Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
374 |
Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Amended (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit on Burnham Securities, Inc.)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
373 |
Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Jon Michael Burnham served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018; Burnham Securities Inc served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit on Burnham Securities)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
372 |
Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, Michelin Retirement Plan, as to defendant Greenberg Traurig LLP with prejudice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 11/28/2018 to add text (gpre, ). (Entered: 11/26/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
370 |
Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Withdrawal of Motions: 366 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bevan T Cooney.. (Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
369 |
Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 254 Clerk's Entry of Default, 368 Order on Motion for Copies, 1 Complaint, 242 Request for Entry of Default, Court's Copy Policy, placed in U.S. Mail to Gary T Hirst (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
368 |
Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 367 motion for copies at no expense. The Clerk is directed to send Gary T. Hirst a copy of the request for entry of default as to Hirst [Doc. 242] with all attachments, as well as a copy of the Clerk's entry of default [Doc. 254] and the Complaint [Doc. 1]. The Clerk is also directed to send Hirst a copy of the Clerk's Office copy policy, which will apply to any future requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/15/2018.(gpre, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
367 |
Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Copies at no expense by Gary T Hirst. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
366 |
Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bevan T Cooney. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
365 |
Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Ganss Drawdy on behalf of Jon Michael Burnham (Drawdy, Sarah) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
364 |
Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A Byrholdt on behalf of Jon Michael Burnham (Byrholdt, Bruce) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
363 |
Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/14/2018 10:00 AM canceled.(gpre, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
362 |
Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The re 360 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Greenberg Traurig on pro se Defendant Gary T. Hirst (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
360 |
Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
359 |
Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 358 Notice of Hearing placed in U.S. Mail to Gary T Hirst for information purposes only. (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
358 |
Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/14/2018 10:00 AM in Greenville #1, Clement F Haynsworth Fed Bldg, 300 E Washington St, Greenville before Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin. (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
357 |
Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 355 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Gary T Hirst (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
355 |
Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/31/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/31/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/1/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/15/2019, Discovery due by 5/15/2019, Motions due by 5/31/2019, Mediation Due by 6/1/2019, Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/2/2018. (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
352 |
Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 351 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 350 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Gary T Hirst (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
351 |
Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 333 motion for extension of time. Defendant Greenberg Taurig, LLP's response pleading is due by November 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/2/2018.(gpre, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
350 |
Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER denying as moot 329 motion for extension of time to file answer re 222 Intervenor Complaint by Gary T. Hirst in light of the fact that Gary T. Hirst has filed his answer prior to the deadline for which he is seeking an extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/2/2018.(gpre, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
348 |
Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 329 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Response filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/7/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Gary T. Hirst)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
347 |
Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 344 345 346 by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Gary T. Hirst)(Dudley, Thomas) Modified on 10/31/2018 to link to associated documents (gpre, ). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
346 |
Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Jason W Galanis served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Proof of Service)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
345 |
Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Hugh Dunkerly served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
344 |
Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. BFG Socially Responsible Investments Ltd served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
343 |
Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Gary T. Hirst)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
342 |
Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
PRO SE ANSWER to 222 Intervenor Complaint by Gary T Hirst. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(abuc) Modified on 10/30/2018 to correct date filed (gpre, ). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
341 |
Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Letter from Kenison, Dudley & Crawford, LLC. (Dudley, Thomas) (Main Document 341 replaced on 10/24/2018: to replace with correct document as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 10/24/2018: # 1 Letter to Gary T Hirst) (kmca). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
340 |
Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust re 336 Summons Returned Executed, 337 Summons Returned Executed, 338 Summons Returned Executed, 339 Summons Returned Executed (Dudley, Thomas) (Main Document 340 replaced on 10/24/2018: to replace with correct document as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 10/24/2018: # 1 Certificate of Service) (kmca). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
339 |
Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company Ltd served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. (Dudley, Thomas) (Main Document 339 replaced on 10/24/2018: to replace with correct document as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 10/24/2018: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company Ltd) (kmca). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
338 |
Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. John P Galanis served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Dudley, Thomas) (Main Document 338 replaced on 10/24/2018: to replace with correct document as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment) added on 10/24/2018: # 1 Proof of Service on John P Galanis) (kmca). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
