Telaxis Comm. IPO, et al v. Telaxis, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05267
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 23, 2016 at 1:10 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Danielle Katz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
No Logo Scott Swindle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Albert A. Paladino, Defendant
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeehae Jennifer Koh +1 212 326 2194 +1 212 326 2061 jkoh@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Joseph Merrick +1 212 326 4450 +1 212 326 2061 mmerrick@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan D. Polkes +1 212 504 6021 +1 212 504 6666 jonathan.polkes@weil.com
No Logo Cibc World Markets Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Dennis C. Stempel, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas W. Henkin +1 212 408 2520 +1 212 259 2520 douglas.henkin@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP (NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David B. Gordon +1 917 546 7701 +1 917 546 7671 dbg@msk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Deutsche Bank Capital Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Sec., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo John L. Youngblood, Defendant
No Logo Telaxis Communications Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Lyle Paquette, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Atlas, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Mazzarese Family Trust, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Stephen Inglis, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Guibard, Gaetan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address of Brian E. Pastuszenski and Inez H. Friedman-Boyce. Document filed by Telaxis Communications Corporation. (Simes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint filed by Scott Swindle.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by Deutsche Banc Alex., Deutsche Bank to [22-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Firm: Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by CIBC World Markets to [22-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Scott D. Musoff from the Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [22-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:38 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by Banc of America to [22-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Jonathan D. Polkes from the Firm: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTY AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; substituting Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft (Jonathan D. Polkes appearing) in place of Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP (Kenneth J. King appearing) as attys for deft Banc of America Securities LLC in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Telaxis by Gail Myrick, Asst. to Corp. Counsel, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Dennis C. Stempel by Gail Myrick, Asst. to Corp. Council, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to John L. Youngblood by Gail Myrick, Asst. to Corp. Council, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Banc of America by Florence Denning, Legal Asst., on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Scott Swindle amending [20-1] amended complaint ; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ERRATA to consolidated amended class action complaint for violations of the Federal Securities Laws by Scott Swindle to striking, adding & replacing paragraphs as set forth in this document. (sac) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by Scott Swindle amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              REVISED LIST OF CASES BY COUNSEL; purs. to Item I(A) of this Court's Order dated 8/8/01, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP and Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to appear as counsel for Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Banc of America. (sac) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Chase. (kkc) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by CIBC World Markets. (kkc) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      STIPULATION and ORDER; that the time for defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Telaxis Communications Corporation, Albert E. Paladino, John L. Youngblood, Dennis C. Stempel, CIBC World Markets Corp., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., and J.P. Morgan Chase to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action be extended until after the Court appoints lead plaintiff(s) and lead counsel pursuant to a schedule agreed upon by the parties or otherwise set by the Court ; within 14 days after the Court has appointed lead plaintiff and lead counsel, the parties will confer and submit to the Court a schedule for the filing of a consolidated or amended complaint, if any, and defendants' responses thereto . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (kkc) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER,... that all cases involving Telaxis in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-05735 and 1:01-cv-06274) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 5267. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 5267 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05267 Document No. 14. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05735; 1:01-cv-06274] (dcap) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Banc of America. (sac) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (sac) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Telaxis . (bai) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time which defts Telaxis Communications Corp., John L. Youngblood, and Dennis C. Stempel must answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended until 45 days after the later of: (a) the Court's selection of a lead pltff purs. to 77z-1(a)(3) of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. 77a et. seq. as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, or (b) if this action is consolidated with one or more other actions, Defts' receipt of any consolidated amended complaint. If defts move to dismiss the complaint or any consolidated amended complaint, pltff shall have 45 days from the receipt of defts' motion to file an opposition, and defts shall have the right to file a reply brief within 30 days from the receipt of such opposition. Defts have advised pltff that they intend to move to dismiss the complaint. In accordance with 77z-1(b)(1-4) of the Securities Act of 1933, the parties agree that all discovery (including third party subpoenas) shall and hereby will be stayed pending submission and resolution of defts' motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) Modified on 08/28/2001 (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER; that the time for deft CIBC World Markets Corporation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action be extended until 45 days after the Court appoints lead pltffs and lead counsel purs. to a schedule agreed upon by the parties or otherwise set by the Court, or 60 days after the service of a consolidating amended complaint, if any, whichever is later . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (jp) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/23/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for defts Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. and CIBC World Markets Corp. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 45 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. by Mazzarese Family, Scott Swindle in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05267, 1:01-cv-05735 and 1:01-cv-06274, [5-2] motion to appoint Mazzarese Family and Scott Swindle to serve as lead plaintiffs, [5-3] motion to approve Mazzarese Family and Scott Swindle's selection of Bernstein Liebhard and Schiffrin & Barroway as counsel for the Class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-13-01 at 6:39 P.M.] [Original filed 1:01-cv-05267 Document Number 7. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05735; 1:01-cv-06274] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Mazzarese Family, Scott Swindle in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05267, 1:01-cv-05735 and 1:01-cv-06274, [5-2] motion to appoint Mazzarese Family and Scott Swindle to serve as lead plaintiffs, [5-3] motion to approve Mazzarese Family and Scott Swindle's selection of Bernstein Liebhard and Schiffrin & Barroway as counsel for the Class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-13-01 at 6:38 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05267 Document Number 6. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05735; 1:01-cv-06274] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Mazzarese Family, Scott Swindle to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-05267, 1:01-cv-05735 and 1:01-cv-06274 , and to appoint Mazzarese Family and Scott Swindle to serve as lead plaintiffs , and to approve Mazzarese Family and Scott Swindle's selection of Bernstein Liebhard and Schiffrin & Barroway as counsel for the Class . No Return Date. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 08-13-01 at 6:38 P.M.] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05267 Document Number 5. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-05735; 1:01-cv-06274] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for CIBC World Markets by Jay B. Kasner, Scott D. Musoff. (cd) (Entered: 08/13/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassinged to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 10/31/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Telaxis, John L. Youngblood, Dennis C. Stempel for an Order pursuant to Rule 1.3(c) of the Local Rules permitting Brian E. Pastuszenski to appear pro hac vice , for permission for Amy McCallen to appear pro hac vice , and for permission for Richard Myrus to appear pro hac vice . Return date not indicated. Affidavits of Michael Luskin, Brian E. Pastuszenski, Amy McCallen, Richard Myrus, and Proposed Order are attached. (tp) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 408534. (jco) (Entered: 06/13/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?