Daniel v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-03501
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2016 at 12:05 AM DT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul, Daniel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Daniel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Daniel
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Samuel D. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Desiree Faucett Holmes, Defendant
No Logo Former Mayor David N. Dinkins, Defendant
No Logo Former Mayor Edward I. Koch, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Former Mayor Michael Bloomberg"
Giuliani, Rudolph Giuliani, Rudolph, Defendant
Officially listed as "Former Mayor Rudolph Giuliani"
No Logo Kirstin Proud, Defendant
De Blasio, Bill De Blasio, Bill, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor William De Blasio"
No Logo Office of Child Support Enforcement, Defendant
No Logo Office Of Temporary Disability & Assistance, Defendant
No Logo Corporation Cousel of the City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "Zachary W. Carter"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued August 24, 2015, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/24/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff, proceeding pro se and in forma pauperis, filed this action alleging violations of his federal and constitutional rights arising out of child support proceedings. By order dated June 18, 2015, the Court directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on August 6, 2015, and the Court has reviewed it. The action is dismissed for the following reasons herein. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/24/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, Zachary W. Carter, City of New York, William De Blasio, David N. Dinkins, Rudolph Giuliani, Desiree Faucett Holmes, Kirstin Proud, Office of Temporary Disability & Assistance, Samuel D. Roberts; re: amending 2 Complaint.Document filed by Paul Daniel. Related document: 2 Complaint, filed by Paul Daniel.(sc) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se and in forma pauperis, brings this action alleging due process violations in connection with a child support order. For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiff is directed to amend his complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number No. 15-CV-3501 (LAP). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/18/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/14/2015) (sbr) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, Zachary W. Carter, City of New York, William De Blasio, David N. Dinkins, Rudolph Giuliani, Desiree Faucett Holmes, Edward I. Koch, Office of Child Support Enforcement, Kirstin Proud. Document filed by Paul Daniel.(sac) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Paul Daniel.(sac) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 37 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?