WSI, INC. T/A WASHINGTON STAIR & IRON v. MOXY MISC. METALS, LLC et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02240
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2017 at 8:22 PM EST (7.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo WSI, INC. T/A WASHINGTON STAIR & IRON, Plaintiff

Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
v.
No Logo Federal Insurance Company, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo MOXY MISC. METALS, LLC, 2255
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Rule 26a1 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Rule 26a1 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Rule 26a1 Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Vacate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 25 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?