Rumbin v. Duncan
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-878

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 13, 2016 at 11:53 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER, dated 08/30/2016, stating that the Appellant's principal brief and any appendix must be filed on or before November 23, 2016, copy to pro se, FILED.[1852783] [16-878] [Entered: 08/30/2016 03:34 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NEW CASE MANAGER, Kryzia Molina, copy to pro se, ASSIGNED.[1849498] [16-878] [Entered: 08/25/2016 03:03 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CAPTION, to correctly reflect party designation in re: this Court's 08/24/2016 Order [70], AMENDED.[1848315] [16-878] [Entered: 08/24/2016 12:38 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION ORDER, denying motion foran appeal [13] filed by Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, by RSP, GEL, FILED. [1848305][70] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 08/24/2016 12:33 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE, Case Status, SENT.[1847231] [16-878] [Entered: 08/23/2016 12:35 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            LETTER, dated 08/09/2016, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, request status, RECEIVED. [1847228] [16-878] [Entered: 08/23/2016 12:34 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE, Case Status, SENT.[1831770] [16-878] [Entered: 08/03/2016 11:12 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, informing Court of proposed due date 12/06/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 07/26/2016 by US mail.[1831768] [16-878] [Entered: 08/03/2016 11:11 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  LETTER, dated 07/26/2016, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, RECEIVED. Service date 07/26/2016 by US mail.[1831766] [16-878] [Entered: 08/03/2016 11:10 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw document [49] filed by Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED. [1817802][56] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 07/18/2016 11:31 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Beth Harris, FILED. Service date 07/18/2016 by US mail.[1817734] [16-878] [Entered: 07/18/2016 11:01 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [52], on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED.[1817573] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:32 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          LETTER, dated 07/13/2016, cover letter for documents received 07/14/2016, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, RECEIVED. Service date 07/14/2016 by US mail.[1817561] [16-878] [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:29 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION, to withdraw document, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED. Service date 06/16/2016 by US mail.[1817543] [16-878] [Entered: 07/18/2016 09:24 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [47], on behalf of Appellee Beth Harris, FILED.[1816957] [16-878] (Copyt to Pro Se)--[Edited 07/15/2016 by HT] [Entered: 07/15/2016 02:08 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CAPTION, to add Beth Harris as Appellee, AMENDED.[1816626] [16-878] [Entered: 07/15/2016 11:12 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Peter R. Rumbin's Motion, to withdraw document & Motion, to extend time, [35], [36] from the docket, FILED.[1813894] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 07/13/2016 08:44 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [39], on behalf of Beth Harris, FILED.[1813374] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 07/12/2016 01:18 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to withdraw document & MOTION, to extend time, [36], [35], on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED.[1796023] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 06/17/2016 10:09 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        LETTER, dated 05/08/2016, cover letter for documents received 06/02/2016, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, RECEIVED. Service date 05/08/2016 by US mail.[1785895] [16-878] [Entered: 06/03/2016 01:47 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED. Service date 05/08/2016 by US mail.[1785890] [16-878] [Entered: 06/03/2016 01:46 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Peter R. Rumbin's Motion for assignment of pro bono counsel, [20] from the docket, FILED.[1781742] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se)--[Edited 05/27/2016 by HT] [Entered: 05/27/2016 01:51 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, [20], on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED.[1756867] [16-878](Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 04/22/2016 04:16 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE, Case Status, SENT.[1754605] [16-878] [Entered: 04/20/2016 01:32 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  LETTER, dated 04/14/2016, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, RECEIVED. Service date 04/14/2016 by US mail.[1754602] [16-878] [Entered: 04/20/2016 01:31 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION, for an appeal, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED. Service date 04/14/2016 by US mail.[1754600] [16-878] [Entered: 04/20/2016 01:30 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED. Service date 04/14/2016 by US mail.[1754599] [16-878] [Entered: 04/20/2016 01:29 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Peter R. Rumbin, FILED. Service date 04/14/2016 by US mail.[1754598] [16-878] [Entered: 04/20/2016 01:29 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER, dated 04/07/2016, dismissing appeal by 04/28/2016, unless Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, submits Form D-P, FILED.[1745225] [16-878] (Copy to Pro Se) [Entered: 04/07/2016 11:54 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Timothy Geithner and Arne Duncan, FILED. Service date 03/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1734815] [16-878] [Entered: 03/23/2016 04:32 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1734190] [16-878] [Entered: 03/23/2016 10:51 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1734187] [16-878] [Entered: 03/23/2016 10:50 AM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/17/2016, RECEIVED.[1734186] [16-878] [Entered: 03/23/2016 10:50 AM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Peter R. Rumbin, FILED. [1734182] [16-878] [Entered: 03/23/2016 10:48 AM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?