Maurer et al v. Colgan Air, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00078
District Judge William M. Skretny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 9, 2016 at 6:54 AM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Plaintiffs Liaison & Hugh M. Russ, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh M. Russ, III +1 716 856 4000 +1 716 849 0349 hruss@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Scott A. Maurer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michel Francis Baumeister +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 mbaumeister@baumeisterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothea M. Capone +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 tcapone@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Theresa A. Maurer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michel Francis Baumeister +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 mbaumeister@baumeisterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothea M. Capone +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 tcapone@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagerty & Brady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 716 856 9443 +1 716 856 0511 mbrady@hagerty-brady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece Alfrey Musat, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
v.
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrance P. Flynn +1 716 200 5050 +1 716 200 5201 tflynn@harrisbeach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2011 Tara Elizabeth Nicola +1 609 520 6028 +1 609 951 0824 tnicola@reedsmith.com
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagerty & Brady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 716 856 9443 +1 716 856 0511 mbrady@hagerty-brady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece Alfrey Musat, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (128) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 1:11-cv-00219-WMS(SG) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 1:11-cv-00219-WMS(SG) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 1:11-cv-00219-WMS(SG) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Settlement and Motion for Under Seal Order of Final Settlement and Distribution by Scott A. Maurer, Theresa A. Maurer (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 1:11-cv-00219-WMS(Capone, Dorothea) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATUS REPORT Joint Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) Modified title on 10/3/2011 (SG). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 501 Motion to Compel; DENYING Continental's request for a cost-sharing order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/24/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  TEXT ORDER - RELATES to ALL CASES The 769 Stipulation is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/23/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STIPULATION re (61 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 71 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 33 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 71 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 52 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 27 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 61 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 27 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 5 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS) MDL Case Management Order to add FlightSafety Inc. to CMO service list by FlightSafety, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Auletta, Hedwig) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 7/13/2011. Damage and liability depositions ongoing. Document production ongoing and completion expected by mid August. ESI continuing. Parties diligent in working through this laborious task. Narrowing of ESI terms productive. Discussions ongoing as to settlement. Court's Decision is still on track for Monday 7/18/2011. An additional status conference is scheduled for 10/5/2011 at 11:30 a.m. before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER adjusting the later-stage discovery deadlines. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/14/11.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 486 Motion for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care; DENYING Defendants' 437 Motion for a Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages (requesting application of Virginia law); GRANTING Plaintiffs' 579 Cross Motion for the Application of New York Law on Punitive Damages. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, U.S.D.C. on 7/18/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases At the February 9, 2011 status conference, counsel requested advance notice of this Court's decision concerning the punitive damages choice-of-law motions to allow for additional settlement efforts. Counsel are hereby advised that this Court's decision resolving each of the pending choice-of-law motions 437 486 579 will be filed on July 18, 2011. The next status conference remains as scheduled for July 13, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/7/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/27/2011. Damage depositions of plaintiffs being conducted. Liability depositions ongoing. Settlements as to several cases being completed/considered. Proposed order to be submitted as to Motion to Compel on non-party County of Erie. ESI terms continue to be narrowed. Plaintiffs request oral argument on all outstanding motions. Court will schedule same if necessary. Counsel to confer as to briefing schedule on 668 Motion to Compel and advise Court. Court directs parties to continue to work expediously. Notice/Conflict issue discussed. CM/ECF errors to be reduced by contacting Suzanne Grunzweig with any and all questions. An additional status conference is scheduled for 7/13/2011 at 11:30 a.m. before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Justin Green. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS -- Relates to All Cases: GRANTING Plaintiffs' 643 Motion to Compel. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/2/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh M. Russ, III on behalf of Hugh M. Russ, III (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00619-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      STATUS REPORT JOINT MEMORANDUM by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 579 MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 4/22/2011 (SG). (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER directing that Pan v. Bombardier, Inc. 1:11-01474 in the Eastern District of New York shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/20/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Mediation Certification by Richard F. GriffinAssociated Cases: 1:10-cv-00034-WMS et al.(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER directing that Kausner et al v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 3:11-00117 in the Middle District of Florida shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel 4/5/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  First MOTION to Compel Requested Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER adjusting the later-stage discovery deadlines. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 4/2/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      First MOTION to Compel Requested Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY/RESPONSE to re (56 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 44 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 31 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 120 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 111 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 88 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 120 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 49 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 128 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 74 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 437 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 58 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 51 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 121 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 119 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (114 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 126 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 110 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 579 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 82 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 66 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 153 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 153 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 101 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 170 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 133 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 91 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 71 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 128 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 82 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 103 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS) MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 579 Choice of Law cross motion is EXTENDED from April 15, 2011, to April 22, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise by Pamela Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00981-WMS et al.