Lyudmila Anenkova v. Van Rue Credit Corp
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-3583

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2016 at 12:04 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012436475 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) filed by SUZANNE WHITE, OCR for the date(s) of JULY 20, 2016. Transcripts were filed in the District Court on 10/14/2016. (JC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012435379 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012432494 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part II) filed by SUZANNE WHITE, OCR for date(s) of JULY 20, 2016. (JC)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012423116 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Joan Carr directing transcripts, ordered on 09/30/2016 , to be filed by 11/02/2016. (MLR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012423100 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1) ordering transcript of the proceedings. (MLR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012422998 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Arkady "Eric" Rayz on behalf of Appellant(s) Lyudmila Anenkova. [16-3583] (AR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012420564 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              FOLLOW UP LETTER to Arkady Rayz, Esq. for Lyudmila Anenkova and Gerald D. Wells, III, Esq. for Lyudmila Anenkova requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 10/12/2016. (CJG)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012420167 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Van Ru Credit Corp, filed. (EGO)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012420163 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ethan G. Ostroff on behalf of Appellee(s) Van Ru Credit Corporation. (EGO)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 003012417233 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lyudmila Anenkova, filed. (AR)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 15 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?