SilverCreek Mgmnt., et al v. CitiGroup, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-08881
District Judge J. Paul Oetken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 7, 2019 at 6:14 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Partner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott F. Hessell +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 shessell@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene J Frett +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 gfrett@sperling-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lyndon Mitchell Tretter +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 ltretter@wmd-law.com
No Logo Pebble Limited Partneship, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Partner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott F. Hessell +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 shessell@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene J Frett +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 gfrett@sperling-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lyndon Mitchell Tretter +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 ltretter@wmd-law.com
No Logo Silvercreek Ii Limited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Partner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott F. Hessell +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 shessell@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene J Frett +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 gfrett@sperling-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lyndon Mitchell Tretter +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 ltretter@wmd-law.com
No Logo SilverCreek Limited Partnership, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Partner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott F. Hessell +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 shessell@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene J Frett +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 gfrett@sperling-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lyndon Mitchell Tretter +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 ltretter@wmd-law.com
No Logo SilverCreek Management, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Partner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott F. Hessell +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 shessell@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY H. Adam Prussin +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 HAPrussin@Pomlaw.Com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sperling & Slater PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene J Frett +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 gfrett@sperling-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S. Sperling +1 312 641 3200 +1 312 641 6492 bss@sperling-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lyndon Mitchell Tretter +1 212 382 3300 +1 212 382 0050 ltretter@wmd-law.com
v.
No Logo Andersen Co., Defendant
No Logo Andersen LLP, Defendant
No Logo Andersen Worldwide, Societe Cooperative, Defendant
No Logo Andrew S. Fastow, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen-Brazil, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen-Puerto Rico, Defendant
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant
Barclays PLC Barclays PLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Imperial Holly Corp
Unknown Role, Jcg Inc
Unknown Role, Candie's, Inc.
Unknown Role, Eott Energy LLC
No Logo Benjamin S. Neuhasen, Defendant
No Logo C.W. Andrews, Defendant
No Logo Charles A. LeMaistre, Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Harold Korn +1 212 474 1478 dkorn@cravath.com
Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Harold Korn +1 212 474 1478 dkorn@cravath.com
No Logo Danny D. Rudloff, Defendant
No Logo David B. Duncan, Defendant
No Logo David Michael C. Odom, Defendant
No Logo David Stephen Goddard, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Debra A. Cash, Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by The New York Times Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruth Ellen Harlow +1 212 808 2700 +1 212 286 9806 harlowr@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Murray Regis-Hallinan +1 212 903 9267 +1 212 903 9100 hallinanl@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The New York Times Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruth Ellen Harlow +1 212 808 2700 +1 212 286 9806 harlowr@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Murray Regis-Hallinan +1 212 903 9267 +1 212 903 9100 hallinanl@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Donald Dreyfuss, Defendant
No Logo Frank A. Savage, Defendant
No Logo Gary B. Goolsby, Defendant
No Logo Gregory W. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Herbert S. Winoker, Jr., Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "J.P. Morgan Chase & Company"
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc
No Logo James A. Friedlieb, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey K. Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Petrocelli +1 310 553 6700 +1 213 430 6407 dpetrocelli@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Barker +1 310 553 6700 +1 310 246 6779 jbarker@omm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Perry +1 310 246 8458 luyeno@omm.com
No Logo Jerome J. Meyer, Defendant
No Logo Joe H. Foy, Defendant
No Logo John A. Urquhart, Defendant
No Logo John E. Sorrells, Defendant
No Logo JOHN E. STEWART, Defendant
No Logo John H. Duncan, Defendant
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant
No Logo John V. Derrick, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant
No Logo Joseph F. Berardino, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth L. Harrison, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"
Kirkland & Ellis LLP Kirkland & Ellis LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kirkland & Ellis"
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co."
