USA v. Hussain
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cr-00462-CRB

Tags
Last Updated December 1, 2018 at 8:05 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Frentzen +1 415 436 6959 william.frentzen@usdoj.gov
Space Robert S. Leach +1 415 436 7200 +1 415 436 7234 robert.leach@usdoj.gov
Space Adam A. Reeves +1 415 436 7200 +1 415 436 7234 adam.reeves@usdoj.gov
Space Justin D. Weitz +1 202 598 8084 +1 202 514 3003 Justin.Weitz@usdoj.gov
No Logo ICP London Limited, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth S David +1 212 459 7419 edavid@goodwinlaw.com
Space James D Gatta +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 jgatta@goodwinlaw.com
Space Hayes Phillips Hyde +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 hhyde@goodwinlaw.com
Space Andrew Kim +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 AndrewKim@goodwinprocter.com
Space Richard Mark Strassberg +1 212 813 8859 +1 212 355 3333 rstrassberg@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Sushovan Hussain, Defendant (1)
No Logo Sushovan Tareque Hussain, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brook Dooley +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 bxd@keker.com
Space Ian Asher Kanig +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 ikanig@keker.com
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Ian Asher Kanig +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 ikanig@keker.com
Space John Watkins Keker +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jwk@kvn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained John Watkins Keker +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jwk@kvn.com
Space Cody Justin Kirmil Gray +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 Cgray@keker.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kate Ellis Lazarus +1 415 391 5400 klazarus@keker.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jan Nielsen Little +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jlittle@kvn.com
Space Jan Nielsen Little +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jlittle@kvn.com
Space Nicholas David Marais +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 NMarais@keker.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas David Marais +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 NMarais@keker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motor Freight Carriers Association, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Brook Dooley +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 bxd@keker.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1)
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/10/2016
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 Conspiracy to commit wire fraud
Count 2-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 Wire fraud
Count 16s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1348.F
Offense Level 4
181348 and 2 - Securities Fraud
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 - Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud
Count 2s-15s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 - Wire Fraud
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags E-Filing,RELATE
  Entries (460) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Notice of Related Case
Notice of Related Case by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 445 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Clerks Notice
    CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO QUASH HEARING on December 5, 2018 and VACATING SENTENCING HEARING on December 6, 2018 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion to Quash hearing reset for December 11, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. The sentencing hearing date will be reset at the motion hearing with input from counsel and Mr. Hussain. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Reply to Response
      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [426] MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoenas (Keker, John) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 443 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Sealed document
        Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 442 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Sealed document
          Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Richard M. Strassberg: Granting [435] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/29/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, James D. Gatta: Granting [434] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/29/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Elizabeth S. David: Granting [433] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/29/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                  ORDER RE: PROPOSED INTERVENOR ICP LONDON LIMITEDS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: Granting [431] Motion to Seal as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/29/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                    Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [432] MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena, [426] MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoenas. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Reply to Response
                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [432] MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena (Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 motion to quash
                        MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Declaration of Andrew Kim in Support of Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena, # (4) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Andrew Kim, # (5) Exhibit B to the Declaration of Andrew Kim, # (6) Exhibit C to the Declaration of Andrew Kim, # (7) Declaration of Philip Pearson in Support of Motion to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoena)(Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018, Terminated: 11/29/2018 Motion to seal
                          MOTION to Seal by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Andrew Kim in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # (2) Proposed Order)(Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Notice - other
                            NOTICE of Appearance of Andrew Kim by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Kim, Andrew) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Notice - other
                              NOTICE of Appearance of Hayes P. Hyde by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/25/2018, Entered: 11/25/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Response to Motions to Quash by Defendant Hussain and Invoke Capital and Motion for Show Cause Hearing Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(g) (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 11/25/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Declaration in Support
                                  Declaration of Andrew Kim IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Richard M. Strassberg. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 34611138360.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/23/18 by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice
                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Attorney: James D. Gatta. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 34611138360.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/23/18 by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 11/23/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice
                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Elizabeth David. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 34611138360.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/23/18 by ICP London Limited as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/20/2018 motion to quashCourt Filing
                                          MOTION to Quash Rule 17(c) Subpoenas by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration of Jan Nielsen Little, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B)(Keker, John) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                            ORDER ISSUING FED. RULE CRIM. P. 17(c) SUBPOENAS: Granting [423] Motion as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/19/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Proposed Order
                                              Proposed Order re [423] MOTION for FRCP 17(c) Subpoena by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018, Terminated: 11/19/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                MOTION for FRCP 17(c) Subpoena by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Frentzen, William) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 422 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING SENTENCING HEARING on November 7, 2018 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Sentencing reset for 12/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 421 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING SENTENCING HEARING on October 24, 2018 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Sentencing reset for 11/7/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 420 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Sealed document
                                                      Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on Motion for AcquittalCourt Filing
