Harel v. Colgan Air, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00003
District Judge William M. Skretny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 11, 2016 at 12:18 AM ST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andy Harel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Timothy Green +1 212 687 8181 +1 212 972 9432 JGreen@kreindler.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Kreindler +1 212 973 3449 +1 212 972 9432 jkreindler@kreindler.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel O. Rose +1 212 687 8181 +1 212 972 9432 drose@kreindler.com
No Logo Plaintiffs Liaison Terrence M. Connors, Plaintiff
No Logo Plaintiffs Liaison & Hugh M. Russ, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh M. Russ, III +1 716 856 4000 +1 716 849 0349 hruss@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagerty & Brady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 716 856 9443 +1 716 856 0511 mbrady@hagerty-brady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece Alfrey Musat, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
v.
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrance P. Flynn +1 716 200 5050 +1 716 200 5201 tflynn@harrisbeach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2011 Tara Elizabeth Nicola +1 609 520 6028 +1 609 951 0824 tnicola@reedsmith.com
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com
No Logo Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. McGrath +1 212 653 8700 +1 212 653 8701 mmcgrath@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagerty & Brady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 716 856 9443 +1 716 856 0511 mbrady@hagerty-brady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece Alfrey Musat, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., ThirdParty Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (332) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 331 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 330 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Sealed Document-Attorney's Affidavit in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 329 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Settlement by Andy Harel.(Green, Justin) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 327 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/2/2014. Counsel report that all remaining cases have settled. Counsel further report that they will consult and propose an omnibus order for the Court's review that will resolve all remaining procedural issues and bring this multi-district litigation to a final conclusion. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(JDK) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 325 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STATUS REPORT by Terrence M. Connors. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re (300 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Thomas M. McNish, M.D., M.P.H., and to Strike His Supplemental Expert Report filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Thomas M. McNish Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibits A to C Filed Under Seal, # 3 Memorandum of Law Filed Under Seal, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Telephonic Settlement Hearing held on 3/27/2014 in the Harel v. Colgan Air, 10-CV-00003S. APPEARANCES: James P. Kreinder for Plaintiff; Plaintiff Andy Harel; Neil Goldberg for Defendants. (FTR GOLD) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: ALL CASES      IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the request to extend the briefing schedule for Defendant Colgan/Pinnacle's 1275 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED.      IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant Colgan/Pinnacle's 1222 Motion in Limine by March 31, 2014. Defendant may file a reply by April 11, 2014.      SO ORDERED.      Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 320 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Sealed Document-Continued from 1305 Sealed Document, Continued from Sealed Document 1304 , continued from 1303 Sealed Document, continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 319 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Sealed Document-Continued from Sealed Document 1304 , continued from 1303 Sealed Document, continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 318 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Sealed Document-continued from 1303 Sealed Document, continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 317 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Sealed Document-Continued from 1302 Sealed Document, continued from 1301 Sealed Document, Continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 316 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Sealed Document-Continued from 1301 Sealed Document, continued from 1299 Sealed Document, continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 315 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Sealed Document-Continued from 1299 Sealed Document which was continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 314 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Sealed Document-Continued from 1298 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 313 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Settlement Conference held on 3/19/2014 in Neill v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00294S), Perry v. Colgan Air (09-CV-00440S) and Harel v. Colgan Air (10-CV-00003S). APPEARANCES: Anthony J. Colucci, II, Michael J. Keane, Robert A. Clifford and Michael S. Krzak for Plaintiffs Neill and Perry; James P. Kreindler and Justin T. Green for Plaintiff Harel; Oliver K. Beiersdorf, David J. Harrington and Neil A. Goldberg for Defendants. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00294-WMS-JJM, 1:09-cv-00440-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(DAZ) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 311 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 310 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Sealed Document Manually Filed-Exhibit B-DVD to Declaration of Terrence M. Connors re 1279 Motion Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 309 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 308 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 307 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 306 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Sealed Document-Continuation of 1281 (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 304 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Proposed Testimony of Brian J. Smith by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION (1) to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Steven Roberts, or, in the Alternative, (2) to Compel Defendants to Disclose Additional Information Regarding the Animation Program Used by Roberts and (3) to Exclude Roberts's Animations Numbered 12, 15, and 18 by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Compliance with Rule 37(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Nester by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Thomas M. McNish, M.D., M.P.H., and to Strike His Supplemental Expert Report by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Julianne M. Fox by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq. (filed under seal), # 2 Memorandum in Support (filed under seal), # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims for Punitive Damages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Filed under seal), # 3 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 4 Exhibit (Filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 20, # 14 Exhibit 21, # 15 Exhibit 22, # 16 Exhibit 25, # 17 Exhibit 29, # 18 Exhibit 30, # 19 Exhibit 31, # 20 Exhibit 51, # 21 Exhibit 53, # 22 Exhibit 55, # 23 Exhibit 56, # 24 Exhibit 57, # 25 Exhibit 58, # 26 Exhibit 59, # 27 Exhibit 60, # 28 Exhibit 61, # 29 Exhibit 62, # 30 Exhibit 63, # 31 Exhibit 65, # 32 Exhibit 66, # 33 Exhibit 67, # 34 Exhibit 72, # 35 Exhibit 81, # 36 Exhibit 82, # 37 Exhibit 83, # 38 Exhibit 88, # 39 Exhibit 89, # 40 Exhibit 90, # 41 Exhibit 91, # 42 Exhibit 92, # 43 Exhibit 93, # 44 Exhibit 94, # 45 Exhibit 95, # 46 Exhibit 96, # 47 Exhibit 97, # 48 Exhibit 98, # 49 Exhibit 99, # 50 Exhibit 104, # 51 Exhibit 113, # 52 Exhibit 115, # 53 Exhibit 116, # 54 Exhibit 120, # 55 Exhibit 121, # 56 Exhibit 122, # 57 Exhibit 124, # 58 Exhibit 125, # 59 Exhibit 128, # 60 Exhibit 133, # 61 Exhibit 137, # 62 Exhibit 139, # 63 Exhibit 144, # 64 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, the briefing deadlines for dispositive motions are extended. Dispositive motions are due by March 13, 2014; responses are due by April 1, 2014; replies are due by April 8, 2014. SO ORDERED Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/6/2014. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 296 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 295 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 294 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 3 Declaration of Oliver Beiersdorf, # 4 Exhibits 1-10, # 5 Exhibits 11-20, # 6 Exhibits 21-30, # 7 Exhibits 31-40, # 8 Exhibits 41-54, # 9 Declaration of John Marshall, # 10 Exhibit A, # 11 Declaration of Stuart Schofield, # 12 Exhibit A, # 13 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, the briefing deadlines for motions brought pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 509 U.S. 579, 113 S.Ct. 2786, 125 L.Ed.2d 469 (1993), and its progeny, are extended. Daubert motions are due by March 13, 2014; responses are due by April 1, 2014; replies are due by April 8, 2014. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/6/2014. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' 1229 Motion to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendants' memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment is not to exceed 100 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 3/6/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 290 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(SG) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Captain Brian A. Schiff by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A and B (Filed Under Seal, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 288 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 287 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Sealed Document Manually Filed Exhibit B-Disk of Animations re 1234 Motion in Limine Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 286 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Limit the Proffered Expert Testimony of Patricia A. Pacey by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibits B - E filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 284 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Sealed Document manually filed Exhibit B-Disk of Animations re 1233 Motion in Limine Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 283 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Sealed Document Continuation of 1239 (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 281 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued, # 5 document continued, # 6 document continued, # 7 document continued, # 8 document continued, # 9 document continued, # 10 document continued, # 11 document continued, # 12 document continued, # 13 document continued, # 14 document continued, # 15 document continued, # 16 document continued, # 17 document continued, # 18 document continued, # 19 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 280 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 279 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude in Part the Opinions and Testimony of Gregory A. Feith by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Filed Under Seal, # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, B, C (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude in Part