No Logo Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Dongjoon Lee +1 212 848 7297
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C Lewis +1 212 848 8691 +1 646 848 8691 daniel.lewis@shearman.com
No Logo MICHAEL D. JONES, Defendant
No Logo Michael L. Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Michael M. Lowther, Defendant
No Logo Norman P. Blake, Defendant
No Logo Paulo V. Ferraz Periera, Defendant
No Logo Pershing LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Harold Korn +1 212 474 1478 dkorn@cravath.com
No Logo Phillip A. Randall, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant
No Logo Richard A. Causey, Defendant
No Logo Richard B. Buy, Defendant
No Logo Richard R. Petersen, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert K. Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Roger D. Willard, Defendant
No Logo Roman W. McAlindon, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C. Chan, Defendant
No Logo Thomas H. Bauer, Defendant
No Logo Vinson & Elkins LLP, Defendant
No Logo Wendy L. Gramm, Defendant
No Logo William E. Swanson, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331sv
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (131) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 101 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Christopher Lanzalotto to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation).(Lanzalotto, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Expert Disclosure Supplementation addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lyndon M. Tretter dated August 31, 2017. Document filed by SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    FIRST MOTION for C. ROBERT MACE to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Richard A. Causey. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mace, C.) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for C. Robert Mace to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., FIRST MOTION to Add Applicant(s) C. Robert Mace . Document filed by Richard A. Causey. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit)(Mace, C.) Modified on 8/17/2017 (bcu). (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/20/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/20/2017 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/20/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/20/2017 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Scott F. Hessell, Richard W. Clary, Daniel Lewis, Owen C. Pell, Jeffrey A. Barker and C. Robert Mace dated July 14, 2017 re: in response to the Court's June 27, 2017 Order directing the parties to submit a joint letter addressing the next phase of the litigation. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter to the Court by July 14, 2017, addressing each party's proposal for the next phase of the litigation. Counsel for all parties are further directed to appear for a status conference with the Court on July 20, 2017, at 11:30 A.M. The conference will be held in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Court House, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/27/2017) (ama) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Christina Pennisi on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). (Pennisi, Mary) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lanzalotto on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). (Lanzalotto, Christopher) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc..(Pell, Owen) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation).(Hakki, Adam) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Douglas Weedman on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Weedman, Joshua) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Chung on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Chung, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mary Christina Pennisi on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). New Address: Shearman & Sterling LLP, 599 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York, United States 10022-6069, 2128485412. (Pennisi, Mary) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Christina Pennisi on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). (Pennisi, Mary) Modified on 6/22/2017 (db). (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lanzalotto on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). (Lanzalotto, Christopher) Modified on 6/22/2017 (db). (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Ashley E. Berk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13609668. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Declaration of Ashley E. Berk, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berk, Ashley) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. Document filed by Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Perry, Laura) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ordered. Attorney James Dongjoon Lee terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/21/2017) (mro) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between all of the undersigned parties and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firm of White & Case LLP hereby is substituted in place of the law firm of Pepper Hamilton LLP as counsel of record for Defendants Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Alex. Brown Inc. (now known as Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.) in the above-captioned action. Pepper Hamilton LLP, including Ruth E. Harlow and Linda Regis-Hallinan, who have noticed their appearances herein, having been discharged, hereby withdraws as counsel as required by New York Rule of Professional Conduct 1.16(b)(3). PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that all pleadings, notices of hearing, and other filings in this matter should be served upon the following replacement counsel for the Deutsche Bank Defendants: Owen Pell, Scott Hershman, WHITE & CASE LLP, 1221 A venue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020-1095. Telephone: (212) 819-8200 Email: opell@whitecase.com (Attorney Owen C Pell for Deutsche Bank AG, Owen C Pell for Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc. added. Attorney Scott Edward Hershman for Deutsche Bank AG, Scott Edward Hershman for Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc. added. Attorney Ruth Ellen Harlow and Linda Murray Regis-Hallinan terminated.