                                                        REDACTED ORDER denying [354] [408] Motions for Acquittal; [409] Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/30/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SENTENCING DATE: Granting [417] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Sentencing continued to October 24, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/19/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                            Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [418] Order on Stipulation: Sentencing set for 10/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018, Terminated: 7/19/2018 stipulation
                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING DATE. (Keker, John) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/7/2018; 3/8/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer for Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pam Batalo.(rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [409] MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 33 (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [408] MOTION for Acquittal RENEWED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 29(c) (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Response to motion
                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Response to [409] Defendant's Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Rule 33 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 6/6/2018) Modified on 6/7/2018 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Response to motion
                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Opposition to [408] Defendant's Motion for Acquittal Pursuant to Rule 29 (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 6/6/2018) Modified on 6/7/2018 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 411 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: 6/1/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR ACQUITTAL HEARING set for July 11, 2018 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. The motions will be determined on the pleadings. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 410 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING ON June 27, 2018 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Motion for Acquittal and Motion for New Trial Hearing reset for 7/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                              Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [409] MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 33, [354] MOTION for Acquittal Defendant Sushovan Hussain's Motion For Judgment of Acquittal Under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29(a), [408] MOTION for Acquittal RENEWED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 29(c): Motion Hearing reset for 7/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 motion for new trial
                                                                                MOTION for New Trial NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 33 by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                  MOTION for Acquittal RENEWED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF ACQUITTAL UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 29(c) by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Receipt
                                                                                    Receipt in the amount of $250,000.00 from Sushovan Hussain; Date receipt issued on 05/04/2018 with Receipt # 34611133280 (pals, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/30/18, Volume 32, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/26/18, Volume 31, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/25/18, Volume 30, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 5/4/2018, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2018. (Related documents(s) [402]) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/5/2018, Entered: 5/5/2018 Transcript Order
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/5/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Exhibits
                                                                                                6 boxes of exhibits located on the criminal overflow shelf as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond Entered as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain unsecured in amount of $ 5,000,000 and secured in the amount of $250,000. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/4/18. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 399 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 5/4/2018. Post Trial Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Sentencing set for 8/24/2018 at 11:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. The Court adopts the briefing schedule as outlined in the Joint Statement at ECF No. 398. Court issued a Release Bond in the amount of 5 Million Dollars to be secured with a cashier's check in the amount of $250,000.00. (Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes) Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney: William Frentzen, Robert Leach and Adam Reeves. Defendant Attorney: Jan Little, Brook Dooley and John Keker. Probation Officer: N/A. Pretrial Officer: Denise Mancia. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 statement
                                                                                                      Statement re [395] Clerk's Notice,,, by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Joint Statement in Advance of May 4, 2018 Status Conference and Hearing (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 395 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING TIME AND SETTING A BRIEF DEADLINE as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Status Conference/Set Sentencing Hearing/Set Motion for New Trial Hearing set for 5/4/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel shall meet and confer re pending matters, i.e., Sentencing hearing date, possible Conditions of Release, Remand to US Marshal, Motion for New Trial briefing schedule, etc. Counsel shall file a notice outlining their agreement or file separate notices providing the court with their respective position by Thursday, May 3, 2018 at Noon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [392] Jury Trial: Status Conference set for 5/4/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 396 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 jury verdict
                                                                                                                JURY VERDICT as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1) Guilty on Count 1s,2s-15s,16s. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                  Jury Note 6 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/30/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2018: # (1) Trial Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/26/2018. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                        Jury Note 5 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                          Jury Note 4 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/25/2018 (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Verdict Form - Final - as given to jury 4/24/2018.Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/25/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/24/18, Volume 29, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/23/18, Volume 28, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/19/18, Volume 27, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/18/18, Volume 26, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/17/18, Volume 25, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/16/18, Volume 24, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/13/18, Volume 23, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/9/18, Volume 22, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                                Jury Note 3 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Jury Note 3)(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                                  Jury Note 2 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Jury Note 2)(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                                    Jury Note 1 as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Jury Note 1)(lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/24/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Jury Instructions - Final. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/24/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Index of Admitted Exhibits in Native)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/23/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List of Admitted Exhibits)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/22/2018, Entered: 4/22/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT LIST by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 4/21/2018, Entered: 4/21/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                  Statement re [368] Stipulation, [359] Order by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 4/21/2018, Entered: 4/21/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain regarding Autonomy books and records and Deloitte work papers. (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re jury instructions (third draft). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/20/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Redline, # (2) Clean) (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM United States' Response to Court's Second Draft Jury Instructions by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 365 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TRIAL TIME as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Trial set for Monday, April 23, 2018 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: 4/20/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Sushovan Tareque Hussain in Response to Docket No. 362 (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re argument. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/19/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER requesting comment on second draft of jury instructions. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/19/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A) (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Sushovan Tareque Hussain in response to [360] Government's Proposed Instructions (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re Defendant's offers of proof. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/19/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/19/2018. (Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/18/2018. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement re [349] Statement, [353] Order by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Defendant's Supplemental Offer of Proof (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 8274, # (2) Exhibit 8275, # (3) Exhibit 8276, # (4) Exhibit 8277, # (5) Exhibit 8278)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018, Terminated: 7/30/2018 Motion for Acquittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Acquittal Defendant Sushovan Hussain's Motion For Judgment of Acquittal Under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29(a) by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER inviting oral argument. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/2018. (Attachments: # (1) A) (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/23/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2018. (Related documents(s) [339]) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of KATE LAZARUS in Support of [349] Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Offer of Proof Regarding Post-October 3, 2011 Evidence (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2436, # (2) Exhibit 5524, # (3) Exhibit 5525, # (4) Exhibit 5526, # (5) Exhibit 5721, # (6) Exhibit 6463, # (7) Exhibit 6463A, # (8) Exhibit 6463B, # (9) Exhibit 6463C, # (10) Exhibit 6796, # (11) Exhibit 6796A, # (12) Exhibit 6797, # (13) Exhibit 6797A, # (14) Exhibit 6962, # (15) Exhibit 8090, # (16) Exhibit 8092, # (17) Exhibit 8171, # (18) Exhibit 8217, # (19) Exhibit 8218, # (20) Exhibit 8219, # (21) Exhibit 8220, # (22) Exhibit 8224, # (23) Exhibit 8225, # (24) Exhibit 8226, # (25) Exhibit 8227, # (26) Exhibit 8228, # (27) Exhibit 8229, # (28) Exhibit 8231, # (29) Exhibit 8232, # (30) Exhibit 8233, # (31) Exhibit 8234, # (32) Exhibit 8235, # (33) Exhibit 8236, # (34) Exhibit 8237, # (35) Exhibit 8251, # (36) Exhibit 8252, # (37) Exhibit 8253, # (38) Exhibit 8255, # (39) Exhibit 2451-0001, # (40) Exhibit HP-SEC-00190877, # (41) Exhibit HP-SEC-00194420, # (42) Exhibit HP-SEC-00194423, # (43) Exhibit HP-SEC-00196140, # (44) Exhibit HP-SEC-00734263, # (45) Exhibit HP-SEC-00734265, # (46) Exhibit POS00325407, # (47) Exhibit POS00325407A, # (48) Exhibit POS00388360)(Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement re [347] Order by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Offer of Proof Regarding Post-October 3, 2011 Evidence (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/17/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Sushovan Tareque Hussain [347] Order To File Various Documents (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 8231, # (2) Exhibit 5721, # (3) Exhibit 8168, # (4) Exhibit 8171, # (5) Exhibit 8092)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER for Defendant to file various documents. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Opposition to Admission of Hearsay (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018, Terminated: 4/19/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine United States' Motion to Exclude or Limit Witnesses by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/16/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re Admissibility of Trial Exhibit 6644 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6644)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re Motion to Admit Exhibits 2451 and 6463 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (TX 2451), # (2) Exhibit B (TX 6463))(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER requesting comment. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/16/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Order on Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [322] Motion to Exclude testimony of Morland and Toms; denying [330] Motion to Exclude Meiers; denying [333] Motion to limit Brice's testimony; granting [337] Motion to exclude Yelland summary chart. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/16/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Belle Ball (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 4/15/2018, Entered: 4/15/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Defendant Sushovan Hussains Motion In Limine To Exclude Chris Yellands Summary Chart And Accompanying Exhibits by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/13/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Ehxibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DELOITTE EXHIBITS: Granting [320] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/13/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 4/19/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Regarding the Government's Summary Witness by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION by Sushovan Tareque Hussain to Trial Exhibit 3040 (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Regarding Testimony of Steven Brice by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Opposition to Motion to Exclude Paul Morland and David Toms (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 4/19/2018 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Purported Top 40 "Summary Charts" from Evidence by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2965, # (2) Exhibit 2966)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude Testimony of John Meiers by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: West Corporation filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Certain Servers and Trial Exhibits filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: PR Newswire filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Halo Video Conferencing filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re Hewlett Packard Stock Price. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6334, # (2) Exhibit 6335)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re Exhibits 5528-29 (Autonomy Stock Price). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5528, # (2) Exhibit 5529)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 323 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude Paul Morland and David Toms by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/10/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/9/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 4/13/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain REGARDING DELOITTE EXHIBITS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/6/18, Volume 21, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/5/18, Volume 20, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/4/18, Volume 19, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/3/18, Volume 18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/2/18, Volume 17, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/27/18, Volume 16, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/26/18, Volume 15, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reportersuntil the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/6/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/5/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: 4/5/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/4/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/4/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/3/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [305] Statement , RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Belle Ball (Wong, Michael) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING EVIDENCE OF SPECIFIC RELEVANT EVENTS AND DOCUMENTS AFTER OCTOBER 3, 2011 (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 4/2/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REIMBURSEMENT ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/2/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: 4/1/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [302] MOTION (1) To Admit Late-Produced Evidence; (2) For A Curative Instruction; and (3) To Compel The Government To Immediately Produce All Other Brady/Giglio Materials (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 4/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: 4/1/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION (1) To Admit Late-Produced Evidence; (2) For A Curative Instruction; and (3) To Compel The Government To Immediately Produce All Other Brady/Giglio Materials by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of John W. Keker, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Proposed Order, # (7) Exhibit A)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/27/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Minute Order (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) Modified on 3/28/2018 (ls, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/26/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [299] Status Conference: Jury Trial set for 4/6/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/20/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/25/2018, Entered: 3/25/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude Autonomy Systems Limited's Restatement and Associated Evidence by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/25/2018, Entered: 3/25/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Antonia Anderson Testimony re: Recreation of Top 40 Lists by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 299 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Telephonic Status Conference as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/23/2018. The Court set additional trial dates: April 6, April 13th and April 20th. (Total Time in Court: 20 Minutes) Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam Reeves, William Frentzen and Robert Leach. Defendant Attorney: John W. Keker, Jan Nielsen Little and Brook Dooley. Defendant Present: No. Defendant in Custody: No. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/22/18, Volume 14, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/21/19, Volume 13, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/20/18, Volume 12, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/19/18, Volume 11, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/23/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/22/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/21/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Order on Motion for Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting [288] Motion for Ex Parte Application as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/21/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/20/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018, Terminated: 3/21/2018 Motion for Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Ex Parte Applicationfor Immunity Order by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment, # (2) Proposed Order)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/19/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2018: # (1) Minute Order) (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/16/18, Volume 10, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/12/18, Volume 9, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/8/18, Volume 8, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/6/18, Volume 6, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/7/18, Volume 7, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/18/2018, Entered: 3/18/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Evidence That Hewlett Packard Is Covering Christopher Egan's Legal Fees (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/16/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2018: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Jury Trial set for 3/16/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/12/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY HEWLETT PACKARDS MOTION TO WITHHOLD CERTAIN DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/12/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 277 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITNESS LIST by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Third-Amended) (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/11/2018, Entered: 3/11/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re: Request for Case Management Assistance (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/8/2018. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Total Time in Court: 5 Hours and 40 Minutes) Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/7/2018 (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re: Evidence of FileTek Inc.'s Accounting (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Trial Ex. 615), # (2) Exhibit B (Trial Ex. 2352))(Keker, John) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/6/2018 (Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/5/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer,Volume 5. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/28/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer, Volume 4. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/27/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer, Volume 3. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/26/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer, Volume 2. Court Reporters Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporters until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (Related documents(s) [237]) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2018: # (1) Supplement Master Index) (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN MATERIALS BY NON-PARTY HEWLETT PACKARD (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [262] Statement (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY OF CERTAIN MATERIALS SUBMITTED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (DKT. 223) BY NON-PARTY HEWLETT PACKARD. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/5/18. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 3/5/2018. (Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo) (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit List) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Evidence That Hewlett Packard is Covering Witnesses' Legal Expenses (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain [255] Order, [260] Order, [259] Order Amended Submission Re Production of Witness Interview Documents (Oldenburg, Kurt) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING HP'S MOTION TO WITHHOLD CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE [257]. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/2/18. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DIRECTING NON-PARTY HEWLETT PACKARD TO PROVIDE INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/2/18. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Sushovan Tareque Hussain [257] Response filed by Hewlett-Packard (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Keker, John) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain [255] Order Re Production of Witness Interview Documents (Oldenburg, Kurt) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/28/2018. (Total Time in Court: 6 Hours) Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo. (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log and Exhibit List) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING HP'S EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHHOLD ATTORNEY INTERVIEW NOTES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/28/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/28/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/27/2018 (Total Time in Court: 6 Hours and 10 Minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce and Pamela Batalo). (Attachments: # (1) Trial and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Belle Ball (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Re Release of May 29, 2012 Interview Summary by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Oldenburg, Kurt) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 Jury TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Trial as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/26/2018 (Total Time in Court: 5 Hours and 30 Minutes) Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. (Attachments: # (1) Trial and Exhibit Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts (Oldenburg, Kurt) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on February 6, 2018, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2018. (Related documents(s) [247], [236]) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on February 5, 2018, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2018. (Related documents(s) [236]) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Belle Ball (Oldenburg, Kurt) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WITNESS LIST by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Second Amended Witness List (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain GRANTING Defendant's Motion in Limine #6 [dkt. 151]. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/9/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE COURTROOM EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Re [241] Proposed Order filed by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/9/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND AUTHENTICITY ORDER: Granting [242] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/9/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 2/9/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain [PROPOSED] AUTHENTICITY STIPULATION. (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re Courtroom Equipment for Trial (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Exhibit Location Shelf 47 (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Belle Ball (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM REGARDING SWEARING OF JURY ON FEBRUARY 5, 2018 by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 234 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Pretrial Conference as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/6/2018. Court will issue an order. Court Exhibit 1 marked and admitted. Upon consultation with counsel, the Court excused alternate juror number A6, Ms. Scheffy. The government provided the court with trial exhibit 2509-0001. Status Conference set for February 23, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Defendant present. (Total Time in Court: 2 Hours and 45 Minutes) Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: William Frentzen, Adam A. Reeves and Robert S. Leach. Defendant Attorney: Kate E. Lazarus, Cody Gray, Ian Kanig, Nic Marais, John W. Keker, Brook Dooley and Jan Nielsen Little. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER RELATING CASES. The Court determined the following cases are related: CR16-0462 CRB and CR18-00021 EJD. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/6/2018. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR JURY REFRESHMENTS as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/6/2018. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Jury Trial set for 3/26/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Trial dates terminated: 3/1/2018, 3/2/2018, 3/9/2018, 3/13/2018, 3/14/2018, 3/15/2018, 3/16/2018 and 3/23/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Minute Entry (adjusting hearing time) for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Selection as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/5/2018 (Court Reporter: Belle Ball) (Attachments: # (1) Amended Trial Log - adjusting time only) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Jury Selection as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 2/5/2018 (Court Reporter: Belle Ball). (Attachments: # (1) Trial Log) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [228] Notice of Related Case (Weitz, Justin) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Related Case by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Summary of Motions to be Heard on February 6-7, 2018 (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [212] MOTION to Compel the Government to Secure the Trial Attendance of Certain Deloitte Witnesses (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brook Dooley)(Keker, John) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [211] MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF RULE 16, BRADY AND GIGLIO MATERIAL; AND FOR ISSUANCE OF A BRADY ORDER (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018, Terminated: 3/12/2018 motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File - UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF [140] by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BROOK DOOLEY ISO [140] DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Keker, John) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED MEMORANDA, ECF NO. 213: Granting [220] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/31/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re pre-trial conference. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/31/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [212] MOTION to Compel the Government to Secure the Trial Attendance of Certain Deloitte Witnesses (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B, # (3) Attachment C)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018, Terminated: 1/31/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [213] MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Memoranda and Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [211] MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF RULE 16, BRADY AND GIGLIO MATERIAL; AND FOR ISSUANCE OF A BRADY ORDER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment A)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: 1/30/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [194] MOTION for Defense-Witness Immunity or Dismissal of the Indictment - Partially Filed Under Seal (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Brook Dooley in Support of [216] Reply to Response by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Keker, John) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [182] MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Mr. Christopher Yelland (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 215 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: The court sets the following deadlines for the motions to compel at ECF Nos. 211, 212, and 213: Opposition due by 1/30/2018; Reply due by 2/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [213] MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Memoranda, [211] MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF RULE 16, BRADY AND GIGLIO MATERIAL; AND FOR ISSUANCE OF A BRADY ORDER, [212] MOTION to Compel the Government to Secure the Trial Attendance of Certain Deloitte Witnesses Opposition due by 1/30/2018. Replies due by 2/1/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Brook Dooley in Support of [212] MOTION to Compel the Government to Secure the Trial Attendance of Certain Deloitte Witnesses, [211] MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF RULE 16, BRADY AND GIGLIO MATERIAL; AND FOR ISSUANCE OF A BRADY ORDER, [213] MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Memoranda by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018, Terminated: 1/31/2018 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Memoranda by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel the Government to Secure the Trial Attendance of Certain Deloitte Witnesses by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF RULE 16, BRADY AND GIGLIO MATERIAL; AND FOR ISSUANCE OF A BRADY ORDER by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 210 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 209 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 208 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 207 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 206 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: 1/23/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF HIS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR DEFENSE-WITNESS IMMUNITY as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/23/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [138] Motion for Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2016 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [182] MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Mr. Christopher Yelland, [146] Fifth MOTION in Limine , [138] MOTION for Discovery , [142] First MOTION in Limine , [147] Sixth MOTION in Limine , [144] Third MOTION in Limine , [143] Second MOTION in Limine , [145] Fourth MOTION in Limine , [194] MOTION for Defense-Witness Immunity or Dismissal of the Indictment, [140] MOTION For Order Directing The Government To Review The Files of Hewlett-Packard Company and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP , [151] MOTION in Limine Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [182] MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Mr. Christopher Yelland (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to the parties re: juror questionnaire. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/17/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A) (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITNESS LIST by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain [AMENDED] (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 202 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DEFENSE-WITNESS IMMUNITY: Granting [197] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/16/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 1/12/2018. Status Conference set for 2/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018, Terminated: 1/16/2018 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain regarding briefing schedule for Defendant's Motion for Defense-Witness Immunity. (Little, Jan) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Immunity (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Brook Dooley in Support of [194] MOTION for Defense-Witness Immunity or Dismissal of the Indictment by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018, Terminated: 2/12/2018 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Defense-Witness Immunity or Dismissal of the Indictment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 192 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel to dial-in to the following conference line: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 7283688. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Proposed Form of Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Form of Verdict by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States Proposed Materials Regarding Jury Selection (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Frentzen, William) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Pretrial Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Joint (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Voir Dire by Sushovan Tareque Hussain Proposed Amendments/Additions to Governments Proposed Juror Questionnaire (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Keker, John) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Sushovan Tareque Hussain [JOINT SUBMISSION] (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by Sushovan Tareque Hussain [JOINT] REQUEST FOR INDIVIDUALIZED VOIR DIRE FOLLOW-UP QUESTIONS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Keker, John) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Mr. Christopher Yelland by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [155] Memorandum in Opposition, [146] Fifth MOTION in Limine (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [159] Memorandum in Opposition, [145] Fourth MOTION in Limine (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [158] Memorandum in Opposition, [143] Second MOTION in Limine (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [142] First MOTION in Limine (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Evidence Blaming the Victim (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain United States' Reply Brief in Further Support of its Motion in Limine No. 3 to Admit Summary Charts (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [151] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Categories of Evidence (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [140] MOTION For Order Directing The Government To Review The Files of Hewlett-Packard Company and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [138] MOTION for Discovery (Keker, John) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER to file materials ex parte under seal pursuant to [125]. