WHITLEY v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02270

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 3, 2017 at 11:42 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLESTON E. WHITLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLESTON E. WHITLEY
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK OBAMA"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD JOHN TRUMP"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON, Defendant
No Logo MARTHA STEWART, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL BLOOMBERG"
No Logo WARREN BUFFETT, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM JEFFERSON CLINTON, Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Pro Se Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/16/2016. (jd) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHARLESTON E. WHITLEY (jd) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT against MICHAEL BLOOMBERG, WARREN BUFFETT, HILLARY RODHAM CLINTON, WILLIAM JEFFERSON CLINTON, BARACK OBAMA, MARTHA STEWART, DONALD JOHN TRUMP (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by CHARLESTON E. WHITLEY. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jd) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 47 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?