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/20/2017) (jwh) Modified on 4/20/2017 (jwh). (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 75 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JUNE 20, 2017. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Ruth E. Harlow dated 4/18/17. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Pershing LLC.(Harlow, Ruth) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION for James Lee to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation).(Lee, James) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        OPINION AND ORDER: re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115) filed by Merrill Lynch & Co., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, Pershing LLC. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants are directed to file answers to Plaintiffs' remaining claims within 21 days of this Opinion and Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 49. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/31/2017) (ama) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lyndon M. Tretter dated March 15, 2017 re: Response to Joint Letter dated March 2, 2017 re: Supplemental Authority (Doc. 71). Document filed by SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Richard W. Clary dated March 2, 2017 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation), Pershing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order, Lampkin v. UBS Painewebber, Inc (S.D. Tex. Feb. 28, 2017))(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation), Pershing LLC. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Harlow, Ruth) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE 68 Reply Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Harlow, Ruth) Modified on 11/15/2016 (db). (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 65 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. THE FINANCIAL INSTITUTION DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. NO. 49) SHALL NOT EXCEED 42 PAGES. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Richard W. Clary dated November 9, 2016. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation), Pershing LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Scott F. Hessell in Opposition re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115).. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 60 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. DENIED. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Richard W. Clary dated October 5, 2016 re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion (ECF No. 60). Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation), Pershing LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lyndon M. Tretter dated October 5, 2016. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 58 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. THE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' PENDING MOTIONS BY OCTOBER 6, 2016. THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS' REPLY IS ADJOURNED TO NOVEMBER 14, 2016. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lyndon M. Tretter dated September 26, 2016. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 56 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. PLAINTIFFS' LETTER MOTION IS GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for plaintiffs to file and serve their opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lyndon M. Tretter dated August 12, 2016. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER to join re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Jeffrey K. Skilling.(Barker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Linda Regis-Hallinan in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115).. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3 of 3)(Harlow, Ruth) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David H. Korn in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115).. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Pershing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Harlow, Ruth) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). . Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Pershing LLC. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Silvercreek Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (ECF 10-115). Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Pershing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Annexed Third Amended Complaint)(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 47 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' motion for leave to file excess pages is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Richard W. Clary dated July 29, 2016. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Pershing LLC.(Clary, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Perry on behalf of Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Perry, Laura) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Barker on behalf of Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Barker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce S. Sperling on behalf of ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Sperling, Bruce) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott F Hessell on behalf of ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene J. Frett on behalf of ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Frett, Eugene) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Dongjoon Lee on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). (Lee, James) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Craig Lewis on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). (Lewis, Daniel) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (now known as Bank of America Corporation). (Hakki, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 27 Letter, filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Management, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The proposed briefing schedule is hereby adopted. The pending joint motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 10-123) is dismissed as moot. So Ordered. (Motions due by 8/5/2016., Responses due by 9/2/2016, Replies due by 9/23/2016.