County of Multnomah v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-01246
Magistrate Judge Paul Papak, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2016 at 11:43 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo County of Multnomah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brent L. Crumpton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Lindsey Crumpton +1 205 222 4456 blc@crumptonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by D'Amore Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas D. D'Amore +1 503 222 6333 +1 503 224 1895 tom@damorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A. Kahl +1 503 222 6333 +1 503 224 1895 nick@damorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L Lowell +1 205 314 0500 +1 205 254 1500 clowell@wigginschilds.com
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Burnside +1 202 622 3150 +1 206 757 7016 fredburnside@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. McGrory, Jr. +1 503 241 2300 +1 503 778 5299 johnmcgrory@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Behar +1 305 415 3405 dbehar@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clay Matthew Carlton +1 305 415 3447 +1 305 415 3001 clay.carlton@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Marston, Jr. +1 215 963 5937 +1 215 963 5001 dmarston@morganlewis.com
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Abely +1 617 570 1317 +1 617 523 1231 jabely@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne W. Chan +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 ychan@goodwinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Hefferon ,. +1 202 346 4029 +1 202 346 4444 thefferon@goodwinproctor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Savage, Jr. +1 617 570 1204 +1 617 523 1321 jsavage@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Francis Yenouskas +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 jyenouskas@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pilar C. French +1 503 778 2170 +1 503 778 2200 frenchp@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T. Kiolbasa +1 503 778 2103 +1 503 778 2200 kiolbasab@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Maloney, Jr. +1 503 778 2105 +1 503 778 2200 maloneyr@lanepowell.com
No Logo Citimortgage, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Betts Patterson Mines, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leta E. Gorman +1 503 961 6338 +1 503 961 6339 lgorman@bpmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan Ramis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell D Garrett +1 360 567 3911

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S Comstock +1 312 701 8386 +1 312 701 7711 ccomstock@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P Evans +1 312 701 8205 tevans@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LUCIA NALE +1 312 701 8857 +1 312 701 7711 lnale@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas V Panoff +1 312 701 8821 +1 312 701 7711 tpanoff@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Citizens Bancorp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Saalfeld Griggs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2015 Shannon Raye Martinez +1 503 399 1070 +1 503 371 2927 smartinez@sglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erich M. Paetsch +1 503 399 1070 +1 503 371 2927 epaetsch@sglaw.com
No Logo Everbank Mortgage Company, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ater Wynne, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven K. Blackhurst +1 503 226 1191 +1 503 226 0079 skb@aterwynne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Sandler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Louis +1 202 349 8000 +1 202 349 8080 alouis@buckleysandler.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Phineas Previn +1 202 349 8000 +1 202 349 8080 hfreeman@buckleysandler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/13/2015 Fred Burnside +1 202 622 3150 +1 206 757 7016 fredburnside@dwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/13/2015 Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
No Logo Merscorp Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Burnside +1 202 622 3150 +1 206 757 7016 fredburnside@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. McGrory, Jr. +1 503 241 2300 +1 503 778 5299 johnmcgrory@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Behar +1 305 415 3405 dbehar@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clay Matthew Carlton +1 305 415 3447 +1 305 415 3001 clay.carlton@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Marston, Jr. +1 215 963 5937 +1 215 963 5001 dmarston@morganlewis.com
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Burnside +1 202 622 3150 +1 206 757 7016 fredburnside@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. McGrory, Jr. +1 503 241 2300 +1 503 778 5299 johnmcgrory@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Behar +1 305 415 3405 dbehar@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clay Matthew Carlton +1 305 415 3447 +1 305 415 3001 clay.carlton@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Marston, Jr. +1 215 963 5937 +1 215 963 5001 dmarston@morganlewis.com
No Logo Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B. John Casey +1 503 228 3200 john.casey@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory James Marshall +1 602 382 6000 +1 602 382 6070 gmarshall@swlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy F. Sorenson +1 801 257 1900 asorenson@swlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERICA J. STUTMAN +1 702 784 5200 +1 702 784 5252 estutman@swlaw.com
U.S. Bank, NA U.S. Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Bank National Association"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R Dieseth +1 612 340 7892 +1 612 340 2807 dieseth.paul@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn J Larsen-Bright +1 206 903 8800 larsen.bright.shawn@dorsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Sterner Nelson +1 206 903 8800 +1 206 903 8820 sterner.nelson.amy@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Larkins & Vacura LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William L. Larkins, Jr. +1 503 222 4424 +1 503 827 7600 wlarkins@larkinsvacura.com
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wells Fargo Bank, National Association"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James P. Abely +1 617 570 1317 +1 617 523 1231 jabely@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne W. Chan +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 ychan@goodwinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Hefferon ,. +1 202 346 4029 +1 202 346 4444 thefferon@goodwinproctor.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Savage, Jr. +1 617 570 1204 +1 617 523 1321 jsavage@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Francis Yenouskas +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 jyenouskas@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pilar C. French +1 503 778 2170 +1 503 778 2200 frenchp@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T. Kiolbasa +1 503 778 2103 +1 503 778 2200 kiolbasab@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Maloney, Jr. +1 503 778 2105 +1 503 778 2200 maloneyr@lanepowell.com
