Kaighn v Trump et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02507-KJM-EFB
District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2017 at 11:03 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gregory R. Kaighn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory R. Kaighn +1 530 363 6987 greg.kaighn@gmail.com
No Logo JANIS KAIGHN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory R. Kaighn +1 530 363 6987 greg.kaighn@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Bell, McAndrew & Hiltachk, Defendant
No Logo Charles H. Bell, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Jr."
No Logo Trump, Eric, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric Trump"
No Logo Trump, Melania, Defendant
Officially listed as "Melania Trump"
No Logo Priebus, Reince, Defendant
Officially listed as "Reince Priebus"
No Logo Republican National Committee, Defendant
No Logo Terry, Martin, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Office Sacramento
Filed 10/20/2016
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Sacramento
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CIVIL
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal (ECF No. 9 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice in its entirety. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 8 ) is DENIED as MOOT and all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED; Case CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Gregory R. Kaighn, Janis Kaighn. (Kaighn, Gregory) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      MOTION to DISMISS by Reince Priebus, Republican National Committee. Attorney Bell, Charles Herbert added. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Bell, Charles)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2016, Entered: 11/13/2016 Notice - Other
        NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS by All Plaintiffs. (Kaighn, Gregory)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: 11/1/2016 Summons Returned Executed
          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Reince Priebus served on 10/28/2016, answer due 11/18/2016. (Kaighn, Gregory)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Summons Returned Executed
            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Republican National Committee served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016. (Kaighn, Gregory)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Statement
              STATEMENT of THE CONFESSION OF DONALD JOHN TRUMP by Plaintiffs Gregory R. Kaighn, Janis Kaighn. (Kaighn, Gregory)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Civil New Case Documents for KJMCourt Filing
                CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order, # (2) Consent Form, # (3) VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Summons
                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Charles H Bell, Bell, McAndrew & Hiltachk, Terry Martin, Reince Priebus, Republican National Committee, Donald Trump, Eric Trump, Melania Trump, Donald Trump, Jr.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory R. Kaighn* * Attorney At Law* *1390 Broadway, Suite B-345* *Placerville, CA 95667*. (Kaminski, H)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Gregory R. Kaighn, Janis Kaighn. Attorney Kaighn, Gregory R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6734377) (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Notice of Related Cases)(Kaighn, Gregory) Modified on 10/20/2016 (Kaminski, H).
                    LREF

                    Space Space

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 258 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?