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 171 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 169 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 166 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 165 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 164 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert S. Leach in Support of [161] Memorandum in Opposition, [162] Response to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [138] MOTION for Discovery (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [140] MOTION For Order Directing The Government To Review The Files of Hewlett-Packard Company and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [151] MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [145] Fourth MOTION in Limine filed by the U.S. Government (Gray, Cody) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [143] Second MOTION in Limine filed by the U.S. Government (Gray, Cody) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [147] Sixth MOTION in Limine filed by the U.S. Government (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [142] First MOTION in Limine filed by the U.S. Government (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [146] Fifth MOTION in Limine filed by the U.S. Government (Kanig, Ian) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [144] Third MOTION in Limine filed by the U.S. Government (Kanig, Ian) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION - Regarding Disclosure Schedule for Christopher Yelland and Related Motions in Limine. Granting [152] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/22/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017, Terminated: 12/22/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Regarding Disclosure Schedule for Christopher Yelland and Related Motions in Limine. (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [137] Motion to Seal as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/14/17. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER: Granting [148] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017, Terminated: 12/12/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Discovery Motion filed by USA. (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sixth MOTION in Limine by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fifth MOTION in Limine by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Fourth MOTION in Limine by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Third MOTION in Limine by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION in Limine by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION in Limine by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [137] MOTION to Seal Portions of Motions in Limine and Related Pleadings (Keker, John) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION For Order Directing The Government To Review The Files of Hewlett-Packard Company and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (4) Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (5) Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (6) Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (7) Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (8) Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Ian Kanig, # (9) Proposed Order)(Kanig, Ian) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cody Justin Kirmil Gray appearing for Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Gray, Cody) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 2/12/2018 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of John W. Keker in support of Defendant's Motion for Discovery, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Keker, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John Keker, # (4) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017, Terminated: 12/14/2017 Motion to sealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Portions of Motions in Limine and Related Pleadings by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kate Lazarus in support of Administrative Motion to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITNESS LIST by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Additional Counsel by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Frentzen, William) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RELATE CASE as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain - Re [132] Notice of Related Case filed by USA. The Court finds that Case No. 17-cr-590-WHA is related to this case, 16-cr-462-CRB, and accordingly GRANTS the governments motion to relate the cases. Case No. 17-cr-590-WHA, United States v. Egan, is hereby related to this case and reassigned to this Court. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/30/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Related Case by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER (Modified) REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND RELATED MOTIONS IN LIMINE: Granting [130] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Motion in Limine/Pretrial Conference hearing set for February 6, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Expert Disclosures and Related Motions in Limine. (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [113] Motion to Dismiss as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/27/2017. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER: Granting [127] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/24/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017, Terminated: 10/24/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Submission of Rule 16 Summary filed by USA. (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 10/6/17, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2018. (Related documents(s) [123]) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [110] Motion to Quash as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1) Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/10/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 10/6/2017 - Re [113] Motion to Dismiss Indictment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Sushovan Tareque Hussain; Re [110] Amended Motion to Quash Notice of Amended Motion and Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company Pursuant to Rule 17(C); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support There of filed by Hewlett-Packard. Court will issue an order. (Total Time in Court: 49 Minutes) Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert S. Leach and Adam Reeves. Defendant Attorney: Susan Diane Resley and Jan Little, Brook Dooley, Nic Marais, Kate Lazarus, Martha B. Sotlley, Susan Resley and Michael Wong. Probation Officer: N/A. Pretrial Officer: N/A. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR OCTOBER 6, 2017 HEARING: Granting [117] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 9/20/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO QUASH HEARING as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Motion hearing set for September 26, 2017 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Susan D. Resley in Support of [119] Reply to Response, by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Declaration of Susan D. Resley in Support of Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Companys Reply in Support of Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued Pursuant to Rule 17(C) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Resley, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [110] Amended MOTION to Quash Notice of Amended Motion and Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company Pursuant to Rule 17(C); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Resley, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [113] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Keker, John) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017, Terminated: 9/20/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [113] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, [110] Amended MOTION to Quash Notice of Amended Motion and Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company Pursuant to Rule 17(C); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof continuing reply deadlines to September 18, 2017. (Keker, John) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING re: [110] Amended MOTION to Quash and [113] MOTION to Dismiss, as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motions Hearing reset for 9/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. The hearing set for 9/20/2017 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [113] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [110] Amended MOTION to Quash Notice of Amended Motion and Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company Pursuant to Rule 17(C); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais In Support of Defendant's Opposition to HP's Motion to Quash Rule 17(C) Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais, # (4) Exhibit C to Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais, # (5) Exhibit D to Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais, # (6) Exhibit E to Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais)(Keker, John) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017, Terminated: 10/27/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Indictment and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, # (2) Exhibit A to Marais Decl., # (3) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain [Proposed] Order Granting Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company (Resley, Susan) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Susan D. Resley by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Declaration of Susan D. Resley in Support of Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Resley, Susan) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017, Terminated: 10/10/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION to Quash Notice of Amended Motion and Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company Pursuant to Rule 17(C); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A)(Resley, Susan) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Order on Motion To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ISSUED TO NON-PARTY HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY: Finding as moot [101] Motion to Quash as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. HP and HPE will file an Amended Motion to Quash on or before August 25, 2017; Mr. Hussains Opposition shall be filed by September 8, 2017; HPE and HPs Reply shall be filed by September 15, 2017; The September 12, 2017 hearing date for the Motion to Quash shall be vacated and the Amended Motion to Quash will be scheduled for September 20, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 8/16/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: 8/16/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Martha B. Stolley: Granting [106] Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 8/16/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017, Terminated: 8/16/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Modifying Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule re Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Hewlett-Packard. (Resley, Susan) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017, Terminated: 8/16/2017 Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Martha Stolley. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11629451.) by Hewlett-Packard as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (Resley, Susan) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA (ECF NO. 101) as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing reset for 9/12/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. The hearing set for August 30, 2017 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Jury Trial set for 2/27/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 2/28/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Susan D. Resley in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Non-Party Hewlett-Packard Company as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017) Modified on 8/10/2017 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ISSUED TO NON-PARTY HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017, Terminated: 8/16/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA ISSUED TO NON-PARTY HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY PURSUANT TO RULE 17(C); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [98] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain; Re: Scheduling filed by USA. All Pretrial Motions pursuant to Rule 12 of the FRCRP due by 8/25/2017. Opposition due by 9/8/2017. Replies due by 9/15/2017. Rule 12 Motions hearing set for September 20, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Jury Selection set for 2/5/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Conference/Motions in Limine set for 2/6/2018, 2/7/2018 and 2/8/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 8/8/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2017: # (1) Jury Questionnaire) (lsS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017, Terminated: 8/8/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Scheduling filed by USA. (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 7/21/17, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2017. (Related documents(s) [96]) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 7/21/2017. The government withdrew its Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas. With respect to the defendant's motion to compel, the parties have resolved some of the document request issues and documents have been produced. The Court denied the unresolved portions of the motion to compel. The government indicated that will continue to review the SFO AND SEC documents for Brady, Giglio and Jenks material with a production date of 8/18/17.Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017) Modified on 7/21/2017 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT in Advance of July 21, 2017 Hearing by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement re [65] First MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief by Sushovan Tareque Hussain STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION (Keker, John) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Nicholas D. Marais in Support of [90] Reply to Response, by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Keker, John) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Stephen Gentle in Support of [90] Reply to Response, by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [65] First MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief (Defendant's Surreply in Opposition to Government's Motion for Rule 17 Subpoenas) (Keker, John) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY: Granting [80] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 83 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [74] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Government's Investigatory File (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017, Terminated: 7/12/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Granting Defendant Leave to File Surreply. (Keker, John) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of AUSA Robert S. Leach in Support of [78] Response to Motion, [77] Reply to Response by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit G)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [74] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Government's Investigatory File (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Reply in Further Support of United States' Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re [74] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Government's Investigatory File by Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Kate E. Lazarus in Support of [74] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Government's Investigatory File by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(Keker, John) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Government's Investigatory File by Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of John W. Keker in Support of [72] Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8)(Keker, John) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [65] First MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MODIFIED STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Granting [68] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Hearing set for July 21, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 6/21/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Motion and Deadlines/Hearings as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain - Re [65] First MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief. Responses due by 6/29/2017. Replies due by 7/7/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017, Terminated: 6/21/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [65] First MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief . (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of AUSA Adam A. Reeves by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain June 16, 2017 Declaration of AUSA Adam A. Reeves (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 MEMORANDUM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM Memorandum in Support of United States' Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017, Terminated: 7/21/2017 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion to Issue Rule 17 Subpoenas and for Other Relief by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 5/17/17, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017. (Related documents(s) [62], [63]) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER EXCLUDING TIME FROM MAY 10, 2017 TO JANUARY 29, 2018: Granting [60] Stipulation as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1). Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 5/15/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017, Terminated: 5/15/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain Re: Exclusion of Time from May 10, 2017 to January 29, 2018 filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain held on 5/10/2017 - Re [44] MOTION Brady Order filed by Sushovan Tareque Hussain - Motion Denied for the reasons stated on the record; Re [41] Motion for Bill of Particulars; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Sushovan Tareque Hussain - Motion Denied for the reasons stated on the record; Re [42] Motion for Disclosure OF GRAND JURY COLLOQUY AND SUMMARY TESTIMONY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Sushovan Tareque Hussain - Motion Denied for the reasons stated on the record; Re [45] Motion for an Order Directing the Government to Review the Files of Hewlett-Packard and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius filed by Sushovan Tareque Hussain - Motion Denied without Prejudice for the reasons stated on the record. Defendant's appearance is waived for the motion hearing in July, 2017 and September, 2017. Jury Trial set for 1/29/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Selection date to be determined. Discovery Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Rule 12 Motion Hearing set for September 20, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (Total Time in Court: 30 Minutes) Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam Reeves and Robert Leach. Defendant Attorney: John Keker, Jane Little and Brook Dooley. Probation Officer: N/A. Pretrial Officer: N/A. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. Excludable Delay for effective preparation of counsel. Begins: May 10, 2017. Ends: January 29, 2018. This is a text-only Minute Entry, (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: 5/10/2017 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Arraignment as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1) Count 1s,2s-15s,16s held on 5/10/2017 FTR Time 9:35 - 9:36. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [52] Superseding Indictment. Arraignment set for 5/10/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)5/9/17: placed on calendar by AUSA Adam Reeves.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [45] MOTION for an Order Directing the Government to Review the Files of Hewlett-Packard and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [44] MOTION Brady Order (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [41] MOTION for Bill of Particulars ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Sushovan Tareque Hussain re [42] MOTION for Disclosure OF GRAND JURY COLLOQUY AND SUMMARY TESTIMONY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-15s, 16s. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Adam A. Reeves in Opposition to [48] Memorandum in Opposition, [47] Memorandum in Opposition, [49] Memorandum in Opposition, [50] Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Hussain re [45] MOTION for an Order Directing the Government to Review the Files of Hewlett-Packard and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Hussain re [41] MOTION for Bill of Particulars ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Hussain (Leach, Robert) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition by USA as to Sushovan Hussain re [44] MOTION Brady Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Leach, Robert) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Brook Dooley in Support of [44] MOTION Brady Order , [45] MOTION for an Order Directing the Government to Review the Files of Hewlett-Packard and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius by Sushovan Hussain as to Sushovan Hussain (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017, Terminated: 5/10/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for an Order Directing the Government to Review the Files of Hewlett-Packard and Morgan, Lewis & Bockius by Sushovan Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017, Terminated: 5/10/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Brady Order by Sushovan Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of KATE E. LAZARUS in Support of [41] MOTION for Bill of Particulars ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, [42] MOTION for Disclosure OF GRAND JURY COLLOQUY AND SUMMARY TESTIMONY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Sushovan Hussain as to Sushovan Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017, Terminated: 5/10/2017 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Disclosure OF GRAND JURY COLLOQUY AND SUMMARY TESTIMONY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Sushovan Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017, Terminated: 5/10/2017 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Bill of Particulars ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Sushovan Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Granting [39] Stipulation as to Sushovan Hussain (1). Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 4/26/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017, Terminated: 4/26/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain [Proposed] Second Amended Protective Order filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: 4/24/2017, Terminated: 4/26/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain Stipulation Regarding [Proposed] Second Amended Protective Order filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Firm Name and Email Address Change by Sushovan Hussain (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER EXCLUDING TIME FROM JANUARY 12, 2017 TO MAY 10, 2017: Granting [35] Stipulation as to Sushovan Hussain (1). Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 1/30/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017, Terminated: 1/30/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Excluding Time from January 12, 2017 to May 10, 2017 filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Hussain held on January 12, 2017, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2017. (Related documents(s) [24]) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain - Re [28] Proposed Order filed by Sushovan Hussain. Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 1/18/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER HEARING as to Sushovan Hussain set for January 18, 2017 before the Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [29] Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Protective Order by Sushovan Hussain (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Brook Dooley in Support of [29] Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Protective Order by Sushovan Hussain as to Sushovan Hussain (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017, Terminated: 1/18/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Protective Order by Sushovan Hussain. (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [27] MOTION to Amend/Correct (Unopposed Motion to Amend Protective Order) by Sushovan Hussain (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017, Terminated: 1/18/2017 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct (Unopposed Motion to Amend Protective Order) by Sushovan Hussain. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Protective Order, # (2) Exhibit B - Redlined Proposed Amended Protective Order, # (3) Exhibit C - Letter)(Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document as to Sushovan Hussain (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/13/17. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Belle Ball (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017, Terminated: 4/26/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain re Bond Order. (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: Arraignment as to Sushovan Hussain (1) Count 1,2-15 held on 1/12/2017. FTR Time 9:41 - 9:50. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference as to Sushovan Hussain held on 1/12/2017. Court directed counsel to meet and confer to discuss specificity of the case. Counsel shall draft a full motion schedule and trial schedule. Trial Setting Hearing set for 5/10/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Total Time in Court 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Leach and Adam Reeves. Defendant Attorney: John Keker, Jan Little and Brooke Dooley. Probation Officer: N/A. Pretrial Officer: N/A. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. Excludable Delay for effective preparation of counsel and due to the complexity of the case. Begins: 1/12/2017. Ends: 5/10/2017. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Certification of Organizational Victim by USA as to Sushovan Hussain (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: Granting [16] Stipulation as to Sushovan Hussain (1). Signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 1/11/2017. (ls, COURT STAFF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ian Asher Kanig appearing for Sushovan Hussain (Kanig, Ian) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kate Ellis Lazarus appearing for Sushovan Hussain (Lazarus, Kate) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/10/2017, Terminated: 1/11/2017 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order filed by USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/22/2016 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 12/21/16. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain [12]. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 12/21/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: 12/19/2016, Terminated: 12/21/2016 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain . (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: 12/5/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Debra Pas (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings as to Sushovan Hussain held on 11-18-2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2017. (Related documents(s) [8]) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Adam A. Reeves appearing for USA. (Reeves, Adam) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Debra Pas (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas David Marais appearing for Sushovan Hussain (Marais, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brook Dooley appearing for Sushovan Hussain (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jan Nielsen Little appearing for Sushovan Hussain (Little, Jan) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Watkins Keker appearing for Sushovan Hussain (Keker, John) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Bond Entered as to Sushovan Hussain in amount of $ 1000,. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 11/21/16. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/21/2016 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Bond Hearing as to Sushovan Hussain held on 11/18/2016 Arraignment set for 1/12/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Status Conference set for 1/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Total Time in Court 15. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Sushovan Hussain (1) count(s) 1, 2-15. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2016: # (1) cover page) (lskS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 240 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?