USA v. Levin et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 4:16-cr-40031
Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 8, 2020 at 11:31 AM DT (7.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jacklyn M Sutcivni, Defendant (2)

Toggle Switch Represented by John Bal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Joseph M. Griffin, Jr. +1 617 742 1663 josgriffin@msn.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Psychiatric Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Order on Excludable Delay
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Status Conference by Magistrate Judge
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Remark
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Status report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/26/2016 as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part 44 Motion to Designate Case as Complex, Grant a Continuance of the Date in which Trial Must Begin and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). The case shall be designated as complex and this designation shall be considered in connection with proposed exclusions of time under the Speedy Trial Act as the case progresses. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 46 the parties' Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). Based on the volume of discovery to be produced by the government and reviewed by the defendants, the existing scheduling order is vacated. The parties will appear at a status conference on January 30, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. at which time a further scheduling order will be addressed. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Initial Status Conference as to James E Levin and Jacklyn M Sutcivni held on 11/21/2016. Attorneys Present (by telephone): Michelle L. Dineen Jerrett, R. Bradford Bailey and Joseph M. Griffin. Colloquy re: status of the case. The parties informed the Court that discovery is voluminous and production/requests are ongoing. An Interim Status Conference is set for 1/30/2017 at 2:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint report due by 1/26/2017. Parties assert that time from 11/10/2016 through the Interim Status Conference should be excluded from speedy trial calculation. The court agrees. The ends of justice outweigh the usual interest in a speedy trial. A separate order shall issue. (Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Remark: Telephone conference information sent to counsel by email. (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 47 Motion to appear at the 11/21/2016 status conference telephonically as to James E Levin (1); granting 49 Motion to appear at the 11/21/2016 status conference telephonically as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2); granting 48 Motion to appear at the 11/21/2016 status conference telephonically as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). The Court will e-mail counsel the call in information. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STATUS REPORT filed jointly by the parties in advance of initial status conference by USA as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION appear telephonically for initial status conference on November 21, 2016 as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni. (Griffin, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Joint MOTION to Amend 31 Scheduling Order, as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint MOTION to Designate Case as Complex as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 42 Motion to Continue the Initial Status Conference to 11/21/2016 as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). Initial Status Conference set for 11/21/2016 03:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Assented to MOTION to Continue to November 21, 2016 to initial status conference as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Motion Hearing as to James E. Levin (1) and Jacklyn M. Sutcivni (2) held on 10/12/2016 re Defendants' 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release. Present: AUSA Michelle L. Dineen Jerrett, Atty R. Bradford Bailey, Atty Joseph M. Griffin, Jr. and Defendants (OB). Arguments were heard on the pending motion. This matter is taken under advisement. R&R to issue. Deadlines, in accordance with the scheduling order issued on 9/13/2016 (See Dkt. No. 31 ), shall remain as set. Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni entered. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 36 the government's assented-to Motion for Protective Order as to James E Levin (1) and Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) to protect the confidentiality of personal identifying information of third parties in material to be produced by the government in discovery. The proposed order shall be entered separately. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Protective Order as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to James E Levin (1) and Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) ISSUED: At the request of the parties, a Motion Hearing is set for 10/12/2016 at 11:30 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Calderon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Opposition by USA as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni re 29 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER dated 9/9/2016 entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Time excluded from August 25, 2016 until November 10, 2016. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 9/13/2016 to add to the text - dated 9/9/2016. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Set Hearings as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Initial Status Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 02:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Initial Status Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 02:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 9/13/2016 to correct the date of the hearing from 10/11/2016 to 11/10/2016. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in the interests of justice 28 the government's assented-to Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to defendants James E Levin and Jacklyn M Sutcivni. The time from August 25 to November 10, 2016 is excluded. A separate order shall issue. (Robertson, Katherine) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from August 25, 2016 to November 10, 2016 as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Dineen Jerrett, Michelle) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson Reason for referral: Pretrial as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Case as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Unsecured personal recognizance Bond Entered as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni in amount of $15,000.00. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Arraignment as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 8/26/2016, Case called, Counsel and dft appear for arraignment after dft's arrest, Court informs dft of her rights, Court appoints atty Griffin to represent dft, Dft enters a plea of not-guilty to all counts, Plea entered by Jacklyn M Sutcivni Not Guilty on counts 1-4, Court releases dft on conditions of release, Appearance bond executed and filed, Order re conditions of release to enter, Court informs counsel that Mag. Judge Robertson will schedule the next Court appearance, Court order time excluded to allow govt 28 days for initial disclosures,(Attorneys present: Grady/Griffin)(P.O. Miller)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Initial Appearance as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni held on 8/26/2016 (Attorneys present: Grady/Griffin)(P.O. Miller)Court Reporter Name and Contact information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                INDICTMENT as to Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (Indictment re-entered to fix statistical information.) (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 18 Motion to Unseal Case as to James E Levin (1), Jacklyn M Sutcivni (2). (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Case as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni by USA. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER OF RECUSAL as to James E Levin, Jacklyn M Sutcivni. Under 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), a United States Magistrate Judge must disqualify himself from any proceeding "in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." During my tenure with the United States Attorney's Office, I was involved in the prosecution of this criminal matter. Accordingly, I recuse myself the instant criminal case. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 399 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?