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/11/2016) (cf) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 30 Motion for Laura P. Uyeno to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 29 Motion for Daniel M. Petrocelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 28 Motion for Jeffrey A. Barker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 26 Motion for Bruce Samuel Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 24 Motion for Scott Forrest Hessell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Laura P. Uyeno to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12518046. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perry, Laura) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Daniel M. Petrocelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12518044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Jeffrey A. Barker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12518041. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey K. Skilling. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barker, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken dated July 8, 2016 re: case status. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Bruce Samuel Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12511586. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sperling, Bruce) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12510808. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Frett, Eugene) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Scott Forrest Hessell to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hessell, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Scott Forrest Hessell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12490807. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Hessell, Scott) Modified on 7/1/2016 (wb). (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. The parties may file a joint status letter on or before July 8, 2016. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/30/2016) (ama) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lyndon M. Tretter dated June 30, 2015. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 19 Letter, filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Management, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike Docket Number 17. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lyndon M. Tretter dated June 27, 2016 re: Removal of Docket Entry No. 17. Document filed by ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc..(Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lyndon Mitchell Tretter on behalf of ONYX Industrial Partners, Limited, Pebble Limited Partneship, SilverCreek II Limited, SilverCreek Limited Partnership, SilverCreek Management, Inc.. (Tretter, Lyndon) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Harold Korn on behalf of Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC. (Korn, David) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard W Clary on behalf of Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Pershing LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc.. (Clary, Richard) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Linda Murray Regis-Hallinan on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Regis-Hallinan, Linda) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ruth Ellen Harlow on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc.. (Harlow, Ruth) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Counsel for the parties in this case are directed to submit a joint letter addressing the status of the action. The letter should be filed on ECF on or before July 6, 2016. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/15/2016) (cf) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Gerard E. Lynch is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (wb). (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MDL REMAND IN: Received certified copy of docket entries and documents numbered 6-191 from the United States District Court - Southern District of Texas. Case Number: 4:03-cv-00815 (MH), MDL Number: 1446, (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Notice, # 3 Order, # 4 Order, # 5 Order, # 6 Motion, # 7 Declaration, # 8 Declaration, # 9 Order, # 10 Order, # 11 Motion, # 12 Order, # 13 Motion, # 14 Motion, # 15 Motion, # 16 Order, # 17 Order, # 18 Order, # 19 Order, # 20 Motion, # 21 Order, # 22 Mail Returned, # 23 Motion, # 24 Order, # 25 Response, # 26 Order, # 27 Motion, # 28 Response, # 29 Response, # 30 Motion, # 31 Letter, # 32 Letter, # 33 Entry of Dismissal, # 34 Order, # 35 Notice, # 36 Motion, # 37 Opinion and Order, # 38 Motion, # 39 Motion, # 40 Notice, # 41 Order, # 42 Motion, # 43 Entry of Dismissal, # 44 Motion, # 45 Order, # 46 Order, # 47 Amended Complaint, # 48 Order, # 49 Order, # 50 Notice, # 51 Motion, # 52 Order, # 53 Motion, # 54 Order, # 55 Order, # 56 Letter, # 57 Motion, # 58 Motion, # 59 Motion, # 60 Order, # 61 Order, # 62 Order, # 63 Final Judgment, # 64 Notice, # 65 Motion, # 66 Order, # 67 Order, # 68 Order, # 69 Letter, # 70 Motion, # 71 Order, # 72 Entry of Dismissal, # 73 Motion, # 74 Motion, # 75 Order, # 76 Order, # 77 Motion, # 78 Order, # 79 Letter, # 80 Motion, # 81 Motion, # 82 Answer, # 83 Declaration, # 84 Response, # 85 Motion, # 86 Stipulation, # 87 Motion, # 88 Order, # 89 Motion, # 