International Association Of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219 Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Funds, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund v. Airdronic Test & Balance, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-50335

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 5:28 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo International Association Of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219, Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Fund, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HEYL ROYSTER VOELKER & ALLEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jana L Brady +1 815 963 4454 jbrady@heylroyster.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. McClenathan +1 815 963 4454 mmcclenathan@heylroyster.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott George Salemi +1 815 963 4454 ssalemi@heylroyster.com
v.
No Logo Airdronic Test & Balance, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala: Pursuant to notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (sb, ) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: In light of the notice of voluntary dismissal 9, the status hearing previously set for 3/2/2017 is stricken. (yxp, ) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219, Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Fund, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund (McClenathan, Mark) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Status hearing held on 1/26/2017. Plaintiff shall serve the defendant by 2/6/2017. Status hearing set for 3/2/2017 at 9:00 AM. (yxp, ) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219, Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Fund, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund by Mohit Khare (Khare, Mohit) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Iain D. Johnston: Initial status hearing set for 1/26/2017 at 9:00 AM. Parties shall refer to Judge Johnston's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a joint status report by 1/20/2017 as set forth in the Initial Status Conferences procedure. Lead counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear in person at the initial status hearing. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. (yxp, ) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Association Of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219, Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Fund, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund by Scott George Salemi (Salemi, Scott) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Association Of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219, Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Fund, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund by Jana L Brady (Brady, Jana) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Association Of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219, Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Fund, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund by Mark J. McClenathan (McClenathan, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (McClenathan, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT filed by International Association Of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers Local Union No. 219, Sheet Metal Workers Local 219 Trust Fund, SMACNA Northern Illinois Industry Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-12549620. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(McClenathan, Mark)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Airdronic Test & Balance, Inc. (jp, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Frederick J. Kapala and Honorable Iain D. Johnston. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Iain D. Johnston. (pg, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 2 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?