the Opinions & Testimony of Captain Barry Schiff by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A & B (Filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E (Filed under seal), # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Prejudicial Animations by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit B (Filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit C (Filed under seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Charles M. Pereira by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Filed under seal), # 2 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed under seal), # 4 Exhibit B (Filed under seal), # 5 Exhibit C (Filed under seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION Joint Motion to Preclude All Opinions of Dr. Joseph Burton and to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Post-Impact Pain and Suffering Claim by Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Neil A. Goldberg filed under seal, # 2 Exhibit A-Z, AA-FF, HH, II, MM filed under seal, # 3 Statement of Undisputed Facts filed under seal, # 4 Memorandum in Support filed under seal, # 5 Exhibit GG, # 6 Exhibit JJ, # 7 Exhibit KK, # 8 Exhibit LL, # 9 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 273 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendant's 1220 Motion to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendant's memorandum of law in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' responsive memorandum of law are not to exceed 45 pages. Defendant's reply memorandum of law is not to exceed 20 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 2/26/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Pinnacle Airlines Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION To Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Maurice Preter by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration in Support, # 3 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa N. Lefland on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Lefland, Marissa) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 268 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 sealed document continued, # 2 sealed document continued, # 3 sealed document continued, # 4 sealed document continued, # 5 sealed document continued, # 6 sealed document continued, # 7 sealed document continued, # 8 sealed document continued, # 9 sealed document continued, # 10 sealed document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    RE-ENTERED TEXT ORDER FOR DOCKETING PURPOSES ONLY - Dkt. 1215 from 09-MD-2085 - TEXT ORDER : As agreed to by the parties at yesterday's chambers conference, by March 7, 2014, each party shall submit to me their previous mediation submissions along with any updated information, and confidential settlement statements containing their "best and final" settlement positions. The parties shall also copy me on any settlement submissions they exchange. Individual settlement conferences will be conducted in half-day (morning/afternoon) sessions during the week of March 17 - 21, 2014. The parties shall attempt to agree among themselves as to the dates for individual conferences during that week, and shall submit their proposals to me by February 26, 2014. For planning purposes, the parties should assume that they must appear in person; however, I may waive this requirement in particular instances for good cause shown, in writing, no later than February 26, 2014. The parties have also agreed that I may conduct ex parte settlement discussions. Notwithstanding these settlement discussions, any deadlines set by Chief Judge Skretny will remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/7/14. (DAZ) (Entered: 02/07/2014) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(DAZ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of the Post-Accident Sabatini Assessments and Underlying Materials by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support (Under Seal), # 2 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A-J (Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants' 1219 Motion to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Defendants' memorandum is not to exceed 50 pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 2/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re (251 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS-JJM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (247 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Order Attachment (Civil-Jury)) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS-JJM et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TEXT MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER This document relates to ALL CASES. Based on the discussion in court on January 29, 2014, concerning the parties' desire to engage in additional mediation, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the remaining individual cases are each REFERRED to the Honorable Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, for mediation proceedings. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/31/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 1/29/2014. Counsel report that an additional state case has settled and that trial in the state case is scheduled for August 2014. Discussion of the parties proposed Pretrial Order held. Court advises that it will grant the same. Discussion of additional mediation held. Court will issue Order concerning whether additional mediation will be with a court mediator or a Magistrate Judge. Court schedules a further status conference for April 2, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Electronic Court Recorder - FTR Gold.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (JDK) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pretrial Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING TIME CHANGE NOTICE. The TIME of the Status Conference scheduled for 1/29/2014 before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge has been MOVED UP to 11:00 AM. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the 1173 briefing deadlines for dispositive motions are likewise applicable to any motions brought pursuant to Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 509 U.S. 579, 113 S.Ct. 2786, 125 L.Ed.2d 469 (1993), and its progeny. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re (338 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 1196 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 325 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 287 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 251 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 356 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 334 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 310 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 334 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS) MOTION for Reconsideration re (247 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' 1196 Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's 1181 Decision and Order is due by January 17, 2014. Plaintiffs' reply is due by February 14, 2014. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 12/10/2013. (MEAL) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/13, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number (716) 332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/23/13, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, Telephone number (716) 332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re (247 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) Order on Motion to Compel, by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Terrence M. Connors, Esq., # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER regarding Trial -- Relates to all cases. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 11/26/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 11/20/2013. Discussion of the parties' 1190 trial proposals held. Court is inclined to accept Plaintiffs' proposal, but reserves decision. Court will issue an Order. Counsel report that discovery is on track and deadlines in CMO should be met. Counsel report that they have reached agreement on producing expert discovery before expert depositions are conducted. Court schedules a further status conference for January 29, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(JDK) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Terrence M. Connors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            DECISION AND ORDER -- Relates to all cases GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Plaintiffs' 842 Motion for an Order Overruling Objections to their Second Request for the Production of Documents and Things; DIRECTING Defendants to provide responsive documents as ordered herein by December 1, 2013. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 11/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -- AMENDED -- RELATES TO ALL CASES. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 10/24/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J: Status Conference held on 10/23/2013. Discussion on March 2014 trial date held. Plaintiffs' position is that the March 2014 trial date should not be adjourned. Defendants' position is that an adjustment to the trial date is required to complete outstanding discovery and anticipated dispositive motions. Court directs counsel to meet and confer about how trial in these cases will likely proceed, including estimate of length. Court advises that it will resolve pending motions forthwith. Court adjourns trial from March 4, 2013, to May 28, 2014, and advises that no further extensions will be granted. Court announces new case management deadlines and advises that a new Case Management Order will be issued. Court denies Defendants' suggestion that Pan matter be placed on a separate track. Court advises that next status on November 20, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. will remain as scheduled. Counsel appearances per attached Attorney Sign-In Sheet. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE -- THIS RELATES TO ALL CASES Counsel shall appear before this Court for a status conference on Wednesday, October 23, 2013, at 1:15 p.m. The parties shall file a Joint Status Memorandum by Monday, October 21, 2013, detailing the parties' positions and the issues to be discussed at the conference. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -- This Document Relates to ALL CASES. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/6/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER -- Relates to ALL CASES DENYING Defendants' 835 Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/23/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that in light of this Court's 1148 decision resolving 949 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, Plaintiffs' 1101 Motion for Leave to Make Additional Submission is MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate 1101 as a pending motion. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 08/20/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 8/21/2013. Counsel report that there are eight cases remaining in the MDL action and six cases in state court, four of which are wrongful death actions. Court directs counsel in Pan to consult and propose a scheduling order relative to Plaintiff's motion filed on August 19, 2013. Court advises that it is working through motions and will have decision by the end of the week on the motion pending at docket number 835 . Counsel reports that mediation efforts are ongoing and that they are actively engaged in discovery and will meet the deadlines in the new Case Management Order. Court confirms that trial is on track for March 2014. Courtroom Technology meeting between the court and counsel to take place at the beginning of next year. Counsel directed to notify the court of their IT requirements. Court schedules further status conference for November 20, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. For the plts. - Terrence Connors; Robert Clifford; Meryl Schwartz. For the defts. - David Harrington (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(JDK) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              RELATES TO ALL CASES. DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 949 Motion for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 8/15/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Substitution of Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 235 Stipulation of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary-as to Bombardier only) by Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 1112 Motion to Resign as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel; RELIEVING Hugh M. Russ, III, of his Liaison Counsel duties, effective July 31, 2013; DIRECTING Plaintiffs to select a new lawyer to serve as Liaison Counsel and file notice of the same by July 31, 2013. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/12/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION signed by Hugh M. Russ, III re (255 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 257 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 280 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 328 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 125 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 317 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 313 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 232 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 305 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 281 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 1112 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 141 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 313 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Withdraw / Resign as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel filed by Hugh M. Russ, III filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw / Resign as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIRMATION re (228 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 277 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 312 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 308 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 1101 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 308 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 121 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 249 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 276 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 251 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 301 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 323 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 137 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS) MOTION Leave to Make Additional Submission re (101 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 282 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 234 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 265 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 267 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00488 filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. Affirmation of David J. Harrington in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Make an Additional Submission filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER as to 1092 Defendants' Motion to Take in Excess of 12 Damages Related Depositions RELATES TO 09-CV-769S IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, responses are due by July 5, 2013, and replies are due by July 12, 2013. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/28/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) Modified on 7/1/2013 to correct the case relationship. (MEAL). Modified on 7/1/2013 (MEAL). (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -- This Document Relates to ALL CASES. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 6/27/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Leave to Make Additional Submission re (101 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 282 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 234 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 265 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 267 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 949 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 85 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 192 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affirmation, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiffs 1086 Motion to Withdraw their 962 Motion to Compel Continental Airlines, Inc. is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the 962 motion as a pending motion on the docket. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 6/24/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw (962 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental to Produce Deposition Witnesses by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. Counsel report that bankruptcy stay has been lifted. Kuklewicz case has settled and 947 motion is moot. Court reinstates the 788 835 842 874 933 936 949 952 962 motions and directs the Clerk of Court to designate them as pending motions on the docket. Counsel report that settlement discussions are ongoing in all pending cases, which include 5 wrongful death actions in state court, 10 wrongful death actions in the MDL, and 1 property action in the MDL. Counsel report that discovery is completed with Defendant Bombardier and remains ongoing with the remaining defendants. Court strongly encourages the parties to resolve outstanding discovery disputes without further judicial intervention and directs counsel to file a submission concerning a proposed briefing schedule on pending motions and an update on mediation efforts by June 12, 2013. Court schedules Jury Selection and Jury Trial to commence on March 4, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. A final status conference will be held on March 3, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel report that trial will take approximately 6 weeks. Court schedules further status conference for August 21, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. For pltfs. Hugh Russ. For the defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady, Oliver Beiersdorf. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. CLERK'S OFFICE TO FOLLOW UP. (CMD) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Amended Joint) by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. Notice of Lift of the Bankruptcy Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 1, 2013, at 11:30 a.m., is ADJOURNED to May 29, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel must file a joint status report by May 27, 2013, identifying the issues to be discussed at the status conference and the parties' respective positions on those issues. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/24/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for March 6, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to May 1, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by March 6, 2013, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT , Joint Status Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for January 16, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to March 6, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by January 16, 2013, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/7/2013. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for October 31, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to January 16, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by October 31, 2012, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/19/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate the motions filed at docket numbers 788 835 842 933 936 947 949 952 962 , subject to full reinstatement without prejudice and without service or costs upon the lifting of the stay. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/14/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Colgan, Pinnacle, Continental, Flight Safety, all Plaintiffs and by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for August 15, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to October 31, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by August 15, 2012 updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. 8/4/2012 Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for August 15, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to October 31, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants must file a written joint status report by May 30, 2012, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 8/4/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Filed Jointly by Non-Debtor Defendants and All Plaintiffs by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc., Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 30, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to August 15, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants shall file a written joint status report by May 30, 2012, updating this Court on the status of the ongoing discovery between them. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/22/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FINDING that the bankruptcy stay extends to all proceedings involving the debtors, which includes motion practice and the scheduling and taking of depositions; EXEMPTING from the stay document discovery, including ESI discovery, between Plaintiffs and the non-debtor defendants; STAYING all other aspects of this litigation pending further order of this Court. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/11/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Filed Jointly by Non-Debtor Defendants Regarding Scope of Bankruptcy Stay by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., FlightSafety, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of 962 Motion to Compel by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified on 4/30/2012 to correct title and terminate as a motion (SG). (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re (86 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 86 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS) Order, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES STAYING case as to Defendants Pinnacle Airlines Corp. and Colgan Air, Inc.; DIRECTING Plaintiffs to file their brief as specified by April 25, 2012; DIRECTING the remaining defendants to file their briefs (or one collective brief) by May 2, 2012. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/17/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/28/12, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 3/28/2012. Counsel update Court on mediation. Plaintiffs' counsel reports that 18 passenger cases remain in this court and 5 in state court. Court grants Bombardier's request to withdraw its 956 Motion to Compel in Prisco based on the settlement of that action, effective upon the Courts approval of the settlement. Mediation is ongoing and more settlements are expected. Counsel updated Court on discovery. Progress is being made with Colgan and Bombardier, slower with Continental. Depositions and document discovery continues but there may be some issues that will require Court intervention. Court strongly encourages counsel to work out discovery disputes in reasonable manner. Court directs Plaintiffs to update their 962 Motion to Compel Continental. Plaintiffs' updated motion due April 17, 2012; Continental's response due May 4, 2012. Plaintiffs will provide additional RFPs to defendants as soon as possible. Plaintiffs may dismiss Bombardier at end of discovery. Counsel for Plaintiffs and Bombardier to meet and confer concerning the disposal of the wreckage. An additional status conference is scheduled for May 30, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. For pltfs. Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) Modified on 4/4/2012to include the date and time of the next status conference. (MEAL). (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Pinnacle Airlines Corp. and Colgan Air, Inc. by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER - RELATES TO ALL CASES DENYING Colgan's 824 Motion for a Protective Order; DENYING Plaintiffs' 874 Cross Motion for Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/31/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY/RESPONSE to re (74 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 101 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 282 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 232 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 213 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 102 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 74 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 77 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 232 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 234 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 215 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 101 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 176 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 243 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 265 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 124 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 267 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 237 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 949 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 85 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 192 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 269 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 150 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 198 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 102 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 94 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 239 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Compel Continental to Produce Deposition Witnesses by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A-B, # 4 Exhibit C-F, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re (74 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1-3, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon agreement of counsel, Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' 949 Motion for Protective Order is due by March 19, 2012, and Defendants' reply, if any, is due by March 26, 2012. Oral argument will be scheduled by this Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/11/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that until such time as Defendants' 949 Motion for Protective Order is briefed by the parties and resolved by this Court, the deposition of Christopher Monteleon is STAYED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/9/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Christopher Monteleon by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - RELATES to: ALL CASES GRANTING Defendants' Colgan Air Inc. and Pinnacle Airlines Corp's 924 Motion for Protective Order as unopposed; PRECLUDING the taking of Charles J. Colgan, Jr's deposition. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.,p>(MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that there being no opposition thereto, the Air Transport Association of America, Inc.'s 892 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file the unredacted amicus brief under seal. Any party wishing to respond to the amicus brief must do so by March 16, 2012. SO ORDERED. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION signed by Hugh M. Russ, III re (65 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Charles J. Colgan, Jr. filed by Hugh M. Russ, III filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER--RELATES TO ALL CASES; IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' 924 Motion for Protective Order shall be filed by February 24, 2012, and Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed by March 2, 2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/13/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 185 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 184 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 document continued, # 2 document continued, # 3 document continued, # 4 document continued)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting the Deposition of Charles J. Colgan, Jr. by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Under Seal, # 2 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B Under Seal, # 5 Exhibit C Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit D Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit E Under Seal, # 8 Exhibit F Under Seal, # 9 Exhibit G Under Seal, # 10 Exhibit H Under Seal, # 11 Exhibit I Under Seal, # 12 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re (232 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 186 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 142 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 180 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 159 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 842 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 93 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 88 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 162 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 37 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 208 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 120 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS) MOTION to Compel document production and overruling defendants' objections filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 179 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Plaintiff's Cross-Motion to Compel Compliance with the Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 179 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER--RELATES TO ALL CASES; IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' 842 Motion to Compel is extended from January 27, 2012, to January 30, 2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY/RESPONSE to re (172 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 225 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 150 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 116 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 84 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 89 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 25 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 205 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 63 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 133 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 203 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 138 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 33 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 835 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order (Under Seal) filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B (Under Seal), # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Harel Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (232 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 186 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 142 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 180 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 159 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 842 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 93 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 88 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 162 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 37 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 208 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 120 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS) MOTION to Compel document production and overruling defendants' objections filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D (Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K (Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America identifying Other Affiliate Southwest Airlines, Other Affiliate Alaska Air Group, Inc, Other Affiliate AMR Corp., Other Affiliate US Airways Group, Inc. for Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(McGrath, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Air Transport Association of America, Inc., d/b/a Airlines for America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of unopposed Motion for Leave to file Brief of Amicus Curiae, # 2 Declaration of Mark E. McGrath in Support of unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae, # 3 Exhibit A Redacted Version of the Amicus Brief, # 4 Exhibit 1 to the Brief, # 5 Exhibit 2 to the Brief, # 6 Exhibit 3 to the Brief)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(McGrath, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY/RESPONSE to re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 179 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order Reply in Further Support & Opposition to Cross-Motion filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 2 Exhibit JJ, # 3 Exhibit KK, # 4 Affidavit of Joe F. Williams, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER--RELATES TO ALL CASES; IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, Defendants' joint response is further support of their 824 Motion for Protective Order and in opposition to Plaintiffs' 874 Cross Motion for Protective Order is due January 27, 2012. FURTHER, that Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 874 Cross Motion for Protective Order, if any, is due by February 3, 2012. Issued by Hon. William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/21/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part, consistent with this Decision and Order, Plaintiffs' 810 Motion to Amend the Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 1/21/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER granting Continental's 844 Motion to Amend its Answers; Answer due within seven days of the entry of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 1/21/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the parties' 886 Joint Proposal for Modification of the CMO is under advisement. The parties are hereby directed to abide by the Joint Proposal unless and until otherwise directed by this Court. If necessary, the proposal will be discussed at the March 28, 2012 status conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/18/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Request for a Modification of the Case Management Order by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re (212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 122 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY/RESPONSE to re (184 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 122 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions, (184 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS) Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, (92 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (90) Declaration,, (91) Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Sealed Documents 877 , 878 and 879 Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document Exhibits continued from 878 Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19, # 4 Exhibit 20, # 5 Exhibit 21, # 6 Exhibit 22, # 7 Exhibit 23, # 8 Exhibit 24, # 9 Exhibit 25, # 10 Exhibit 26 Part 1, # 11 Exhibit 26 Part 2, # 12 Exhibit 26 Part 3, # 13 Exhibit 26 Part 4, # 14 Exhibit 27, # 15 Exhibit 28, # 16 Exhibit 29, # 17 Exhibit 30, # 18 Exhibit 31)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 161 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION signed by Terrence M. Connors re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 179 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order, (874 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) Cross MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ping Wang filed by Ping Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Rule 3.6, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cross MOTION for Protective Order by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Hugh M. Russ, III, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of James P. Kreindler, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER Relates to ALL CASES on Plaintiffs' 842 Motion to Compel. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that by agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/27/2012 and replies are due by 2/10/2012. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 1/7/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 842 Motion to Compel. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/13/2012 and replies are due by 1/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 835 Motion for Protective Order. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/13/2012 and replies are due by 1/30/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 824 Motion for Protective Order. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 1/9/2012 and replies are due by 1/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER -- RELATES TO: All cases. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for December 19, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. is ADJOURNED to March 28, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 12/16/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re (199 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION signed by David Harrington re (150 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 171 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 20 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 38 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 134 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 810 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 79 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 112 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 146 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 219 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 157 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 145 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 84 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 129 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 187 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 198 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS) MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (150 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 171 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 20 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 38 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 134 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 810 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 79 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 112 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 58 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 18 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 146 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 219 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 157 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 145 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 45 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 84 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 199 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 174 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 129 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 187 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 198 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS) MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE Relates to ALL CASES on 844 Motion to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions. By agreement of counsel, responses are due by 12/23/2011 and replies are due by 1/13/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) Modified on 12/12/2011 (MEAL). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 148 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19, # 19 Exhibit 20, # 20 Exhibit 21, # 21 Exhibit 22, # 22 Exhibit 23)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 147 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 146 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) Modified filed date on 12/9/2011 (SG). (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re (175 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 39 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 81 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 147 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 221 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 130 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 175 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 19 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 30 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 202 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 173 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 148 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 47 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 151 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 113 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 824 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 200 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 60 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 201 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order, (172 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 50 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 225 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 150 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 116 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 84 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 89 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 191 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 42 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 25 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 205 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 63 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 204 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 49 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 133 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 203 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 138 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 22 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS, 33 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 835 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL AMENDED TRANSCRIPT Correcting the Proceedings Date to 10/5/11 re 848 Transcript, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/10, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Musat, L.) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re (184 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 95 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 212 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 139 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 161 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 184 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 188 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 160 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 122 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 211 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 178 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 69 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION signed by Oliver Beiersdorf re (844 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit B, # 25 Exhibit C, # 26 Exhibit D, # 27 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers in Certain Actions by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (195 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 232 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 186 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 29 in 1:11-cv-00694-WMS, 156 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 142 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 67 in 1:11-cv-00105-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 210 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 209 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 158 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 180 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 159 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 842 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 93 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 88 in 1:11-cv-00118-WMS, 162 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00124-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00115-WMS, 37 in 1:11-cv-00377-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 53 in 1:11-cv-00117-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00777-WMS, 176 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 208 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 54 in 1:11-cv-00116-WMS, 46 in 1:11-cv-00309-WMS, 182 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 120 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 26 in 1:11-cv-00693-WMS) MOTION to Compel document production and overruling defendants' objections byHugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel document production and overruling defendants' objections by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 134 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Compliance, # 3 Declaration of Brian Hunt, # 4 Declaration of George A. Casey, # 5 Declaration of Jonathan E. DeMay, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K, # 17 Exhibit L, # 18 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DeMay, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' 810 Motion to Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations by December 9, 2011. Plaintiffs may file a reply, if any, by December 16, 2011. The Court will take the motion under advisement without oral argument. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    VIDEO EXHIBITS I, J, K, P and Q ON DVD re 824 Motion for Protective Order by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., manually filed and maintained in Clerk's file.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of David J. Harrington, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Errata L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit GG, # 36 Exhibit HH, # 37 Exhibit II, # 38 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Amend Case Management Order to Remove RFP Limitations re (2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MDL Case Management Order by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-I)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status conference held on 10/5/2011. Counsel update Court on mediation. Twenty of the 45 passenger cases have settled. Court directs counsel in 10cv1007; 11cv105; and 11cv118 to select mediators within 21 days or Court will assign them. Counsel updated Court on discovery. Depositions and document discovery continues but there may be some issues that will require Court intervention. Plaintiffs possible Motion to Compel Colgan to respond to discovery requests discussed. Court advises that formal motion is required. Plaintiffs suggest that possible dismissal against Bombardier has been discussed. Plaintiffs suggest Court consider appointing a Special Master to resolve discovery disputes. Court denies request at this time and directs counsel to bring any legitimate discovery disputes by way of motion. Plaintiffs advise that composition of Plaintiffs Committee may change given the settlements and Court advises counsel to resolve among themselves and then submit amended language for the CMO, if necessary. Bombardier advises that it will file Stipulations to Dismiss duplicative cases. Colgan inquires about inspection of the aircraft wreckage. Plaintiffs will advise Colgan of their position reqarding disposal of the wreckage within two weeks. Court schedules further status conference for 12/19/2011 at 11:30 a.m. in new courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, James Kreindler. For defts. - David Harrington, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Memorandum by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) Modified title on 10/3/2011 (SG). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 501 Motion to Compel; DENYING Continental's request for a cost-sharing order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/24/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER - RELATES to ALL CASES The 769 Stipulation is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/23/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re (61 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 71 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 33 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 71 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 52 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 27 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 61 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 27 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 5 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 2 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS) MDL Case Management Order to add FlightSafety Inc. to CMO service list by FlightSafety, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Auletta, Hedwig) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 7/13/2011. Damage and liability depositions ongoing. Document production ongoing and completion expected by mid August. ESI continuing. Parties diligent in working through this laborious task. Narrowing of ESI terms productive. Discussions ongoing as to settlement. Court's Decision is still on track for Monday 7/18/2011. An additional status conference is scheduled for 10/5/2011 at 11:30 a.m. before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER adjusting the later-stage discovery deadlines. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/14/11.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 486 Motion for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care; DENYING Defendants' 437 Motion for a Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages (requesting application of Virginia law); GRANTING Plaintiffs' 579 Cross Motion for the Application of New York Law on Punitive Damages. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, U.S.D.C. on 7/18/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memorandum by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases At the February 9, 2011 status conference, counsel requested advance notice of this Court's decision concerning the punitive damages choice-of-law motions to allow for additional settlement efforts. Counsel are hereby advised that this Court's decision resolving each of the pending choice-of-law motions 437 486 579 will be filed on July 18, 2011. The next status conference remains as scheduled for July 13, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 6/7/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/27/2011. Damage depositions of plaintiffs being conducted. Liability depositions ongoing. Settlements as to several cases being completed/considered. Proposed order to be submitted as to Motion to Compel on non-party County of Erie. ESI terms continue to be narrowed. Plaintiffs request oral argument on all outstanding motions. Court will schedule same if necessary. Counsel to confer as to briefing schedule on 668 Motion to Compel and advise Court. Court directs parties to continue to work expediously. Notice/Conflict issue discussed. CM/ECF errors to be reduced by contacting Suzanne Grunzweig with any and all questions. An additional status conference is scheduled for 7/13/2011 at 11:30 a.m. before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Justin Green. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS -- Relates to All Cases: GRANTING Plaintiffs' 643 Motion to Compel. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/2/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh M. Russ, III on behalf of Hugh M. Russ, III (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00619-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT JOINT MEMORANDUM by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 579 MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 4/22/2011 (SG). (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER directing that Pan v. Bombardier, Inc. 1:11-01474 in the Eastern District of New York shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/20/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mediation Certification by Richard F. GriffinAssociated Cases: 1:10-cv-00034-WMS et al.(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER directing that Kausner et al v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 3:11-00117 in the Middle District of Florida shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel 4/5/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION to Compel Requested Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER adjusting the later-stage discovery deadlines. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 4/2/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Compel Requested Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY/RESPONSE to re (56 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 44 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 31 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 120 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 111 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 88 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 120 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 49 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 128 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 74 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 437 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 58 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 51 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 121 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 119 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (114 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 126 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 110 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 579 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 82 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 66 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 153 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 153 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 101 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 170 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 133 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 91 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 71 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 128 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 82 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 103 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS) MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 579 Choice of Law cross motion is EXTENDED from April 15, 2011, to April 22, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise by Pamela Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00981-WMS et al.(O'Grady, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY/RESPONSE to re (77 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 123 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 74 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 47 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 114 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 30 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 61 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 122 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 103 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 123 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 52 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 69 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 486 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 71 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 54 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 140 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 36 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 77 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER AMENDING 3 Protective Order. This Order is a duplicate of document 613 reentered in order to serve all parties.. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/9/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Defendants' combined reply in further support of its 437 Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages and response to 579 Plaintiffs' Choice of Law cross motion is extended from March 11, 2011, to March 25, 2011. FURTHER, that upon consent of counsel, Defendants' memorandum shall not exceed 25 pages. FURTHER, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 579 Choice of Law cross motion is extended from April 1, 2011, to April 15, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER AMENDING 3 Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.J. on 3/9/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES. Pursuant to the 608 Sitpulation of Dismissal, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, all crossclaims and third-party actions by defendants COLGAN AIR,INC. and PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. against defendants BOMBARDIER, INC. andBOMBARDIER AEROSPACE CORP. be and the same are hereby discontinued and dismissed on the merits, with prejudice and without costs or further recourse to the other, and all crossclaims and counterclaims by BOMBARDIER, INC. and BOMBARDIER AEROSPACECORP. against COLGAN AIR, INC. and PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. be and the same are hereby discontinued and dismissed on the merits, with prejudice and without costs or further recourse to the other. FURTHER, that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate said crossclaims, counterclaims and third-party actions. SO ORDERED. ISSUED by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/9/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER directing that Eckert v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-00189 in the District of Connecticut, Mauer et al v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-00648 in the District of New Jersey, Korczykowski v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-0791 in the Southern District of New York and Safran v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-0908 in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel on 3/2/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re (71 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 41 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 48 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 85 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 134 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 108 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 116 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 118 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 393 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 46 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 55 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 88 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 115 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 77 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) MDL Case Management Order Non-Party Discovery by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 2/9/2011. Court updated as to discovery, ESI (search terms), mediation. Outstanding motions discussed. Schedule set as to 579 Motion. Response due 3/11/2011. Reply due 4/1/2011. Request made as to advance notification of decision date on outstanding punitive damage motion. Bombardier will accept service as discussed. Court schedules further status conference for 4/27/2011 at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter, Jolene Lamphire, Jack W. Hunt & Associates, Inc.