Clark Armstead v. Martinez et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Mexico District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01209

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 20, 2016 at 12:16 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brenda Cecelia Clark Armstead, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Brenda Cecelia Clark Armstead

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brenda Cecelia Clark Armstead +1 505 342 2800
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Charlie Crist, Respondent
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Respondent
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Doug Ducey, Respondent
No Logo Fertilta Tilman, Respondent
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "George W Bush"
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Respondent
Officially listed as "Hillary Clinton"
No Logo Jeb Bush, Respondent
No Logo John Cornyn, Respondent
No Logo John McCain, Respondent
No Logo Susana Martinez, Respondent
No Logo Ted Cruz, Respondent
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Brenda Cecelia Clark Armstead. (kdh) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of filing (Motion in Response to Filing) by Brenda Cecelia Clark Armstead. (kdh) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge William P Lynch has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a)(1) and (e)(2) review. (kdh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 11/04/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        PETITION against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Cecelia Clark Armstead. (kdh) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 171 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?