PRINGLE v. MERCK & CO., INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-01152
District Judge Stanley R. Chesler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2017 at 11:56 PM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DORIS STAEHR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Allen Lemmon +1 985 783 6789 +1 985 783 1333 andrew@lemmonlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr. +1 800 695 6750 +1 800 922 4851 jwhatley@whatleykallas.com
No Logo FRANK PRINGLE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED HUGH PALMER LAMBERT +1 504 581 1750
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CARLENE RHODES LEWIS +1 713 650 0022
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Mark Whitehead, III +1 337 740 6006 +1 337 740 6006 cmw@whiteheadfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo HALPERT ENTERPRISES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Allen Lemmon +1 985 783 6789 +1 985 783 1333 andrew@lemmonlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robbins, Brian J. +1 619 702 7350 +1 619 525 3991
No Logo JEROME HABER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LEWIS STEPHEN KAHN +1 504 455 1400 +1 504 455 1498
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEVEN G. SCHULMAN +1 212 594 5300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Mark Whitehead, III +1 337 740 6006 +1 337 740 6006 cmw@whiteheadfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo MARC NATHANSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LEWIS STEPHEN KAHN +1 504 455 1400 +1 504 455 1498
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEVEN G. SCHULMAN +1 212 594 5300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Mark Whitehead, III +1 337 740 6006 +1 337 740 6006 cmw@whiteheadfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo RICHARD REYNOLDS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LEWIS STEPHEN KAHN +1 504 455 1400 +1 504 455 1498
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEVEN G. SCHULMAN +1 212 594 5300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Mark Whitehead, III +1 337 740 6006 +1 337 740 6006 cmw@whiteheadfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo STEVEN LEVAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LEWIS STEPHEN KAHN +1 504 455 1400 +1 504 455 1498
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEVEN G. SCHULMAN +1 212 594 5300
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Mark Whitehead, III +1 337 740 6006 +1 337 740 6006 cmw@whiteheadfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
v.
No Logo EDWARD SCOLNICK, Defendant
No Logo JUDY C. LEWENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Allan Davidson +1 212 837 6585
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C. Stanley +1 504 523 1580 rcs@sfrlawfirm.com
No Logo KENNETH C. FRAZIER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Allan Davidson +1 212 837 6585
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C. Stanley +1 504 523 1580 rcs@sfrlawfirm.com
No Logo MARY M. MCDONALD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Allan Davidson +1 212 837 6585
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C. Stanley +1 504 523 1580 rcs@sfrlawfirm.com
Merck & Company, Inc. Merck & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "MERCK & CO., INC."
Unknown Role, SCHERING PLOUGH CORP

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Allan Davidson +1 212 837 6585
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C. Stanley +1 504 523 1580 rcs@sfrlawfirm.com
No Logo PETER S. KIM, Defendant
No Logo RAYMOND V. GILMARTIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Allan Davidson +1 212 837 6585
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C. Stanley +1 504 523 1580 rcs@sfrlawfirm.com
No Logo RICHARD C. HENRIQUES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Allan Davidson +1 212 837 6585
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C. Stanley +1 504 523 1580 rcs@sfrlawfirm.com
No Logo ALAN G. HEVESI, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ARTHUR N. ABBEY +1 212 889 3700 +1 212 684 5191
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALLISON G. KORT
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT L. REDFEARN +1 504 569 2030
No Logo RHODA KANTER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DEBORAH R. GROSS +1 215 561 3600
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LEWIS STEPHEN KAHN +1 504 455 1400 +1 504 455 1498
No Logo ROBERT MORTENSEN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL E. BECNEL +1 985 536 1186 dbecnel@becnellaw.com
No Logo SEB FONDER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERIC J. O'BELL +1 504 456 8677 +1 504 456 8624

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter transferring case from Eastern District of Louisiana Re: 1 MDL ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Copy of Docket Sheet from ED of Louisiana)(REMAINDER OF FILE TOO VOLUMINOUS TO SCAN - SEE CLERK'S FILE)(ck, ) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MDL PANEL ORDER transferring this case from the USDC, EASTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA. (ms) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 64 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?