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER RELATES to ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, THAT upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Defendants' reply in further support of its 486 Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care is extended from February 25, 2011, to March 11, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/16/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re (45 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document exhibit 18 (continuation of exhibits to item # 581) (Attachments: # 1 exhibit 19, # 2 exhibit 20, # 3 exhibit 21, # 4 exhibit 22, # 5 exhibit 23, # 6 exhibit 24, # 7 exhibit 25, # 8 exhibit 26, # 9 exhibit 27, # 10 exhibit 28, # 11 exhibit 29, # 12 exhibit 30, # 13 exhibit 31, # 14 exhibit 32, # 15 exhibit 33, # 16 exhibit 34 part 1, # 17 exhibit 34 part 2, # 18 exhibit 35, # 19 exhibit 36)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit 1, # 2 exhibit 2, # 3 exhibit 3, # 4 exhibit 4, # 5 exhibit 5, # 6 exhibit 6, # 7 exhibit 7, # 8 exhibit 8, # 9 exhibit 9, # 10 exhibit 10, # 11 exhibit 11, # 12 exhibit 12, # 13 exhibit 13, # 14 exhibit 14, # 15 exhibit 15, # 16 exhibit 16, # 17 exhibit 17)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER RELATES to ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Plaintiffs' 578 Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of 25 Pages is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (62 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re (62 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 564 Motion to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/14/2011. (155) in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (123) in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (144) in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (143) in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (143) in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (115) in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (134) in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (114) in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (115) in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (160) in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (117) in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (116) in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (142) in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (100) in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (104) in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (564) in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (107) in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (114) in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (120) in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (91) in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (93) in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (81) in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (77) in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (76) in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (81) in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (72) in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (72) in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS; (56) in case 1:10-cv-00619-WMS; (61) in case 1:10-cv-00755-WMS; (11) in case 1:10-cv-01007-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re (11 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT re (564 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order Second Supplemental Affidavit of David J. Harrington by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiffs shall file a response to 564 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order by Friday, January 14, 2011, at noon . This Court will file an Order in the afternoon of January 14, 2011, relative to the upcoming scheduled depositions. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/11/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT re (564 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order Supplemental Affidavit of David J. Harrington by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for responses to 437 Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages and 486 Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care is extended from December 22, 2010, to January 21, 2011. The deadline for replies is extended from January 21, 2010, to February 25, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/16/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 12/9/2010. Decision and Order on outstanding Motions to Remand in five (5) cases to be filed Monday. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Settlement reached as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Stipulation to be filed. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence in January. Schedule set as to 437 486 Motions. Responses due 12/22/2011. Replies due 1/21/2011. Schedule to be worked out as to 501 528 by parties. Court schedules further status conference for 2/9/2011 at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Ken Nolan, Doug Latto, Warren Willinger, Justin Green, Dan Rose, Mike Krzak and James Kreindler appeared by telephone.) (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on Plaintiffs' 501 Motion to Compel. Relates to: All Cases. Response due by 1/14/2011. Reply due by 2/1/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/14/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 72 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document-Exhibits 4-6 and 8 from 504 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 9 and 10 from 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document-Exhibit 7 re 504 Continuation of Exhibits, re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 11 and 12 re 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document-Exhibit 4 re 501 Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Memorandum) by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [504-1]; [504-2]; [504-3]; [504-5]; [505-1]; [505-2]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/2/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [501-5]; [501-6]; [501-7]; [501-9], [501-10], [501-11]; [504-4]; [505-3]; [505-4]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/30/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments:All exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11 , # 4 Exhibit 12 )Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 to strike remaining exhibits(SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: All Exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7 , # 5 Exhibit 8)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibit (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 striking remainder of exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise by Dana Hartman.Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00140-WMS et al.(Rose, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 501 Motion to Compel by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title on 11/29/2010 (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 STRUCK, # 6 Exhibit 5 STRUCK, # 7 Exhibit 6 STRUCK, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 STRUCK, # 10 Exhibit 9 STRUCK, # 11 Exhibit 10 STRUCK, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by James P. Kreindler Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Kreindler, James) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/6/10, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 10/6/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Agreement reached in principle as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence 10/25/2010. Procedural issues resolved as to depositions. Parties working to resolve disputes as to interrogatories. Progress being made. Court to issue decision as to Protective Order as to Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Court to resolve remand motions. Issues relating to state court cases discussed. Parties to resolve concerns through stipulations. Defendants will be filing Choice of Law motion. Court schedules further status conference for 12/9/2010 at at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin T. Green (Green, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE UNEDITED COCKPIT VOICE RECORDER AUDIO RECORDING. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 486 Colgan's Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care. Responses due by 12/22/2010. Replies due by 1/21/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 437 Colgan's Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages. Responses due by 12/10/2010. Replies due by 1/10/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the CD-ROMs containing the downloaded audio files from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder that was provided to this Court for its in camera review shall be manually filed under seal; that Plaintiffs Joint Motion to Compel Production of Recording (Docket No. 286) is GRANTED; that counsel for all parties are directed to confer and submit to this Court by email an appropriate protective order, consistent with 49 U.S.C. § 1154 (a)(4), by Monday, October 25, 2010 and that following this Courts entry of the protective order, copies of the CD-ROMs containing the download from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder will be made available to the parties. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, United States District Court on 10/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Supplement Addendum, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Joint by All Parties by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding the filing of motions to compromise under seal. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting deadlines for later-stage discovery and trial. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 7/8/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation. One action has settled. Mediation continues in all other cases. Sealing of settlement papers discussed. Court reiterates importance of confidentiality in the mediation process. Attorney Harrington advises that Defendants may be filing Choice of Law motion. Court advises that it issued an Order granting in camera review of the Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Protocol for downloading the recording discussed. Counsel to agree on procedure and provide Court with proposed Order. Court advises it will extend deadline for providing recording by 30 days. Court advises that it will issue separate order if oral argument is needed on Motions to Remand. Counsel update Court on progress of discovery, including ESI. Counsel advise that they are unable to agree on discovery schedule. Court hears limited argument and advises it will issue Scheduling Order. Court schedules further status conference for October 6, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Douglas A. Latto. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING AGREED PROTOCOL FOR TRANSMISSION OF THECVR RECORDER AND DFDR RECORDER AND FOR DOWNLOAD OF THE CVR RECORDING FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to provide a copy of the unedited cockpit voice recorder under seal to the Court for in camera review. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/7/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mediation Certification by Krista GottliebAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Gottlieb, Krista) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Colgan Air, Inc.'s ANSWER to 41 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim of Bombardier by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 36 Third Party Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Colgan Air, Inc. by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING THE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI). Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 5/18/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' request to file a reply brief of up to 15 pages in length. Signed by William M. Skretny on 5/10/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY/RESPONSE to re (18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel CVR filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4a, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4b, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY/RESPONSE to re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bombardier, Inc., filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants Colgan Air, Inc., and Pinnacle Airlines Corp.'s oral request for a conference with the Court and Defendants to discuss mediation is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/1/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel, (47 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 28 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 34 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 60 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 68 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 79 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 104 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 294 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 33 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Opposition to Plaintiffs' Committee's Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Tape filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/10, before Chief Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/13/2010. Court APPROVES parties' joint proposed briefing schedule relating to Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder: Response due April 23, 2010; Replies due May 10, 2010. Court instructs counsel to make return dates for future motions "at a date and time to be set by the court," and that the Court will then issue an order setting the briefing schedule. There being no objection, court APPROVES Defendant Bombardier's proposed modification to the confidentiality designation it will use on documents to account for certain technical limitations. Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to make a single, joint presentation to mediators on liability and punitive damages. Court extends the deadline for submission of mediation memos from April 19 to May 3, 2010. Counsel reports that the first mediation is scheduled for May 18, 2010. Court rules that mediation sessions may take place outside the courthouse only if all parties agree to an alternate location. Court strongly encourages counsel to agree on mutually agreeable schedule for depositions. Court and counsel agree that an informal conference regarding the proposed ESI order will facilitate reaching a final order. Informal meeting scheduled for April 21, 2010, at 10 a.m. between counsel and the Court's law clerk and IT representative. Court sets a further status conference for July 8, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Bombardier Defendants' 294 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED. The Bombardier Defendants are deemed to have joined Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder et al. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. (95) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (76) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (79) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00267-WMS; (97) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (66) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (87) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (65) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (67) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (104) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (89) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (47) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (53) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (57) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS; (51) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (294) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (60) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (50) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (68) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (73) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (42) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (43) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (33) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (48) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; (45) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; (46) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; (44) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01087-WMS; (31) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (28) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (34) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (26) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (21) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00140-WMS; (18) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the deadline for completion of the initial mediation session set forth in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to June 30, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/5/2010. (39 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 35 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 37 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 26 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 81 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 55 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 72 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 6 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 21 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 16 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 52 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Recording by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Musat, L.) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder byHugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION signed by Michael S. Krzak, Esq. re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the deadline for submission of the Confidential Mediation Memorandum required in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to April 19, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/15/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. Relates to: ALL CASES.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00267-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Designation of Krista Gottlieb as Mediator in this case.. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/3/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Selection of Mediators by Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Xiaojun Pan, Margaret Eckert, Colgan Air, Inc., Rana Beth Lang, John Lang, Rana Lang, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Pamela Jones, Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Jonah Mink, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Kathleen Johnston, FlightSafety, Inc., Tina Siniscalco, Cheryl Borner, FlightSafety International Inc., Justine M. Krasuski, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Karen F. Wielinski, Veneita Reid, Lawrence Korczykowski, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Andy Harel, Michael Monachino, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson, Robert R. Perry, Scott A. Maurer, Theresa A. Maurer, Howard R. Pettys, Dana Hartman, Ann M. Danowski, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, by agreement of counsel, the deadline for submission of the ESI Plan or Motion for Entry of ESI Plan is March 15, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (ALL)(MEAL) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andy Harel. Pinnacle Airlines Corp. waiver sent on 2/1/2010, answer due 4/2/2010. (Green, Justin) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andy Harel. Continental Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 2/1/2010, answer due 4/2/2010. (Green, Justin) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andy Harel. Colgan Air, Inc. waiver sent on 2/1/2010, answer due 4/2/2010. (Green, Justin) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 1/27/2010. Court construes Defendant FlightSafety, Inc.s 174 Motion for Relief from Application of Initial CMO as Motion to Stay, without prejudice. Motions to Stay 174 179 200 granted from the Bench with no objection or opposition. Stay of the CMO is in effect until Motions to Remand are resolved and stay applies only to cases 09-CV-1039, 1040, 1041, 1042, 1087. Court schedules briefing on 191 207 Motions to Remand, with Defendants Joint Response due by February 22, 2010, and Plaintiffs Replies due by March 8, 2010. Oral argument will be scheduled by separate Order, if necessary. Court extends deadline for submission of ESI Plan or Motion for the Court to Enter an ESI Plan, to February 12, 2010. ESI issues discussed. Court acknowledges that deadlines in CMO may need to be adjusted for later-filed cases. Plaintiffs Committee stipulates that it represents ground claimants. Both sides acknowledge that they will make best efforts at rolling discovery. Court introduces four appointed mediators and interview proceedings take place. Court schedules additional status conference for April 13, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Phillip Rimmler. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT Defendant Bombardier's (32) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of L. Richard Musat is GRANTED. Further, that this admission extends to each of the current and future individual actions filed in this multi-district litigation. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/26/2010. (32) in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (17) in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS;(28) in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (MEAL) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Jonah Mink, Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Robert R. Perry, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Xiaojun Pan, John Lang, Rana Lang, Margaret Eckert, Pamela Jones, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Justine M. Krasuski, Cheryl Borner, Tina Siniscalco, Kathleen Johnston, Karen F. Wielinski, Lawrence Korczykowski, Andy Harel, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Patrick Flynn on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 1:09-md-02085-WMS(Flynn, Terrance) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver K. Beiersdorf on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgan Air, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Airlines Corp for Colgan Air, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Harrington on behalf of Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:10-cv-00003-WMS(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A. Goldberg on behalf of Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 1:09-md-02085-WMS(Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER AMENDING 2 MDL Case Management Order re Admission of Attorneys, Appearances and Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 12/2/09. (SG) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. (SG) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. (SG) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 16127.), filed by Andy Harel.(SG) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?