HOFFMAN v. CITIBANK, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-04491

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 2, 2018 at 7:30 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None OpinionCourt Filing
    OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/30/2018. (mps)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/24/2017, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Order Reopening Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?