No Logo West Coast Bancorp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Saalfeld Griggs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2015 Shannon Raye Martinez +1 503 399 1070 +1 503 371 2927 smartinez@sglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erich M. Paetsch +1 503 399 1070 +1 503 371 2927 epaetsch@sglaw.com
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Sandler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew R Louis +1 202 349 8000 +1 202 349 8080 alouis@buckleysandler.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Phineas Previn +1 202 349 8000 +1 202 349 8080 hfreeman@buckleysandler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Burnside +1 202 622 3150 +1 206 757 7016 fredburnside@dwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
No Logo County of Multnomah, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brent L. Crumpton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Lindsey Crumpton +1 205 222 4456 blc@crumptonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by D'Amore Law Group, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas D. D'Amore +1 503 222 6333 +1 503 224 1895 tom@damorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A. Kahl +1 503 222 6333 +1 503 224 1895 nick@damorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig L Lowell +1 205 314 0500 +1 205 254 1500 clowell@wigginschilds.com
No Logo Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 120 Broadway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Landman +1 212 238 4800 +1 212 238 4848 mlandman@lcbf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindsay Hart Neil & Weigler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alice S. Newlin +1 503 226 7677 +1 503 226 7697 anewlin@lindsayhart.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Navigate Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip A. Rush +1 503 358 1180 +1 360 419 5226 prush@navigatelawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Farrell +1 503 914 2015 +1 503 914 1725 mfarrell@mblglaw.com
No Logo Federal National Mortgage Association, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristina J. Holm +1 503 727 2157 +1 503 346 2157 KJHolm@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cody M. Weston +1 503 727 2000 +1 503 346 2089 cweston@perkinscoie.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (252) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Based on the Joint Stipulations to Dismiss 248 , 249 & 250 , it is Ordered that this action is Dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Pending motions, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 12/21/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Joint Notice of Dismissal of Party Filed by All Plaintiffs (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Joint Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Joint Stipulation To Dismiss With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Joint Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendants Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Joint Motion for Extension of Stay 246 pending the conclusion of mediation. The Stay of this case will remain until 12/21/2015. The parties shall submit a formal Joint Status Report no later than 12/21/2015. (gm) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Joint Motion for Stay (Joint Motion for Two-Week Extension of Stay). Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendants Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Joint Motion for Extension of Stay 244 pending the conclusion of mediation. The Stay of this case will remain until 12/7/2015. The parties shall submit a formal Joint Status Report no later than 12/7/2015. (gm) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint Motion for Stay (Joint Motion for Two-Week Extension of Stay). Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendants Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Joint Motion for Extension of Stay 242 pending the conclusion of mediation. The Stay of this case will remain until 11/23/2015. The parties shall submit a formal Joint Status Report no later than 11/23/2015. (gm) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Joint Motion for Stay (Joint Motion for Two-Week Extension of Stay). Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendants Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Joint Motion for Extension of Stay 240 pending the conclusion of mediation. The Stay of this case will remain until 11/9/2015. The parties shall submit a formal Joint Status Report no later than 11/9/2015. (gm) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Joint Motion for Stay Joint Motion for Two-Week Extension of Stay. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (ONLY): Based on the parties' Stipulation 238 , it is Ordered that all claims and counterclaims in this action between Plaintiff and Defendant U.S. Bank National Association (only) are Dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs. Pending motions as to this defendant, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 10/21/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Joint Stipulation (corrected to include proper PDF attachment) to Dismiss with Prejudice Claims against U.S. Bank National Association by County of Multnomah and Counter Claims Against County of Multnomah by U.S. Bank National Association by County of Multnomah. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Claims Against U.S. Bank National Association by County of Multnomah and Counter Claims Against County of Multnomah by U.S. Bank National Association by County of Multnomah. Filed by County of Multnomah. (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT SUNTRUST MORTGAGE INC. (ONLY): Based on the parties' Stipulation 235 , it is Ordered that this action as to Defendant SunTrust Mortgage Inc. is Dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs. Pending motions as to this defendant, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 10/14/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Stipulation for Dismissal of SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Stutman, Erica) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendants Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Joint Motion for Extension of Stay 233 pending the conclusion of mediation. The Stay of this case will remain until 10/26/2015. The parties shall submit a formal Joint Status Report no later than 10/26/2015. Order: Striking the hearing re: dispositive motions which was set for 10/15/2015 at 9:00AM. The hearing on these motions will be reset at a later date, if necessary. (gm) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint Motion for Stay (Joint Motion for Three-Week Extension of Stay). Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: Granting the parties' Joint Motion for One-Week Extension of Stay 231 . The stay entered by the Court on September 2, 2015 is extended to October 5, 2015. The deadline to file a formal Joint Status Report is extended to October 8, 2015. Ordered on 9/30/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gw) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Joint Motion for Stay (Joint Motion for One-Week Extension of Stay). Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendants Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Joint Motion for Stay 228 pending the conclusion of mediation. The parties shall submit a formal Joint Status Report no later than 10/1/2015. (gm) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on 8/25/2015 before Judge Paul Papak, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 9/11/2015. Redaction Request due 9/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2015. (Shumway, Bonita) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Joint Motion for Stay by Plaintiff County of Multnomah, and Defendants, Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., and WMC Mortgage, LLC as successor in interest to WMC Mortgage Corp.. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Oral Argument held 8/25/15. Order: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Multnomah County Circuit Court 190 will be taken under advisement as of 9/8/2015. Plaintiff, MERS Defendants and Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Association are allowed to file supplemental briefs as specified in open court no later than 9/4/2015. Brent Crumpton; Thomas D'Amore present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John McGrory; Robert Brochin; Philip Rush; Mark Landman (by telephone) present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. (gm) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Notice of Joinder in oppositions of MERS and Freddie Mac to plaintiff's motions to remand and dismiss Filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Reply to MERS' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 28 USC 1367 195 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Reply to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation's Response to Motion to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand 190 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowell, Craig) Modified on 8/18/2015 to correct text to reflect pleading caption (jtj). (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Declaration of Craig Lowell In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to MERS' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 28, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 29, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 30, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 31, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 32, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 33, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 34) (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Reply to MERS' Response to Motion to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand 190 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lowell, Craig) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Steven K. Blackhurst is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Frederick B. Burnside and Gregory A. Chaimov Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Blackhurst, Steven) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Notice of Joinder to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation's Oppositions to Motion to Remand and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Amy F. Sorenson (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: afsorenson. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy F. Sorenson for Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4234740 issued. Signed on 8/11/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice of Joinder in MERS and Freddie Mac oppositions to Plaintiff's Motions to Remand and Dismiss Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Notice of Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition, 209 , Response in Opposition to Motion 211 , Memorandum in Opposition 210 Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, 209 , Response in Opposition to Motion 211 , Memorandum in Opposition 210 .) (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Notice of Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition, 209 , Response in Opposition to Motion 211 Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, 209 , Response in Opposition to Motion 211 .) (Holm, Kristina) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Notice of Joinder in Response in Opposition to Motion 211 Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 211 .) (Stutman, Erica) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Notice of Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition 210 Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition 210 .) (Marshall, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Notice of Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition, 209 Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, 209 .) (Marshall, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand 190 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Rush, Philip) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 28 USC 1367 195 . Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand 190 . Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6-11 Answer, # 2 Exhibit Andrew L. Marmion Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 10-31 Answer) (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy Sorenson . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4234740. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AS TO DEFENDANT U.S, BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION IN ITS CAPACITY AS SECURITIZATION TRUSTEE (ONLY): Based on the notice of settlement 205 filed 8/6/15, it is Ordered that the claims between Plaintiff and Defendant U.S. Bank National Association in its capacity as Securitization Trustee (only) are Dismissed with prejudice and without an award of costs or fees to either party. Signed on 8/10/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (ONLY): Based on the notice of settlement 205 filed 8/6/15, it is Ordered that this action between Plaintiff and Defendant U.S. Bank National Association (only) is Dismissed with prejudice and without an award of costs or fees to either party. Pending motions as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 8/10/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Notice of Settlement and Request for Dismissal Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Larkins, William) Modified to correct event to Motion For Order Of Dismissal on 8/10/2015 (cib). (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Reply to Motion to Strike Paragraph 51 of the Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl 144 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Resetting Defendant Merscorp Holdings' Motion for Summary Judgment 109 , Defendant CitiMortgage's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment 111 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 112 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 114 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 117 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 119 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 122 , Defendant Columbia Bank's (as successor in intersted to West Coast Bank and Citizens Bancorp and Citizens Bank) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 124 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 126 , Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment 128 , Defendant Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment 132 , Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank's Motion to Strike 140 , Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank's Supplement Motion for Summary Judgment 141 , Defendants' Motion to Strike 144 , Defendant WMC Mortgage's Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 146 and Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 195 from 8/25/2015 at 9:00AM to the Oral Argument Calendar of 10/15/2015 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Order: Resetting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Multnomah County Circuit Court 190 from 9:00AM to 10:00AM on 8/25/2015 in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Order: Granting Defendants Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Paragraph 51 of the Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl ( 144 ) 202 . (gm) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Chan, Yvonne) Modified to correct filers on 7/30/2015 (sss). (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Thomas M. Hefferon (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: tmhefferon. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set/reset your password if needed. (sss) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas M. Hefferon for Bank of America, N.A.,Thomas M. Hefferon for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4207088 issued. Signed on 7/28/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Multnomah County Circuit Court 190 and Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 195 on the Oral Argument Calendar of 8/25/2015 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Responses to remand/dismissal motions will be due by 8/10/2015. Replies to responses to remand/dismissal motions will be due by 8/17/2015. (gm) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Response in Opposition to Defendants' to Motion to Strike Paragraph 51 of the Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl 144 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Response In Opposition to JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.'s to Motion to Strike 140 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under 28 USC 1367. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction 195 .) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 28 USC 1367. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Amended Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Second Motion For Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand 190 .) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl In Support of Plaintiffs Second Motion To Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand 190 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Second Motion For Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand 190 .) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Supplement Statement of Facts In Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Remand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand 190 .) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Motion to Remand to State Court Motion to Remand . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibit 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 60 re Declaration 176 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 47, # 2 Exhibit 48, # 3 Exhibit 49, # 4 Exhibit 56, # 5 Exhibit 60) (cib) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibits 34, 45 re Declaration 176 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45) (cib) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibit 23 re Declaration, 176 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (cib) Modified on 7/27/2015 (cib). (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), Exhibit 2 re Declaration, 170 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (cib) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Joseph F. Yenouskas, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. (Corrected to include proper case caption). Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-17, # 2 Exhibits 18-20, # 3 Exhibits 21-29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibits 31-40, # 6 Exhibits 41-53, # 7 Exhibits 54-59, # 8 Exhibit 60-1, # 9 Exhibit 60-2, # 10 Exhibit 60-3, # 11 Exhibit 60-4, # 12 Exhibit 60-5, # 13 Exhibit 60-6, # 14 Exhibit 60-7, # 15 Exhibit 60-8, # 16 Exhibits 61-63) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert M. Jefferson (Corrected to include proper case caption). Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 132 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Brenda J. Giesselmann in Support of Wells Fargo's Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims. (Corrected to include proper case caption). Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 128 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum in Support . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike 140 .) (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Counterclaims - Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. 1 ) . Filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Rush, Philip) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 179 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Notice of Removal, 1 Counterclaim-Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association's Answer to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s Counterclaims. Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, 1 .) (Weston, Cody) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Erica J. Stutman (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: ejstutman. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erica J. Stutman for Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4206045 issued. Signed on 7/22/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl in Support of Plaintiffs Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and ORCP 47 F Declaration. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, 173 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Part A, # 20 Exhibit 19- Part B, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 51, # 51 Exhibit 52, # 52 Exhibit 53, # 53 Exhibit 54, # 54 Exhibit 55, # 55 Exhibit 56, # 56 Exhibit 58, # 57 Exhibit 59, # 58 Exhibit 60, # 59 Exhibit 61 - Part A, # 60 Exhibit 61 - Part B, # 61 Exhibit 62, # 62 Exhibit 63) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 159 is Denied for the reasons as stated to counsel at the Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 7/17/2015. (gm) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Concise Statement of Material Fact Plaintiffs Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 109 .) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Motion for Summary Judgment 109 , Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on 1st and 6th claims for relief and request for atty fees 146 , Motion for Summary Judgment - County's Conduct Bars Its Claims 114 , Motion for Joinder in Certain Defs' partial msj -- vicarious liability 148 , Motion for Summary Judgment - No Damages 117 , Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities - Eighth Claim - Punitive Damages 126 , Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities - Seventh Claim - Declaratory and Injunctive Relief 122 , Motion for Joinder to Defendant Bank of America N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability 121 , Motion for Joinder in Certain Defs' partial msj -- vicarious liability 145 , Motion for Summary Judgment On All Claims I-VI 119 , Motion for Summary Judgment - Ultra Vires Lawsuit 112 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.s Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 171 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Response in Opposition to Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.s to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment 111 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl Kahl in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant Merscorp Holdings, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 169 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Opposition to Defendant Merscorp Holdings, Inc.s to Motion for Summary Judgment 109 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant Bank of America, N.A.S and Wells Fargo, N.A.S Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, 167 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Defendant Bank of America, N.A.s and Wells Fargo, N.A.s to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability 132 , Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Suntrust's Joinder to Bank of America and Wells Fargo's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability 138 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to SunTrust Mortgage Incs Joinder to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, 164 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas M. Hefferon . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4207088. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to SunTrust Mortgage Incs to Motion for Summary Judgment 109 , Motion for Summary Judgment Suntrust's Joinder to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 136 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.s Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 162 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Response in Opposition Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.s to Motion for Summary Judgment On All Claims 128 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl in Support of Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.s Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 160 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.s to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment 141 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (D'Amore, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Counter-Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 155 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 7/23/2015 for Counter-Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (gm) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Philip A. Rush in Support of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and/or Respond to Counterclaim-Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition 155 .) (Rush, Philip) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and/or Respond to Counterclaim-Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Rush, Philip) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erica Stutman . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4206045. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting Defendant Merscorp Holdings' Motion for Summary Judgment 109 , Defendant CitiMortgage's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment 111 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 112 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 114 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 117 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 119 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 122 , Defendant Columbia Bank's (as successor in intersted to West Coast Bank and Citizens Bancorp and Citizens Bank) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 124 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 126 , Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment 128 , Defendant Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment 132 , Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank's Supplement Motion for Summary Judgment 141 , and Defendant WMC Mortgage's Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 146 on the Oral Argument Calendar of 8/25/2015 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Order: Setting Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank's Motion to Strike 140 and Defendants' Motion to Strike 144 on the Oral Argument Calendar of 8/25/2015 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record: The Notices of Joinder 136 & 138 were incorrectly docketed as Motions for Summary Judgment. The docket text for these two entries has been modified accordingly to reflect that these are notices of joinder. (gm) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record: The following Joinders which were docketed in this case as Motions for Joinder 121 , 145 & 148 will be construed as Notices of Joinder and will be addressed along with all other notices of joinder at the oral argument on dispositive motions. (gm) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Participation in Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Multnomah County's Eighth Claim for Relief - Punitive Damages Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice - Letter to Judge Papak regarding Summary Judgment Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Joinder in Certain Defs' partial msj -- vicarious liability. Filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Gregory A. Chaimov . Filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 146 .) (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on 1st and 6th claims for relief and request for atty fees. Oral Argument requested. Filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Joinder in Certain Defs' partial msj -- vicarious liability. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Strike Paragraph 51 of the Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Gregory A. Chaimov . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 141 .) (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Joseph F. Yenouskas, Esq. in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-17, # 2 Exhibits 18-20, # 3 Exhibits 21-29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibits 31-40, # 6 Exhibits 41-53, # 7 Exhibits 54-59, # 8 Exhibit 60-1, # 9 Exhibit 60-2, # 10 Exhibit 60-3, # 11 Exhibit 60-4, # 12 Exhibit 60-5, # 13 Exhibit 60-6, # 14 Exhibit 60-7, # 15 Exhibit 60-8, # 16 Exhibits 61-63) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Strike . Oral Argument requested. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Joinder in Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 132 Filed by Citizens Bancorp, West Coast Bancorp (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 132 .) (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Joinder to Bank of America and Wells Fargo's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability . Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) Modified on 7/21/2015 (gm). (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of B. John Casey In Support of Joinder to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Casey, B.) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Joinder to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) Modified on 7/21/2015 (gm). (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice re Motion for Summary Judgment, 126 Withdrawal of Participation Filed by Citizens Bancorp, West Coast Bancorp (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, 126 .) (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert M. Jefferson . Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 132 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 132 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Bill Hubel. Filed by Citizens Bancorp, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 124 .) (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Brenda J. Giesselmann in Support of Wells Fargo's Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 128 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Don Kasinger. Filed by Citizens Bancorp, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 124 .) (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Summary Judgment On All Claims. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - Eighth Claim - Punitive Damages. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, 126 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities - Eighth Claim - Punitive Damages. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Joinder in Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment-Vicarious Liability Filed by U.S. Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Oregon Bank Holding Company Liability. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Citizens Bancorp, West Coast Bancorp. (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - Seventh Claim for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, 122 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities - Seventh Claim - Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Joinder to Defendant Bank of America N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability. Oral Argument requested. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment On Claims I-VI. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, 119 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Summary Judgment On All Claims I-VI. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - No Damages. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, 117 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Summary Judgment - No Damages. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Christopher Comstock . Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 111 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - County's Conduct Bars Its Claims. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, 114 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Summary Judgment - County's Conduct Bars Its Claims. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - Ultra Vires Lawsuit. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, 112 .) (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Summary Judgment - Ultra Vires Lawsuit. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., Citizens Bancorp, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, West Coast Bancorp. (Chan, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Concise Statement of Material Fact . Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment 109 .) (McGrory, John) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Summary Judgment . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc.. (McGrory, John) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney James P. Abely (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: jpabely. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Abely for Bank of America, N.A.,James P. Abely for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4201094 issued. Signed on 7/16/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Craig L. Lowell (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: cllowell. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig L. Lowell for County of Multnomah. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 63071 issued. Signed on 7/16/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Mark S. Landman (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: mslandman. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Landman for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4198734 issued. Signed on 7/16/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Brent L. Crumpton (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: blcrumpton. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brent L. Crumpton for County of Multnomah,Brent L. Crumpton for County of Multnomah. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 63072 issued. Signed on 7/16/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held 7/17/15. Order Setting the following deadlines: All summary judgment motions and motion to strike filed in the state court action shall be filed in this court on the date of 7/20/2015. All responses to summary judgment motions filed in the state court action shall be filed in this court on the date of 7/22/2015. All replies to the summary judgment motions filed in the state court action (not including the replies which were already filed in the federal court action) shall be filed in this court on the date of 7/24/2015. Reply to motion to strike will be due 7/27/2015. Motion to Remand will be due 7/27/2015. Response to remand motion will be due 8/10/2015. Reply to response to remand motion will be due 8/17/2015. Oral Argument on all pending motions, once filed in this court, will be set for 8/25/2015 at 9:00AM. All other case deadlines will be addressed following oral argument, if necessary. Order: Bank of America and Wells Fargo's Motion (Request) for Oral Argument 38 on the summary judgment motions is Granted. Brent Crumpton present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Robert Brochin; John McGrory; Joseph Yenouskas; Robert Maloney; Andrew Louis; Thomas Panoff; Gregory Marshall; Erick Paetsch; Amy Nelson; Philip Rush; Kristina Holm present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Report on the parties' Rule 16-2(b) and 26-1 telephone conference. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Report Plaintiff's Position re: The Parties' Rule 16-2(b) and 26-1 Telephone Conference. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Report Defendants' Written Report on the Parties' Rule 16-2(b) and 26-1 Telephone Conference. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (McGrory, John) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Citizens Bancorp. (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by West Coast Bancorp. (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Co-Counsel Shannon Raye Martinez Filed by Citizens Bancorp (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Co-Counsel Shannon Raye Martinez Filed by West Coast Bancorp (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Abely . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4201094. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (French, Pilar) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  The document, Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig L. Lowell. Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Receipt No.: 63071 90 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brent L. Crumpton. Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Receipt No.: 63072 89 , was not electronically filed in our Court after the mandatory electronic filing deadline of September 1, 2006. Local Rule 5-1 requires the electronic filing of all pleadings, documents, and other papers in all pending civil and criminal cases. The document(s) referenced above should not be re-filed electronically, but we ask that you conform to the requirements of LR 5-1 in future submissions to the Court. Please refer to LR 5-5 for documents that must be filed in hard copy. To learn more about this requirement and the CM/ECF system, visit the Court website at ord.uscourts.gov. There you will find links to rules and resources designed to assist you and your staff in quickly learning how to electronically file. If you have any questions or concerns regarding this matter, please contact any member of the Clerk's Office staff. (ecp) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig L. Lowell. Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Receipt No.: 63071. Filed by County of Multnomah. (ecp) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brent L. Crumpton. Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Receipt No.: 63072. Filed by County of Multnomah. (ecp) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 7/17/2015 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at or shortly after the appointed time. Counsel are to designate one speaking lawyer to represent their respective client(s) during this conference. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Amy Sterner Nelson (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: asternernelson. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy Sterner Nelson for U.S. Bank National Association. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4197371 issued. Signed on 7/15/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Paul R. Dieseth (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: prdieseth. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul R. Dieseth for U.S. Bank National Association. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4197336 issued. Signed on 7/15/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark S. Landman . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4198734. Filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Rush, Philip) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Thomas V. Panoff (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: tvpanoff. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas V. Panoff for CitiMortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4194589 issued. Signed on 7/14/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Thomas P. Evans (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: tpevans. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas P. Evans for CitiMortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4194620 issued. Signed on 7/14/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Christopher S. Comstock (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: cscomstock. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher S. Comstock for CitiMortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4194633 issued. Signed on 7/14/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Lucia Nale (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: lnale. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lucia Nale for CitiMortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4195577 issued. Signed on 7/14/2105 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Joseph F. Savage, Jr. (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: jfsavage. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph F. Savage, Jr. for Bank of America, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4195577 issued. Signed on 7/14/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy Sterner Nelson . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4197371. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R. Dieseth . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4197336, Motion for Leave . Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement of U.S. Bank National Association in its Individual Capacity. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance of Shawn J. Larsen-Bright appearing on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association In Its Individual Capacity Filed by on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Larsen-Bright, Shawn) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance of Nicholas A. Kahl on Behalf of Plaintiff Filed by All Plaintiffs (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance of Erich M. Paetsch appearing on behalf of West Coast Bancorp Filed by on behalf of West Coast Bancorp (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance of Erich M. Paetsch appearing on behalf of Citizens Bancorp Filed by on behalf of Citizens Bancorp (Paetsch, Erich) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Marshall for Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4192083 issued. Signed on 7/13/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Joseph F. Yenouskas (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: jfyenouskas. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set or reset your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph F. Yenouskas for Bank of America, N.A.,Joseph F. Yenouskas for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4192479 issued. Signed on 7/13/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Yvonne W. Chan (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: ywchan. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph F. Savage Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4195577. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (French, Pilar) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Yvonne W. Chan for Bank of America, N.A.,Yvonne W. Chan for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4192332 issued. Signed on 7/13/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sss) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Rush, Philip) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Weston, Cody) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Cody M. Weston appearing on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association Filed by on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Weston, Cody) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Comstock . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4194633. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas P. Evans . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4194620. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lucia Nale . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4194601. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas V. Panoff . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4194589. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief Joinder in the Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Bank of America N.A. and Wells Fargo, N.A.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability. Filed by Citizens Bancorp, West Coast Bancorp. (Related document(s): Brief 36 .) (Martinez, Shannon) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance of Shannon Raye Martinez appearing on behalf of West Coast Bancorp Filed by on behalf of West Coast Bancorp (Martinez, Shannon) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance of Shannon Raye Martinez appearing on behalf of Citizens Bancorp Filed by on behalf of Citizens Bancorp (Martinez, Shannon) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Joinder in reply brief iso Bank of America and Wells Fargo partial motion for summary judgment -- vicarious liability. Filed by WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Joinder in reply brief iso Bank of America and Wells Fargo partial motion for summary judgment -- vicarious liability. