Ingram v. Norton
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00598
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 12:36 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo R. Hamisi Ingram, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/02/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly Anne Rommel +1 203 250 2220 +1 203 250 2233 krommel@ctcop.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Andrew M. Norton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Jordano +1 860 808 5160 +1 860 808 5384 joseph.jordano@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maura Murphy-Osborne +1 860 808 5020 +1 860 808 5347 maura.murphyosborne@po.state.ct.us
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER, an order to show cause by July 20, 2009 having been issued on June 29, 2009, Doc. No. 36 to Plaintiff why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, and no filling or response having been docketed, the case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/23/09. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the complaint is dismissed for failure to prosecute. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms.html. Signed by Clerk on 7/24/09. (Jaiman, R.) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 7/20/2009. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/29/09. (Simpson, T.) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE by R. Hamisi Ingram Suggestion of Death (Williams, John) (Entered: 03/07/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly Anne Rommel terminated; granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Andrew M. Norton. The court does not expect any further extensions. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/27/2009. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Extension of Time of various scheduling order dates by Andrew M. Norton.(Murphy-Osborne, Maura) Motion relief, text, and response date Modified on 2/27/2009 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 02/26/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Kelly A. Rommel to Withdraw as Attorney by R. Hamisi Ingram. (Rommel, Kelly) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph A. Jordano terminated. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/16/2008. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Joseph A. Jordano to Withdraw as Attorney for the defendant by Andrew M. Norton. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STATUS REPORT by R. Hamisi Ingram. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Murphy-Osborne on behalf of Andrew M. Norton (Murphy-Osborne, Maura) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry. Motion Hearing re 19 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by R. Hamisi Ingram held before Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/26/2008: denying 19 without prejudice to renew Motion to Disqualify Counsel. 30 minutes.(Court Reporter T. Fidanza.) (Struck, H.) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Rommel on behalf of R. Hamisi Ingram (Rommel, Kelly) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STATUS REPORT by Andrew M. Norton. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              STATUS REPORT by R. Hamisi Ingram. (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/07/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral Argument set for 9/26/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall as to 19 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. (Shultz, B.) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Andrew M. Norton. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time until August 11, 2008 to file response to 19 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/3/2008. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 11, 2008 to File response to plaintiff's motion to disqualify counsel 19 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Andrew M. Norton. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by R. Hamisi Ingram. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/13/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 8, 2008 Discovery Compliance by R. Hamisi Ingram. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/11/08. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 8, 2008 Discovery Compliance by R. Hamisi Ingram. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ORDER granting 8 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/08. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Andrew M. Norton.(Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/1/2009, Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2009, Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2008, Joint Trial Brief due by 4/1/2009. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/9/08. (Candee, D.) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 19, 2008 to File Responsive Pleading 1 Complaint by Andrew M. Norton. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/23/08. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        DISCLOSURE NOTICE: re: Judicial Recusal. Responses should be filed within 20 days of this order. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/21/2008. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          First SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Hamisi Ingram. Andrew M. Norton served on 5/5/2008, answer due 5/25/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons, # 2 Supplement Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until June 19, 2008 to File Responsive Pleading 1 Complaint by Andrew M. Norton. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Security for Costs by Andrew M. Norton. (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Jordano on behalf of Andrew M. Norton (Jordano, Joseph) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  First SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Hamisi Ingram. Andrew M. Norton served on 4/28/2008, answer due 5/18/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summons, # 2 Supplement Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER RE: Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/21/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/21/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 7/21/2008. Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2008 Discovery due by 10/21/2008 Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2008. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2008. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of R. Hamisi Ingram (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Norton ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number NO24359), filed by R. Hamisi Ingram.(Falcone, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?