Forest Grove School District v. Student
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-35552

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2016 at 1:06 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Student’s motion to submit this case on the briefs is granted. This case shall be submitted on the briefs and record, without oral argument, on November 10, 2016, in Portland, Oregon pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 34(a)(2). [10174029] (NT) [Entered: 10/26/2016 09:25 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Student Urgent Motion to submit case on briefs. Date of service: 10/24/2016. [10171783] [14-35552] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 10/24/2016 04:13 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Portland. Filed by Attorney Ms. Elizabeth Louise Polay for Appellant Student. [10167661] [14-35552] (Polay, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/20/2016 01:34 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Portland. Filed by Attorney Mrs. Diane Frost Wiscarson for Appellant Student. [10167652] [14-35552] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 10/20/2016 01:31 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Portland. Filed by Attorney Mr. Joel Eugene Hungerford for Appellee Forest Grove School District. [10165694] [14-35552] (Hungerford, Joel) [Entered: 10/19/2016 12:39 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Portland. Filed by Attorney Ms. Elizabeth Louise Polay for Appellant Student. [10165642] [14-35552] (Polay, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/19/2016 12:04 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Portland. Filed by Attorney Mrs. Diane Frost Wiscarson for Appellant Student. [10165635] [14-35552] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 10/19/2016 12:02 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Portland. Filed by Attorney Mrs. Diane Frost Wiscarson for Appellant Student. [10110188] [14-35552] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 09/01/2016 02:19 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elizabeth L. Polay for Appellant Student. Date of service: 09/01/2016. [10110164] [14-35552] (Polay, Elizabeth) [Entered: 09/01/2016 02:11 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Portland. Filed by Attorney Mr. Joel Eugene Hungerford for Appellee Forest Grove School District. [10110046] [14-35552] (Hungerford, Joel) [Entered: 09/01/2016 01:25 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Student Correspondence: Regarding Availability for Oral Argument. Date of service: 06/27/2016 [10030137] [14-35552] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 06/27/2016 12:33 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Received Appellant Student 4 copies of Exhibit 5157 (sent to records). [9423554] (JFF) [Entered: 02/17/2015 04:02 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JN): Appellant’s unopposed motion for leave to transmit a copy or replication of a physical exhibit is granted. See 9th Cir. R. 27-14. [9392403] (WL) [Entered: 01/22/2015 03:00 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Filed Mediation order: This case is not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [9383681] (MS) [Entered: 01/15/2015 09:43 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Filed clerk order: The reply brief [21] submitted by Student is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9346097] (KT) [Entered: 12/11/2014 02:00 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Student. Date of service: 12/11/2014. [9345350] [14-35552] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 12/11/2014 09:57 AM]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Filed clerk order: The answering brief [16] submitted by Forest Grove School District is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9335151] (TLH) [Entered: 12/03/2014 11:04 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nancy Jane Hungerford for Appellee Forest Grove School District. Date of service: 12/02/2014. [9333701] [14-35552] (Hungerford, Nancy) [Entered: 12/02/2014 01:31 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Forest Grove School District. Date of service: 11/28/2014. [9329914] [14-35552] (Hungerford, Joel) [Entered: 11/28/2014 04:32 PM]
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Received Appellant Student notice of filing excerpts of record Volumes 3-5 under seal. [9301490] (TLH) [Entered: 11/04/2014 03:08 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joel Eugene Hungerford for Appellee Forest Grove School District. Date of service: 10/30/2014. [9296249] [14-35552] (Hungerford, Joel) [Entered: 10/30/2014 02:15 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Received Appellant Student excerpts of record [5] in 5 volumes (Volumes 3-5 UNDER SEAL) and separately bound "Master Index". Deficiencies: notification of filing under seal is required. Notified counsel (see attached notice). [9292980] (TLH) [Entered: 10/28/2014 01:53 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Filed clerk order: The opening brief [5] submitted by Student is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [5] submitted by Student. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9277604] (TLH) [Entered: 10/15/2014 01:33 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Student Unopposed Motion to transmit exhibit. Date of service: 10/08/2014. [9270256] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 10/08/2014 01:10 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Student. Date of service: 10/08/2014. [9270229] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. 10/14/2014 by TL] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 10/08/2014 01:00 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Filed order MEDIATION (MAC): Counsel for appellee shall notify the Circuit Mediator, by email, with a copy served on appellant’s counsel, when this court decides the merits of this appeal. [9199564] (WL) [Entered: 08/11/2014 07:15 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - The court has scheduled a telephone Assessment Conference, 08/05/2014, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Assistant by email at least 72 hours in advance of the scheduled call of any corrections to the list....The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [9168971] (BS) [Entered: 07/15/2014 09:36 AM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Student Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/30/2014. [9151547] (Wiscarson, Diane) [Entered: 06/30/2014 05:22 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/07/2014. Transcript ordered by 07/30/2014. Transcript due 08/29/2014. Appellant Student opening brief due 10/08/2014. Appellee Forest Grove School District answering brief due 11/07/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9151169] (IV) [Entered: 06/30/2014 03:51 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?