Ortiz v. Browne
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01522
District Judge Peter C. Dorsey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 1:39 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jessica Ortiz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo John Browne, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Blazi +1 203 596 0600 +1 203 596 7953 blazi.law@sbcglobal.net
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT entered in favor of John Browne against Jessica Ortiz.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2/4/2010. (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    RULING granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 2-4-10. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Memorandum in Opposition re 23 First MOTION for Summary Judgment, 24 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jessica Ortiz. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Abruzzese Deposition, # 3 Plaintiff's Deposition)(Williams, John) (Entered: 08/29/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        First MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Browne.Responses due by 9/1/2009 (Blazi, John) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          First MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Browne.Responses due by 8/31/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit A -affidavit of Lt Browne, # 3 Exhibit B- medical report, # 4 Exhibit C - deposition transcript)(Blazi, John) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement/Status Conference rescheduled to Friday, 8/7/2009, at 11:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before PJO David E. Schancupp. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 20 Motion to Continue Settlement/Status Conference. The conference is rescheduled to Friday, August 7, 2009, at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 7-20-09. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Continue Settlement/Status Conference by Jessica Ortiz. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement/Status Conference set for Friday, 7/24/2009, at 11:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before PJO David E. Schancupp. PLAINTIFF IS TO BE PRESENT. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Follow-up Settlement/Status Conference set for Friday, 7/24/2009, at 11:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before PJO David E. Schancupp. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time until July 17, 2009 complete discovery. Discovery shall be completed by 7/17/09. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 8/16/09. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 5/28/09. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 17, 2009 complete discovery by John Browne. (Blazi, John) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with jury demand by John Browne.(Blazi, John) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement/Status Conference set for Friday, 4/24/2009, at 11:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before PJO David E. Schancupp. See attached calendar for details. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              RULING granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. The case will move forward on Plaintiffs claim for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4-7-09. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Memorandum in Opposition re 11 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jessica Ortiz. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/14/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  First MOTION to Dismiss by John Browne.Responses due by 12/17/2008 (Blazi, John) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER approving and adopting IN PART 9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery is to be completed by 6/2/2009. Dispositive Motions are to be filed on or before 7/2/2009. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11-12-08. (Miller, K.) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time until 11/29/2008 to answer complaint. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/5/08. (Villano, P.) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/29/2008 to answer complaint by John Browne. (Blazi, John) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Blazi on behalf of John Browne (Blazi, John) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Ortiz. John Browne served on 10/20/2008, answer due 11/9/2008. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/2/08. (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 1/2/2009. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2008 Discovery due by 4/3/2009 Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2009. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/08. (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Jessica Ortiz (Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      COMPLAINT against John Browne ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N025694), filed by Jessica Ortiz.(Garguilo, B) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?