Bally Gaming, Inc. v. IGT, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 08-17430

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2016 at 12:40 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (1) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND CADS: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: CADS due by Attorney J. Stephen Peek, Attorney due on 11/03/2008. Designation of RT for Appellant Bally Gaming, Inc. due 11/12/2008. Designation of RT for Appellee IGT due 11/24/2008. Transcript order for Appellant Bally Gaming, Inc. due 12/02/2008. Certificate of record due 12/09/2008. Appellant Bally Gaming, Inc. opening brief due 02/17/2009. Appellee IGT answering brief due 03/19/2009. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (GR) [Entered: 11/06/2008 10:57 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 10 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?