USA v. Meekins
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:14-cr-10022
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2020 at 12:39 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sanford Meekins, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment George F. Gormley +1 617 268 2999 +1 617 268 2911 gfgormley@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE by USA as to Sanford Meekins re 19 Supervised Release - Final Revocation Hrg,,,,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Designation Notification)(Heymann, Stephen) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT OF REVOCATION as to Sanford Meekins (1), Count(s) 1, REVOCATION JUDGMENT: The defendant is committed to the custody of BOP for six (6) months to be followed by 48 months of supervised release with standard and special conditions. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young:Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Sanford Meekins held on 9/10/2015. The defendant stipulates to violations I, II, III and a portion of IV. The government is satisfied with the stipulation and withdraws the remaining portion of violation IV and all of violation V. After hearing from the government, defense counsel and the defendant, the Court revokes supervised release and imposes the following sentence: The defendant is committed to the custody of BOP for six (6) months to be followed by 48 months of supervised release. All previously imposed standard and special conditions are reimposed. The following two additional special conditions are imposed: (1) The defendant is to participate in a mental health program as directed by the United States Probation Office. (2) The defendant is prohibited from engaging in any occupation, business, or profession without the prior approval of the Probation Officer. The Court makes a Judicial Recommendation that the defendant be designated to Ft. Devens Medical Facility due to health issues. The execution of the Judgment is stayed until 10/22/2015. The government shall provide the Court, with a copy to defense counsel, a report as to where the defendant has been designated. The defendant is notified of his right to appeal and released on previously imposed conditions. If the defendant has been designated to an acceptable facility to address his medical concerns, he shall self report to the place of confinement on 10/22/2015. (Attorneys present: Ausa Heymann, Defense Counsel Gormley, US Probation Officer Mullen. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Filing by Sanford Meekins (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Letter from Michael S. Katcher, MD)(Gormley, George) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Sanford Meekins (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-A1, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit E)(Gormley, George) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Attorney Change of Address by Sanford Meekins (Gormley, George) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 13 Motion to Continue as to Sanford Meekins (1). Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 9/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  First RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sanford Meekins re 13 MOTION to Continue Final Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (Heymann, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION to Continue Final Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing as to Sanford Meekins. (Gormley, George) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT of Ellen Cole by Sanford Meekins (Gormley, George) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Sanford Meekins. Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 7/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING as to Sanford Meekins. Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release reset for 6/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Sanford Meekins. Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 6/29/2015 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Summons Issued as to Sanford Meekins. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Stephen P. Heymann appearing for USA. (Heymann, Stephen) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/5/2015) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Sanford Meekins; Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION as to Sanford Meekins. Received certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from District of New Hampshire (Attachments: # 1 docket, # 2 judgment, # 3 indictment)(Smith3, Dianne) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Probation/Supervised Release transfer order received from District of New Hampshire as to Sanford Meekins...signed by Chief Judge Saris on 1/28/2014... (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?