90 Order, # 91 Final Judgment, # 92 Order, # 93 Opinion and Order, # 94 Answer, # 95 Motion, # 96 Order, # 97 Motion, # 98 Motion, # 99 Motion, # 100 Order, # 101 Order, # 102 Order, # 103 Motion, # 104 Response, # 105 Response, # 106 Motion, # 107 Order, # 108 Motion, # 109 Reply, # 110 Order, # 111 Notice, # 112 Motion, # 113 Order, # 114 Order, # 115 Order, # 116 Motion, # 117 Order, # 118 Motion, # 119 Order, # 120 Minute Entry, # 121 Scheduling Order, # 122 Answer, # 123 Motion, # 124 Memorandum, # 125 Memorandum, # 126 Memorandum, # 127 Memorandum, # 128 Declaration, # 129 Motion, # 130 answer, # 131 Motion, # 132 Motion, # 133 Amended Scheduling Order, # 134 Response, # 135 Declaration, # 136 Response, # 137 Notice, # 138 Motion, # 139 Order, # 140 Reply, # 141 Reply, # 142 Reply, # 143 Reply, # 144 Reply, # 145 Motion, # 146 Order, # 147 Motion, # 148 Order, # 149 Notice, # 150 Clerk's Notice, # 151 Order, # 152 Status Report, # 153 Motion, # 154 Motion, # 155 Mail Receipt, # 156 Mail Receipt, # 157 Mail Receipt, # 158 Mail Receipt, # 159 Mail Receipt, # 160 Motion, # 161 Order of Dismissal, # 162 Mail Receipt, # 163 Mail Receipt, # 164 Mail Receipt, # 165 Status Report, # 166 Motion, # 167 Motion, # 168 Order, # 169 Order, # 170 Mail Receipt, # 171 Motion, # 172 Mail Receipt, # 173 Mail Receipt, # 174 Mail Receipt, # 175 Mail Receipt, # 176 Order, # 177 Mail Receipt, # 178 Mail Receipt, # 179 Mail Receipt, # 180 Motion, # 181 Motion, # 182 Response, # 183 Notice, # 184 Notice, # 185 Remand Order) (sjo) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL REMAND IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...Pursuant to the order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation dated 06/02/2016, the cases listed in the appendix to this order are hereby remanded to the Transferor Courts (S.D.N.Y.) shown in the appendix subject to the following terms and conditions. (Signed by MDL Panel on 06/02/2016) (sjo) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY. Document filed by Gregory W. Hale(cd, ) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, for mediation . The Plaintiffs and finanacial institutions in the cases listed in exhibit A and Enron Corp. and the Creditors Committee shall submit mediation statements to this Court by hand or overnight mail and exchgange them with each other by e-mail or overnight mail by 08/15/03. The length of the mediation statements shall: 100 pages or less for Lead Plaintiff the Regents of the University of California on behalf of the securities class plaintiff; 100 pages or less for Enron and the Creditors Committee combined; 75 pages or less for the Title plaintiffs; and 50 pages or less for all others. The same parties shall appear for mediation on 09/29-30 and 10/29, 30 and 31, 2003. The mediation sessions shall commence at 9:00 am on those days in this Court's courtroom in White Plains, NY or at such other location as may be Ordered by the Court. The Financial institutioins who were ordered to mediation by Judges Harmon and Gonzalez shall provide to plaintiffs' counsel in the cases in Exhibit A in which they are deft's all insurance policies which may cover claims asserted in those cases by July 25, 2003. SO ORDERED: ( signed by Judge William C. Conner ); Clerk's Office Mailed Copies. (dcr) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by SilverCreek Mgmnt., SilverCreek Ltd., SilverCreek II re: Mediation and Settlement. (dcr) Modified on 10/01/2003 (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring action from the U.S.D.C. (S.D.N.Y.) to the District of Southern Texas. (gmo) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by SilverCreek Mgmnt., SilverCreek Ltd., SilverCreek II, ONYX Industrial, Pebble Limited (Answer due 3/10/03 for John V. Derrick Jr., for Richard B. Buy, for Richard A. Causey, for Herbert S. Winoker Jr., for John Wakeham, for John A. Urquhart, for Frank A. Savage, for Paulo V. Ferraz Periera, for Jerome J. Meyer, for John Mendelsohn, for Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, for Charles A. LeMaistre, for Robert K. Jaedicke, for Kenneth L. Harrison, for Wendy L. Gramm, for Joe H. Foy, for John H. Duncan, for Ronnie C. Chan, for Norman P. Blake, for Robert A. Belfer, for Andrew S. Fastow, for Jeffrey K. Skilling, for Kenneth L. Lay, for Kirkland & Ellis, for Vinson & Elkins, for C.W. Andrews, for Roman W. McAlindon, for Phillip A. Randall, for Danny D. Rudloff, for John E. Sorrells, for Gregory W. Hale, for Michael D. Jones, for Roger D. Willard, for William E. Swanson, for Michael L. Bennett, for John E. Stewart, for Richard R. Petersen, for David Michael C. Odom, for Benjamin S. Neuhasen, for Michael M. Lowther, for Gary B. Goolsby, for David Stephen Goddard Jr., for James A. Friedlieb, for Donald Dreyfuss, for Debra A. Cash, for David B. Duncan, for Thomas H. Bauer, for Joseph F. Berardino, for Arthur Andersen, for Arthur-Andersen, for Andersen LLP, for Arthur-Andersen, for Andersen Co., for Andersen Worldwide, for Merrill Lynch & Co., for Barclay's PLC, for Barclay's Capital, for Deutsche Bank AG, for Deutsche Bank Alex, for Credit Suisse, for J.P. Morgan Chase, for J.P. Morgan Sec., for Bank of America, for CitiGroup, Inc. ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (sb) (Entered: 02/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Case assignment to Judge Gerard E. Lynch . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: H. Adam Prussin, Stanley M. Grossman . (gf) (Entered: 12/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by SilverCreek Mgmnt., SilverCreek Ltd., SilverCreek II, ONYX Industrial, Pebble Limited . (laq) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF SECTION 15 OF THE SECURITIES ACT, VIOLATIONS OF SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT, NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION, FRAUD AND DECEIT, VIOLATION OF SECTION 10(B) AND 20(A) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 455382. (laq) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?