SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Saint Family Limited Partnership
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00567

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 4, 2021 at 7:02 PM DT (3.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Reply Brief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Proposed Summons
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Reply Brief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Response
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Amend Scheduling Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Amend Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Response to Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order GRANTING 28 Defendants' Motion to Correct by Supplementing Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response. The lengthy indented paragraph on pages 2 and 3of the Motion to Correct is substituted for the fourth paragraph of Section II.A. of Defendants Reply [doc. 24] as found on pages 11 and 12. 10 MOTION to Dismiss Each Count or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement of Count Three and Motion for Court to Abstain or in the Alternative Stay Proceedings is DENIED in its entirety. Defendants' Answers are due on or before 5/15/2017. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 5/1/2017. (srd)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?