(O'Grady, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY/RESPONSE to re (77 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 123 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 74 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 47 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 114 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 30 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 61 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 122 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 103 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 123 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 52 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 69 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 486 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 71 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 54 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 140 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 36 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 77 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ORDER AMENDING 3 Protective Order. This Order is a duplicate of document 613 reentered in order to serve all parties.. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/9/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Defendants' combined reply in further support of its 437 Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages and response to 579 Plaintiffs' Choice of Law cross motion is extended from March 11, 2011, to March 25, 2011. FURTHER, that upon consent of counsel, Defendants' memorandum shall not exceed 25 pages. FURTHER, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 579 Choice of Law cross motion is extended from April 1, 2011, to April 15, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER AMENDING 3 Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.J. on 3/9/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES. Pursuant to the 608 Sitpulation of Dismissal, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, all crossclaims and third-party actions by defendants COLGAN AIR,INC. and PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. against defendants BOMBARDIER, INC. andBOMBARDIER AEROSPACE CORP. be and the same are hereby discontinued and dismissed on the merits, with prejudice and without costs or further recourse to the other, and all crossclaims and counterclaims by BOMBARDIER, INC. and BOMBARDIER AEROSPACECORP. against COLGAN AIR, INC. and PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. be and the same are hereby discontinued and dismissed on the merits, with prejudice and without costs or further recourse to the other. FURTHER, that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate said crossclaims, counterclaims and third-party actions. SO ORDERED. ISSUED by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/9/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER directing that Eckert v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-00189 in the District of Connecticut, Mauer et al v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-00648 in the District of New Jersey, Korczykowski v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-0791 in the Southern District of New York and Safran v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-0908 in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel on 3/2/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STIPULATION re (71 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 41 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 48 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 85 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 134 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 108 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 116 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 118 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 393 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 46 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 55 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 88 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 115 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 77 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) MDL Case Management Order Non-Party Discovery by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 2/9/2011. Court updated as to discovery, ESI (search terms), mediation. Outstanding motions discussed. Schedule set as to 579 Motion. Response due 3/11/2011. Reply due 4/1/2011. Request made as to advance notification of decision date on outstanding punitive damage motion. Bombardier will accept service as discussed. Court schedules further status conference for 4/27/2011 at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter, Jolene Lamphire, Jack W. Hunt & Associates, Inc.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  TEXT ORDER RELATES to ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, THAT upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Defendants' reply in further support of its 486 Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care is extended from February 25, 2011, to March 11, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/16/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re (45 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Sealed Document exhibit 18 (continuation of exhibits to item # 581) (Attachments: # 1 exhibit 19, # 2 exhibit 20, # 3 exhibit 21, # 4 exhibit 22, # 5 exhibit 23, # 6 exhibit 24, # 7 exhibit 25, # 8 exhibit 26, # 9 exhibit 27, # 10 exhibit 28, # 11 exhibit 29, # 12 exhibit 30, # 13 exhibit 31, # 14 exhibit 32, # 15 exhibit 33, # 16 exhibit 34 part 1, # 17 exhibit 34 part 2, # 18 exhibit 35, # 19 exhibit 36)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit 1, # 2 exhibit 2, # 3 exhibit 3, # 4 exhibit 4, # 5 exhibit 5, # 6 exhibit 6, # 7 exhibit 7, # 8 exhibit 8, # 9 exhibit 9, # 10 exhibit 10, # 11 exhibit 11, # 12 exhibit 12, # 13 exhibit 13, # 14 exhibit 14, # 15 exhibit 15, # 16 exhibit 16, # 17 exhibit 17)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            TEXT ORDER RELATES to ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Plaintiffs' 578 Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of 25 Pages is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (62 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (62 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 564 Motion to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/14/2011. (155) in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (123) in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (144) in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (143) in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (143) in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (115) in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (134) in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (114) in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (115) in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (160) in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (117) in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (116) in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (142) in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (100) in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (104) in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (564) in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (107) in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (114) in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (120) in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (91) in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (93) in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (81) in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (77) in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (76) in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (81) in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (72) in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (72) in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS; (56) in case 1:10-cv-00619-WMS; (61) in case 1:10-cv-00755-WMS; (11) in case 1:10-cv-01007-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re (11 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re (564 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order Second Supplemental Affidavit of David J. Harrington by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiffs shall file a response to 564 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order by Friday, January 14, 2011, at noon . This Court will file an Order in the afternoon of January 14, 2011, relative to the upcoming scheduled depositions. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/11/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT re (564 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order Supplemental Affidavit of David J. Harrington by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for responses to 437 Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages and 486 Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care is extended from December 22, 2010, to January 21, 2011. The deadline for replies is extended from January 21, 2010, to February 25, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/16/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 12/9/2010. Decision and Order on outstanding Motions to Remand in five (5) cases to be filed Monday. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Settlement reached as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Stipulation to be filed. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence in January. Schedule set as to 437 486 Motions. Responses due 12/22/2011. Replies due 1/21/2011. Schedule to be worked out as to 501 528 by parties. Court schedules further status conference for 2/9/2011 at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Ken Nolan, Doug Latto, Warren Willinger, Justin Green, Dan Rose, Mike Krzak and James Kreindler appeared by telephone.) (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on Plaintiffs' 501 Motion to Compel. Relates to: All Cases. Response due by 1/14/2011. Reply due by 2/1/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/14/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Exhibits 4-6 and 8 from 504 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 9 and 10 from 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Exhibit 7 re 504 Continuation of Exhibits, re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 11 and 12 re 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 66 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Exhibit 4 re 501 Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Memorandum) by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [504-1]; [504-2]; [504-3]; [504-5]; [505-1]; [505-2]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/2/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [501-5]; [501-6]; [501-7]; [501-9], [501-10], [501-11]; [504-4]; [505-3]; [505-4]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/30/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments:All exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11 , # 4 Exhibit 12 )Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 to strike remaining exhibits(SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: All Exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7 , # 5 Exhibit 8)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibit (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 striking remainder of exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise by Dana Hartman.Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00140-WMS et al.(Rose, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 501 Motion to Compel by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title on 11/29/2010 (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 STRUCK, # 6 Exhibit 5 STRUCK, # 7 Exhibit 6 STRUCK, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 STRUCK, # 10 Exhibit 9 STRUCK, # 11 Exhibit 10 STRUCK, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/6/10, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 10/6/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Agreement reached in principle as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence 10/25/2010. Procedural issues resolved as to depositions. Parties working to resolve disputes as to interrogatories. Progress being made. Court to issue decision as to Protective Order as to Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Court to resolve remand motions. Issues relating to state court cases discussed. Parties to resolve concerns through stipulations. Defendants will be filing Choice of Law motion. Court schedules further status conference for 12/9/2010 at at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE UNEDITED COCKPIT VOICE RECORDER AUDIO RECORDING. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 486 Colgan's Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care. Responses due by 12/22/2010. Replies due by 1/21/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 437 Colgan's Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages. Responses due by 12/10/2010. Replies due by 1/10/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the CD-ROMs containing the downloaded audio files from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder that was provided to this Court for its in camera review shall be manually filed under seal; that Plaintiffs Joint Motion to Compel Production of Recording (Docket No. 286) is GRANTED; that counsel for all parties are directed to confer and submit to this Court by email an appropriate protective order, consistent with 49 U.S.C. § 1154 (a)(4), by Monday, October 25, 2010 and that following this Courts entry of the protective order, copies of the CD-ROMs containing the download from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder will be made available to the parties. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, United States District Court on 10/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Supplement Addendum, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint by All Parties by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER regarding the filing of motions to compromise under seal. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting deadlines for later-stage discovery and trial. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 7/8/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation. One action has settled. Mediation continues in all other cases. Sealing of settlement papers discussed. Court reiterates importance of confidentiality in the mediation process. Attorney Harrington advises that Defendants may be filing Choice of Law motion. Court advises that it issued an Order granting in camera review of the Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Protocol for downloading the recording discussed. Counsel to agree on procedure and provide Court with proposed Order. Court advises it will extend deadline for providing recording by 30 days. Court advises that it will issue separate order if oral argument is needed on Motions to Remand. Counsel update Court on progress of discovery, including ESI. Counsel advise that they are unable to agree on discovery schedule. Court hears limited argument and advises it will issue Scheduling Order. Court schedules further status conference for October 6, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Douglas A. Latto. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING AGREED PROTOCOL FOR TRANSMISSION OF THECVR RECORDER AND DFDR RECORDER AND FOR DOWNLOAD OF THE CVR RECORDING FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to provide a copy of the unedited cockpit voice recorder under seal to the Court for in camera review. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/7/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Mediation Certification by Mary HelenbrookAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS(SG) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Colgan Air, Inc.'s ANSWER to 39 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim of Bombardier by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 34 Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Colgan Air, Inc. by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING THE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI). Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 5/18/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' request to file a reply brief of up to 15 pages in length. Signed by William M. Skretny on 5/10/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY/RESPONSE to re (18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel CVR filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4a, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4b, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY/RESPONSE to re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bombardier, Inc., filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants Colgan Air, Inc., and Pinnacle Airlines Corp.'s oral request for a conference with the Court and Defendants to discuss mediation is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/1/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel, (47 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 28 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 34 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 60 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 68 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 79 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 104 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 294 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 33 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Opposition to Plaintiffs' Committee's Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Tape filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/10, before Chief Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/13/2010. Court APPROVES parties' joint proposed briefing schedule relating to Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder: Response due April 23, 2010; Replies due May 10, 2010. Court instructs counsel to make return dates for future motions "at a date and time to be set by the court," and that the Court will then issue an order setting the briefing schedule. There being no objection, court APPROVES Defendant Bombardier's proposed modification to the confidentiality designation it will use on documents to account for certain technical limitations. Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to make a single, joint presentation to mediators on liability and punitive damages. Court extends the deadline for submission of mediation memos from April 19 to May 3, 2010. Counsel reports that the first mediation is scheduled for May 18, 2010. Court rules that mediation sessions may take place outside the courthouse only if all parties agree to an alternate location. Court strongly encourages counsel to agree on mutually agreeable schedule for depositions. Court and counsel agree that an informal conference regarding the proposed ESI order will facilitate reaching a final order. Informal meeting scheduled for April 21, 2010, at 10 a.m. between counsel and the Court's law clerk and IT representative. Court sets a further status conference for July 8, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Bombardier Defendants' 294 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED. The Bombardier Defendants are deemed to have joined Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder et al. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. (95) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (76) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (79) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00267-WMS; (97) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (66) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (87) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (65) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (67) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (104) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (89) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (47) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (53) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (57) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS; (51) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (294) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (60) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (50) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (68) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (73) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (42) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (43) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (33) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (48) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; (45) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; (46) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; (44) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01087-WMS; (31) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (28) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (34) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (26) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (21) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00140-WMS; (18) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the deadline for completion of the initial mediation session set forth in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to June 30, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/5/2010. (39 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 35 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 37 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 26 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 81 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 55 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 72 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 6 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 21 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 16 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 52 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Recording by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Musat, L.) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder byHugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION signed by Michael S. Krzak, Esq. re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the deadline for submission of the Confidential Mediation Memorandum required in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to April 19, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/15/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. Relates to: ALL CASES.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00267-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Selection of Mediators by Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Xiaojun Pan, Margaret Eckert, Colgan Air, Inc., Rana Beth Lang, John Lang, Rana Lang, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Pamela Jones, Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Jonah Mink, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Kathleen Johnston, FlightSafety, Inc., Tina Siniscalco, Cheryl Borner, FlightSafety International Inc., Justine M. Krasuski, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Karen F. Wielinski, Veneita Reid, Lawrence Korczykowski, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Andy Harel, Michael Monachino, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson, Robert R. Perry, Scott A. Maurer, Theresa A. Maurer, Howard R. Pettys, Dana Hartman, Ann M. Danowski, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Lawrence Korczykowski, Theresa A. Maurer, Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, by agreement of counsel, the deadline for submission of the ESI Plan or Motion for Entry of ESI Plan is March 15, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (ALL)(MEAL) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Patrick Flynn on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 1:09-md-02085-WMS(Flynn, Terrance) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 1/27/2010. Court construes Defendant FlightSafety, Inc.s 174 Motion for Relief from Application of Initial CMO as Motion to Stay, without prejudice. Motions to Stay 174 179 200 granted from the Bench with no objection or opposition. Stay of the CMO is in effect until Motions to Remand are resolved and stay applies only to cases 09-CV-1039, 1040, 1041, 1042, 1087. Court schedules briefing on 191 207 Motions to Remand, with Defendants Joint Response due by February 22, 2010, and Plaintiffs Replies due by March 8, 2010. Oral argument will be scheduled by separate Order, if necessary. Court extends deadline for submission of ESI Plan or Motion for the Court to Enter an ESI Plan, to February 12, 2010. ESI issues discussed. Court acknowledges that deadlines in CMO may need to be adjusted for later-filed cases. Plaintiffs Committee stipulates that it represents ground claimants. Both sides acknowledge that they will make best efforts at rolling discovery. Court introduces four appointed mediators and interview proceedings take place. Court schedules additional status conference for April 13, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Phillip Rimmler. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A. Goldberg on behalf of Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00078-WMS(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AMENDING 10 MDL Initial Case Management Order re Admission of Attorneys, Appearances and Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 12/2/09. (SG) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. (SG) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. (SG) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:09-cv-05854. (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Western New York. (dd, ) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THERESA A. MAURER, SCOTT A. MAURER. CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC. waiver sent on 12/14/2009, answer due 2/12/2010. (CAPONE, DOROTHEA) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THERESA A. MAURER, SCOTT A. MAURER. COLGAN AIR, INC. waiver sent on 12/14/2009, answer due 2/12/2010; PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. waiver sent on 12/14/2009, answer due 2/12/2010. (CAPONE, DOROTHEA) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLGAN AIR, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. HARRINGTON on behalf of COLGAN AIR, INC., PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HARRINGTON, DAVID) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to COLGAN AIR, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *BETH JONIAK* (eaj) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against COLGAN AIR, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 2816163.) JURY DEMANDED., filed by THERESA A. MAURER, SCOTT A. MAURER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eaj) [Transferred from njd on 2/1/2010.] (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?