District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Louisiana Middle District Court Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Officer v. McKesson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00742

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2020 at 12:22 PM DT (8.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Doe BR Police Officer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grodner and Associates, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Unkel Grodner +1 225 769 1919 dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com
No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grodner and Associates, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Unkel Grodner +1 225 769 1919 dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinet & Day, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise Ann Vinet +1 225 292 7410 + 225 292 4149 denise@vinetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Black Lives Matter, Defendant
McKesson, DeRay McKesson, DeRay, Defendant
Officially listed as "DeRay McKesson"

Toggle Switch Represented by Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William P. Gibbens +1 504 680 6050 billy@semmlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: None Stay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                RULING AND ORDER...IT IS ORDERED that Defendant DeRay Mckesson's Motion to Dismiss(Doc. 15) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant DeRay Mckesson's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(a) (Doc. 43) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to File Amended Complaint for Damages (Doc. 52) filed by Plaintiff is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/28/2017. (PJH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  RULING AND ORDER the Motion for Leave of Court to Proceed as JohnDoe (Doc. 2) filed by Plaintiff is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/28/2017. (PJH)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE in Opposition to 68 MOTION to Dismiss and Special Motion to Strike MOTION to Strike filed by John Doe. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Dismiss and Special Motion to Strike by Black Lives Matter Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Calogero, Christine). Added MOTION to Strike on 8/9/2017 (ELW). (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Leave to Withdraw and Substitute Record Document 66-3 by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 7/21/2017 to edit text. (EDC).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/16/2017, Entered: 7/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply to 61 Opposition to 60 MOTION for Leave to Supplement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Proposed Pleading;, # 3 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna) Modified to edit the text on 7/17/2017 (KAH).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Black Lives Matter Network, Inc. has an additional 21 days, through and including August 7, 2017, within which to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/14/2017. (JSL)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead, Pursuant to Local Rule 7 by Black Lives Matter Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Calogero, Christine) Modified on 7/12/2017 to edit text. (EDC).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 63 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Black Lives Matter served on 7/5/2017, answer due 7/26/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 60 MOTION for Leave to Supplement filed by DeRay McKesson. (Gibbens, William)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to Supplement by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Pleading;, # 4 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna) Modified to edit the text on 6/30/2017 (KAH).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 59 replaced on 6/30/2017) (KAH). (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 58 replaced on 6/30/2017) (KAH). (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Oral argument held on 6/14/2017 re 48 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default and Hearing to Confirm Default as to Black Lives Matter MOTION for Hearing for a filed by John Doe, 43 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(a) filed by DeRay McKesson. Counsel presents oral argument to the Court. As stated by the Court, Plaintiff's Motion for Entry Of Default Judgement (doc. 48) and the Motion to Dismiss by Defendant DeRay McKesson (doc. 43) are taken under advisement. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 06/18/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 06/18/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 06/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 06/18/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/18/2017, Entered: 6/18/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Supplement by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading;, # 3 Attachment)(Grodner, Donna)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: 6/12/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: Oral Argument on 48 Motion for Entry of Preliminary Default and for Hearing on Confirmation of Default shall be held on 6/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/12/2017. (EDC)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Black Lives Matter (ELW)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default and Hearing to Confirm Default as to Black Lives Matter by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna). Added MOTION for Hearing to Confirm Default on 5/30/2017 (ELW).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 46 Motion to Continue hearing. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss is reset for 6/14/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/24/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Reset Hearing Date by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 5/18/2017 to edit the text (KAH).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of Oral Argument set for 5/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson before BAJ on 43 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(a). :(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH) Modified on 5/12/2017 (NLT). (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 43 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(a) filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Grodner, Donna) (Attachments 8 and 9 replaced on 4/20/2017) (KAH).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(a) by DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A)(Gibbens, William)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2017 re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DeRay McKesson, 2 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint as John Doe filed by John Doe. Counsel presents oral argument to the Court. As stated by the Court, matter is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter N. Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Black Lives Matter served on 3/17/2017, answer due 4/7/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Black Lives Matter served on 3/13/2017, answer due 4/3/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Black Lives Matter served on 3/11/2017, answer due 4/3/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  SUR REPLY to 29 REPLY Memorandum to 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Doe. (EDC) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 30 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply to Memorandum in Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 03/10/2017. (EDC)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Black Lives Matter. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Black Lives Matter. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted by John Doe as to Black Lives Matter. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Extend Time for Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 03/02/2017. (NLT)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: 2/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Sur reply to RD 29 by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    REPLY Memorandum in Support of 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DeRay McKesson. (LLH) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 25 MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/16/2017. (LLH)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery in this action is STAYED until resolution of the pending 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/15/2017. (LLH)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as John Doe filed by John Doe. ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiffs Motion forLeave of Court to Proceed as John Doe (Doc. 2) and Defendant DeRay Mckessons Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15) shall be held on March 27, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2, Russell B. Long Federal Building & United States Courthouse. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/14/2017. (ELW)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of his Motion to Dismiss by DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Gibbens, William) Modified on 2/16/2017 to edit text (LLH).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Notice to Counsel: Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. is CANCELLED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed as John Doe by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Grodner, Donna)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: 2/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Doe. (Grodner, Donna)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Discovery by DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Gibbens, William)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by John Doe. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time for Service (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 2/3/2017 to edit the text (KAH).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Summons Returned Unexecuted by John Doe as to Black Lives Matter. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: 2/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 2 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint as John Doe filed by DeRay McKesson. (Gibbens, William)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Gibbens, William)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: 12/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to 2 MOTION for Leave to to Proceed as John Doe. Each defendant shall file a response to the Motion for Leave of Court to Proceed as John Doe within 14 days following that defendants deadline to serve a responsive pleading pursuant to FRCP Rule 12 or as otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/28/2016. (ELW) Modified on 12/29/2016 (NLT).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Agents for Black Lives Matter. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted by John Doe re 9 Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Notice to Counsel OF DATE AND TIME CHANGE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2017 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/2/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. DeRay McKesson waiver sent on 11/18/2016, answer due 1/17/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2017 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/18/2016. (JSL)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant DeRay McKesson granted an extension of 21 days from the time the pleading would otherwise be due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/18/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbens, William)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave of Court to Proceed as John Doe by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Grodner, Donna) Modified on 11/7/2016 to edit text.(EDC).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for Damages/Police Officer hit in face with rock against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1489006.), filed by John Doe BR Police Officer. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Grodner, Donna)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 465 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?