul J. Safier for Appellees in 12-15959 processed.
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106795297 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul J. Safier for Gawker Media, LLC, Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Gawker Technology, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC and Gawker Media Group, Inc.. (ECF: Paul Safier)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Seth D. Berlin for Appellees in 12-15959 processed.
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106794856 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Seth D. Berlin for Gawker Media, LLC, Gawker Entertainment, LLC, Gawker Technology, LLC, Gawker Sales, LLC and Gawker Media Group, Inc.. (ECF: Seth Berlin)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Christina Kizirian Ramirez for Appellant Terry Bollea in 12-15959 processed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          E-filed Appearance of Counsel filed by Attorney Kenneth G. Turkel for Appellant Terry Bollea in 12-15959 processed.
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106790686 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christina Kizirian Ramirez for Terry Bollea. (ECF: Christina Ramirez)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106790668 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kenneth G. Turkel for Terry Bollea. (ECF: Kenneth Turkel)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106784245 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Terry Bollea on 11/15/2012. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellants brief and record excerpts are due on or before 12/31/2012.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?