Zamarripa v. Farrakhan
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-03109

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 8, 2019 at 1:33 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Enrique Zamarripa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
Space LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
v.
Sharpton, Alfred Sharpton, Alfred, Defendant
Officially listed as "Al Sharpton"
No Logo Alicia Garza, Defendant
No Logo Black Lives Matter, Defendant
McKesson, DeRay McKesson, DeRay, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deray McKesson"
No Logo George Soros, Defendant
No Logo Johnetta Elzie, Defendant
No Logo Louis Farrakhan, Defendant
No Logo Malik Zulu Shabazz, Defendant
No Logo Nation of Islam, Defendant
No Logo National Action Network, Defendant
No Logo New Black Panthers Party, Defendant
No Logo Opal Tometi, Defendant
No Logo Patrisse Cullors, Defendant
No Logo Rashad Turner, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY filed by Patrisse Cullors, Opal Tometi re: 108 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Gillespie, Hal) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    REPLY filed by Deray McKesson re: 100 MOTION to Set Aside Default and to Dismiss (York, Lauren) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 100 MOTION to Set Aside Default and to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s)) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER re: 106 Opal Tometi and Patrisse Cullors' Special Appearance to Challenge Service of Process and Personal Jurisdiction. Respondent may file a response by 10/15/2018. Movant may file a reply by 10/29/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/25/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Appendix in Support filed by Opal Tometi re 106 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) App 001-002) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Patrisse Cullors, Opal Tometi with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party Patrisse Cullors(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph H Gillespie added to party Opal Tometi(pty:dft) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER re: the 100 Motion to Set Aside Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Respondent may file a response by 10/4/2018. Movant may file a reply by 10/18/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/14/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/18/2018 re: 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Deray Mckesson is hereby CANCELLED pending determination of the 100 Motion to Set Aside Default and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/14/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 98 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P. Gibbens. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/14/2018) (Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Appendix in Support filed by Deray McKesson re 101 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Set Aside and Dismiss (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Deray McKesson re 100 MOTION to Set Aside Default and to Dismiss (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Set Aside Default and to Dismiss filed by Deray McKesson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deray McKesson. (York, Lauren) (Main Document 99 replaced to flatten image on 9/14/2018) (dsr). (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney William P. Gibbens (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9450301) filed by Deray McKesson Attorney Lauren Elisabeth York added to party Deray McKesson(pty:dft) (York, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Supplement to Request to Reschedule Evidentiary Hearing re: 95 Notice (Other), 96 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER: The 95 Plaintiff's Request to Reschedule Evidentiary Hearing currently set for 9/18/2018, at 10:00 a.m. is DENIED. The request states that possible future protests in Dallas in an unrelated matter "raise significant safety concerns" for the plaintiff and counsel, but provides no explanation as to why the unrelated matter might affect the scheduled hearing, or how. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 9/12/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of of Request to Reschedule Evidentiary Hearing filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 91 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting the 92 Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability and Request to Reschedule Evidentiary Hearing. The evidentiary hearing scheduled for 9/7/2018 is hereby RESCHEDULED for 9/18/2018 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1566, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. All parties must confirm their attendance at least two days prior to the hearing by contacting Courtroom Deputy Marie Castaneda at marie_castaneda@txnd.uscourts.gov. Failure to confirm or to attend the hearing without obtaining permission of the Court will result in appropriate sanctions. The plaintiff is ordered to mail a copy this order to McKesson at the address where he was allegedly served, or at his last known address. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/21/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of of Request to Reschedule Evidentiary Hearing filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Order to Show Cause: No later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 8/24/2018, the plaintiff must (1) file a brief describing in detail how the service effected on Black Lives Matter, Opal Tometi, Patrisee Cullors, and New Black Panthers Party complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, (2) show good cause in writing why he has not moved for entry of default and for final default judgment against them, and (3) show good cause in writing why the claims against them should not be dismissed for failing to effect service. If the plaintiff fails to comply with this order, dismissal of this case against these four defendants will be recommended without further notice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/15/2018) (ykp) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING: Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/7/2018 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1566, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. re: 89 MOTION for Default Judgment against Deray McKesson (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/15/2018) (ykp) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Default Judgment against Deray McKesson filed by Enrique Zamarripa with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Deray McKesson (ewd) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set on 08/10/2018. (chmb) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE for pretrial management to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/3/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION Entry of Default filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Court hereby sets this case for a scheduling conference hearing on Friday, 8/10/2018 at 1:00 p.m., at the United States District Court, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, TX 75242. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/25/2018) (ran) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            JUDGMENT: It is ordered and adjudged that Plaintiff Enrique Zamarripa's action against Defendants Louis Farrakhan and the Nation of Islam is dismissed with prejudice. Farrakhan's and the NOI's taxable costs of court, as calculated by the clerk of court, are assessed against Zamarripa. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/6/2018) (rekc) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 67 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/6/2018) (rekc) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE CANCELLING STATUS CONFERENCE. The court has been advised that both plaintiff and defendants request a continuance of the status conference set in this case. The status conference set for 3/28/18 at 1:30 p.m. is CANCELLED and will be reset at a later date. (chmb) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of PENDING JURISDICTIONAL QUESTIONS AND ABILITY TO APPEAR re: 79 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Louis Farrakhan (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AFTER CASE TRANSFER: Status Conference set for 3/28/2018 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/23/2018) (axm) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings per Special Order 3-318. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/8/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 76 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abdul Arif Muhammad. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/8/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8848329) filed by Louis Farrakhan (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order) (Muhammad, Abdul Arif) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing of DVD by Louis Farrakhan re 74 Appendix in Support. (Disk on file in Records Department.) (epm) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Louis Farrakhan re 71 Notice (Other), 67 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Subject Matter and Personal JurisdictionMotion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimFirst MOTION to Dismiss For Insufficient Service of Process, 72 Notice (Other), 70 Response/Objection, Filed based on Plaintiff's Supplemental Exhibit Filings (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REPLY filed by Louis Farrakhan re: 67 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Subject Matter and Personal JurisdictionMotion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimFirst MOTION to Dismiss For Insufficient Service of Process (Muhammad, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing on disk filed by Enrique Zamarripa re 71 NOTICE of Supplemental Exhibit. (Disk on file in records department.) (aaa) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Supplemental Exhibit re: 70 Response/Objection, filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 67 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Subject Matter and Personal JurisdictionMotion to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimFirst MOTION to Dismiss For Insufficient Service of Process (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 66 Status Report Order, (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY - DUPLICATE FILING OF 67 *** First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, First MOTION to Dismiss Insufficient Service of Process () filed by Nation of Islam with Brief/Memorandum in Support.. Party Nation of Islam added.Attorney Michael K Muhammad added to party Nation of Islam(pty:dft) (Muhammad, Michael) Modified on 10/26/2017 (rekc). (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1)(2)(4)(5)(6) and 12(h)(3) filed by Louis Farrakhan and Nation of Islam with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Michael K Muhammad added to party Louis Farrakhan(pty:dft) (Muhammad, Michael). Modified on text to reflect document title 10/26/2017. Modified filers. (rekc). (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/11/2017) (ams) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Garza and Elzie ONLY filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ordered pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Zamarripa must show cause why his claims against Defendants Garza and Elzie should not be dismissed for failing to effect service. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/21/2017) (epm) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: This Order addresses Defendants National Action Network (NAN) and Al Sharptons motion to dismiss 4 ; Defendants NAN and Sharptons motion to consolidate cases 10 ;Defendant George Soross motion to dismiss 30 ; Defendant Rashad Turners motionto dismiss 40 ; and Defendant Rashad Turners motion to strike 51 . The Court denies the motion to consolidate cases, grants the motions to dismiss, and denies the motion to strike. 29 Granting Defendant Malik Zulu Shabazzs motion for leave to file a responsive pleading. Party Malik Zulu Shabazz, Al Sharpton, George Soros, Rashad Turner, National Action Network Terminated (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/20/2017) (svc) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Rashad Turner re: 51 MOTION to Strike 49 Response/Objection portions of the Affidavit of Enrique Zamarripa (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal re: 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Rashad Turner (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Letter to Honorable Godbey filed by George Soros (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Transfer Related Cased filed by George Soros (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Camille L. Stearns Miller is withdrawn as counsel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/2/2017) (ash) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rebecca L. Robertson is withdrawn as counsel. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/2/2017) (ash) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to New Black Panthers Party ; served on 5/17/2017. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 51 MOTION to Strike 49 Response/Objection portions of the Affidavit of Enrique Zamarripa (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Rashad Turner (Robertson, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Flaherty. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/18/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8407376) filed by Rashad Turner (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike 49 Response/Objection portions of the Affidavit of Enrique Zamarripa filed by Rashad Turner (Colburn, Lisa) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Rashad Turner re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss (Colburn, Lisa) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 45 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa C. Colburn. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/28/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Louis Farrakhan ; served on 4/14/2017. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nation of Islam ; served on 4/14/2017. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8371195) filed by Rashad Turner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Lisa Colburn added to party Rashad Turner(pty:dft) (Colburn, Lisa) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 43 Notice (Other) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Letter re: 39 Notice (Other) filed by George Soros (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Rashad Turner re 40 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s) Rashad A. Turner) (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Black Lives Matter, served on 2/22/2017; Patrisse Cullors, served on 11/29/2016; Deray McKesson, served on 11/23/2016; Opal Tometi, served on 11/23/2016. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rashad Turner Attorney Scott Michael Flaherty added to party Rashad Turner(pty:dft) (Flaherty, Scott) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Case Authority filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Camille Stearns Miller filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton (Stearns Miller, Camille) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by George Soros re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant George Soros, and Brief in Support (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Correction of Signature Omission, correcting signature omission in 35 Reply filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton. (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton re: 32 Response/Objection (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 29 MOTION for Leave to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant George Soros, and Brief in Support (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by George Soros re: 26 MOTION to Transfer Related Case and Brief in Support (Childers, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/17/2017 (sss). (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant George Soros, and Brief in Support filed by George Soros with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Malik Zulu Shabazz. (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (twd) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 26 MOTION of Defendant George Soros to Transfer Related Case, and Brief in Support (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by George Soros re 26 MOTION of Defendant George Soros to Transfer Related Case, and Brief in Support (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of Defendant George Soros to Transfer Related Case, and Brief in Support filed by George Soros with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin P. McCallen. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/29/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Hanrahan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/29/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph T. Baio. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/29/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 11 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/20/2017. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/29/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend Time. Answer or responsive pleading due by 1/9/2017. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/28/2016) (chmb) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Court Recusal: Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as 3:16-CV-3109-N. (ash) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by George Soros. (Childers, Jonathan) (Main Document 19 replaced on 12/22/2016) (rekc). (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by George Soros re 17 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by George Soros (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Benjamin P. McCallen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8088547) filed by George Soros (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Andrew Hanrahan (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8088535) filed by George Soros (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joseph T. Baio (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8088526) filed by George Soros (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ryan Childers on behalf of George Soros. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Childers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Enrique Zamarripa re: 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Enrique Zamarripa (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rashad Turner. (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Rashad Turner re 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Rashad Turner (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rashad Turner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kali Alanna Cohn added to party Rashad Turner(pty:dft) (Cohn, Kali) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton re 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Action Network, Al Sharpton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Kevin B Wiggins added to party National Action Network(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin B Wiggins added to party Al Sharpton(pty:dft) (Wiggins, Kevin) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Black Lives Matter, Patrisse Cullors, Johnetta Elzie, Louis Farrakhan, Alicia Garza, Deray McKesson, Nation of Islam, National Action Network, New Black Panthers Party, Malik Zulu Shabazz, Al Sharpton, George Soros, Opal Tometi, Rashad Turner. (sss) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Enrique Zamarripa. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7989051) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***Please Disregard, entered in error*** Civil Case Terminated. (rekc) Modified on 7/9/2018 (axm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?