Velazquez v. Santiago
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00440
District Judge Dominic J. Squatrito, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 1:49 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alma Velazquez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo John A. Santiago, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of W. Martyn Philpot, Jr., LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc L. Glenn +1 203 624 4666 +1 203 624 5050 lawoffice@philpotlaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc L. Glenn +1 203 624 4666 +1 203 624 5050 lawoffice@philpotlaw.net
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice and without costs. The Clerk is hereby directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 12/3/08. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice and Without Costs by Alma Velazquez.Responses due by 12/23/2008 (Williams, John) Modified on 12/3/2008 to remove special characters (Grady, B.). (Entered: 12/02/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time until January 12, 2008 to respond to defendant's interrogatories and requests for production. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/24/08. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/20/08. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STATUS REPORT by John A. Santiago. (Philpot, W.) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Extension of Time until January 11, 2009 To Respond To Defendant's First Set Of interrogatories And Requests For Production by Alma Velazquez. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STATUS REPORT by Alma Velazquez. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Amended Pleadings Due by 9/30/2008; Discovery Due by 3/31/2009; Dispositive Motions Due by 4/30/2009; Joint Status Report Due by 11/21/2008; Joint Trial Brief Due by 4/30/2009. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/21/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by W. Martyn Philpot, Jr on behalf of John A. Santiago (Philpot, W.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alma Velazquez. John A. Santiago served on 6/3/2008, answer due 6/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons & Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE re 6 Notice, Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by Alma Velazquez. (Williams, John) (Entered: 05/17/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE to COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES ORDERED: Rule 26 Meeting Report is due by 5/22/2008; failure to comply will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 5/12/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) Modified on 5/19/2008 (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Alma Velazquez (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER re: Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/24/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/24/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/24/2008. Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2008 Discovery due by 9/23/2008 Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2008. Signed by Clerk on 3/24/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    COMPLAINT against John A. Santiago ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number NO24100), filed by Alma Velazquez.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?