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief CitiMortgage, Inc.'s Joinder in the Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Bank of America N.A. and Wells Fargo, N.A.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Related document(s): Brief 36 .) (Garrett, Russell) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph F. Yenouskas of Bank of America, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4192479. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Yvonne W. Chan . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4192332. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (French, Pilar) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief Joinder to Reply Brief in Support of Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Partial Motion for Summary Judgment -- Vicarious Liability. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief Reply in Support of Joinder to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment -- No Damages. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Janice Garrison in support of reply re supplmental motion for summary judgment. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Exhibit A to Garrison Declaration) (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief Reply to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Defendants. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply in Support of Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (McGrory, John) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion (Request) for Oral Argument. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Brian T. Kiolbasa in Support of Defendants' Reply Briefs in Support of Their Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by All Defendants. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief Reply Brief in Support of Partial Motion for Summary Judgment - Vicarious Liability. Filed by Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply in support of its supplement motion for summary judgment. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on (1) Ultra Vires Lawsuit; (2) County's Conduct; (3) No Damages; (4) Claims I-VI; (5) Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; and (6) Punitive Damages. Filed by All Defendants. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement JPMorgan Chase Bank. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory J. Marshall . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4192083. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Casey, B.) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Christopher S. Comstock in Support of Reply in Support of Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Related document(s): Reply 29 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Garrett, Russell) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply in Support of Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Garrett, Russell) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Robert M. Brochin (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: rmbrochin. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Brochin for Merscorp Holdings Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4190016 issued. Signed on 7/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Clay M. Carlton (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: cmcarlton. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clay M. Carlton for Merscorp Holdings Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4190036 issued. Signed on 7/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Andrew R. Louis (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: arlouis. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew R. Louis for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and WMC Mortgage Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4189866 issued. Signed on 7/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney David W. Marston, Jr. (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: dwmarston. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David W. Marston, Jr for Merscorp Holdings Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4190032 issued. Signed on 7/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Matthew P. Previn (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: mpprevin. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew P. Previn for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and WMC Mortgage Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4189943 issued. Signed on 7/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney David C. Behar (appearing Pro Hac Vice). Your login is: dcbehar. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Behar for Merscorp Holdings Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4190049 issued. Signed on 7/9/2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Leta E. Gorman appearing on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. Filed by on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. (Gorman, Leta) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Behar . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4190049. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Clay M. Carlton . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4190036. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David W. Marston, Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4190032. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert M. Brochin . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4190016. Filed by Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew P. Previn . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4189943. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew R. Louis . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4189866. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., WMC Mortgage Corporation. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance of B. John Casey appearing on behalf of Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. (Casey, B.) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance of Gregory A. Chaimov appearing on behalf of Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Along with John F. McGrory, Jr. and Fred Burnside Filed by on behalf of Merscorp Holdings Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Chaimov, Gregory) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance of Robert E. Maloney, Jr appearing on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Filed by on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Maloney, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance of Brian T. Kiolbasa appearing on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Filed by on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Kiolbasa, Brian) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/4/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/4/2015. Pretrial Order is due by 12/4/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (dsg) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Removal of Case Number 1212-16328 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4186472 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Rush, Philip) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 535 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?