337 |
Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Burnham Financial Group Inc served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Dudley, Thomas) (Main Document 337 replaced on 10/24/2018: to replace with correct document as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 10/24/2018: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Burnham Financial Group Inc) (kmca). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
336 |
Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Gary T Hirst served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Dudley, Thomas) (Main Document 336 replaced on 10/24/2018: to replace with correct document as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 10/24/2018: # 1 Affidavit of Service for Gary T Hirst) (kmca). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
335 |
Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 333 Motion by Greenberg Traurig LLP (Coates, William) Modified on 10/22/2018: to add link to 333 Motion (kmca). (Entered: 10/19/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
334 |
Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 332 Order, Public Docket Sheet, placed in U.S. Mail to Gary T Hirst (gpre, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
333 |
Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 11/1/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Coates, William) Modified on 10/22/2018: see 335 Certificate of Service (kmca). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
332 |
Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER to Pro Se Defendant Gary T. Hirst directing defendant to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/18/2018. (gpre, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
330 |
Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin pursuant to LR 73.02. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(abuc) Modified on 10/17/2018 to edit text (gpre, ). (Entered: 10/17/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
329 |
Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 222 Intervenor COMPLAINT, by Gary T Hirst. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(abuc) Modified to edit text on 10/19/2018 and to fix entry relation on 11/1/2018 (abuc). (Entered: 10/17/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
327 |
Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
326 |
Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
325 |
Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re 302 MOTION to Change Venue Response filed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dilworth 8-25-14 Opinion Letter, # 2 Exhibit Unpublished Opinions) Refiled to correct event type.(abuc) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
324 |
Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 321 motion for extension of time. Defendant Greenberg Taurig, LLP's response pleading is due by October 19, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/10/2018.(abuc) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
323 |
Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
321 |
Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Main Document 321 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 10/10/2018) (abuc). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
320 |
Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 316 motion for extension of time. Defendant Frankie D. Hughes's response to the motion to transfer venue is due by October 9, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/5/2018.(abuc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
318 |
Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 314 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust's reply to its motion to change venue is due by October 12, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/5/2018.(abuc) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
317 |
Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
316 |
Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 302 MOTION to Change Venue by Frankie D Hughes. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
315 |
Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re 301 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) Response filed by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Form 5500 excerpt)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
314 |
Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 302 MOTION to Change Venue, 311 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
313 |
Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 307 motion for extension of time. Defendant Greenberg Traurig LLP's response to the motion to transfer venue is due by October 5, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/1/2018.(abuc) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
312 |
Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 310 motion for extension of time. Defendant Hughes's response to the Motion to Transfer Venue is due by October 5, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/1/2018.(abuc) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
311 |
Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 302 MOTION to Change Venue Response filed by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/5/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Unpublished Decisions, # 2 Exhibit 2 Trust Indenture dated August 25, 2014, # 3 Exhibit 3 Wakpamni Lake Bond issued August 25, 2014, # 4 Exhibit 4 Bonds issued to Michelin North America Master Trust and The Water Works Board of the City of Birmingham Water, # 5 Exhibit 5 Letter to Hugh Dunkerley from Timothy B. Anderson dated June 13, 2014)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
310 |
Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 302 MOTION to Change Venue by Frankie D Hughes. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
309 |
Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 301 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) Response filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/4/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Engagement Ltr, # 2 Exhibit B, Opinion Ltr, # 3 Exhibit C, Annuity Contract, # 4 Exhibit D, Investment Management Agmnt, # 5 Exhibit E, Trust Indenture, # 6 Exhibit F, Closing Statement, # 7 Exhibit G, Wiring Instructions, # 8 Exhibit H, Supp Indenture, # 9 Exhibit I, Closing Statement, # 10 Exhibit J, SEC Complaint, # 11 Exhibit K, Placement Agency Agmnt, # 12 Exhibit L, Purchase Ltr, # 13 Exhibit M, Distribution List, # 14 Exhibit N, Opinion Ltr, # 15 Exhibit O, MNA Retirement Plan, # 16 Exhibit P, Hughes IMA)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
308 |
Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 306 motion for extension of time. Defendant Greenberg Traurig LLP's responsive pleading is due by October 12, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/26/2018.(abuc) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
307 |
Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
306 |
Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 10/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
305 |
Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to Complaint by Michelle A Morton.(Bradley, J) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
304 |
Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Michelle A Morton. (Bradley, J) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
303 |
Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
302 |
Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Change Venue by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Response to Motion due by 10/1/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support Motion for Change of Venue, # 2 Exhibit 1 Westlaw Citation Water Works v. City of Birmingham v. US Bank National, # 3 Exhibit 2 Second Circuit Comparison of Districts )No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin(Dudley, Thomas) Modified to add descriptions to attachments provided by filing user on 9/18/2018 (abuc). Modified to edit text on 10/19/2018 (abuc). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
301 |
Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. Response to Motion due by 9/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit Criminal Trial Transcript Excerpts 16 CR 371 (RA), # 3 Exhibit Criminal Trial Verdict dated June 28, 2018 16 CR 371 (RA), # 4 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, # 5 Exhibit Trust Indenture, Section 12.4, p. 44, # 6 Exhibit Wakpamni Lake Bond dated August 25, 2014, # 7 Exhibit Criminal Trial Transcript Excerpts 16 CR 371 (RA), # 8 Exhibit Affidavit of Patrick M. Northen dated September 5, 2018, # 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Timothy B. Anderson dated September 5, 2018, # 10 Exhibit Letter dated June 13, 2014, # 11 Exhibit Letter dated August 25, 2014)No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Babcock, Keith) Modified to edit text on 10/19/2018 (abuc). (Entered: 09/14/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
300 |
Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 299 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Anne P Ray terminated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/13/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
299 |
Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Anne P. Ray by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
297 |
Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER lifting the stay in this case except as to Defendant Cooney. Based on the status report filed on September 7, 2018, the intervenor plaintiff has until September 17, 2018, to file any appropriate motions. In the event that the intervenor plaintiff files a motion to change venue, the defendants will have until 14 days after the Court issues an order on that motion to file their appropriate motions or responsive pleadings. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 9/10/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
296 |
Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
295 |
Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Minute Entry: The Court held a status conference with the parties in Chambers. Intervenor Plaintiff Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust is to submit a status report by September 7, 2018. Thereafter, the Court will lift the stay on September 10, 2018. Defendants will then have until October 1, 2018, to file any appropriate motions, and the parties are to meet and confer and submit a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by October 10, 2018. (alew, ) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
294 |
Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for Wednesday, 8/15/2018 02:00 PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. in chambers.(alew, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
292 |
Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Bevan T Cooney. (Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
291 |
Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Michelle A Morton. (Bradley, J) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
290 |
Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust and by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
289 |
Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Frankie D Hughes. (Traxler, Thomas) (Main Document 289 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 8/3/2018) (abuc). (Entered: 08/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
288 |
Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Greenberg Traurig LLP. (Coates, William) Modified on 8/2/2018 to correct filer per t/c from filing user (sfla). (Entered: 08/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
287 |
Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
286 |
Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER directing the parties to submit a status report regarding the continued need for a stay in this case by August 3, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/22/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
285 |
Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 282 Reason: Refiled by filing user to correct entry. Corrected Filing Document Number 284 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 06/18/2018 Response due date modified to that of original filing: n/a (abuc) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
284 |
Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT Brief in Response to Court Order of June 11, 2018 (ECF No. 281) by Michelle A Morton. (Bradley, J) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
283 |
Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Devon D Archer. (Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
281 |
Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER directing the parties who have indicated their opposition to lifting the stay in this case to brief the basis for their opposition, if any, to lifting the stay on July 9, 2018. The briefing must be filed with this Court by June 18, 2018. Please note that the stay would continue as to Defendant Bevan T. Cooney. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/11/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
280 |
Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Devon D Archer. (Dean, Kelly) (Main Document 280 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 6/4/2018) (abuc). (Entered: 06/04/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
279 |
Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Michelle A Morton. (Bradley, J) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
278 |
Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 277 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/30/2018.(abuc) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
277 |
Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Riley Storino ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7804865) by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 6/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission - John Riley Storino)No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
276 |
Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER: based on the status report filed May 21, 2018, it appears that it may be appropriate for the Court to lift the stay in this case. If any party has not filed a status report since May 21, 2018, and opposes the lifting of the stay, they are directed to submit a status report outlining their position to this Court by June 8, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/29/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
275 |
Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
274 |
Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Frankie D Hughes. (Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
273 |
Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust and by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
272 |
Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
271 |
Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Greenberg Traurig LLP. (Coates, William) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
270 |
Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Michelle A Morton. (Bradley, J) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
269 |
Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Frankie D Hughes. (Traxler, Thomas) (Main Document 269 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 3/23/2018) (abuc). (Entered: 03/23/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
268 |
Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust and by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
266 |
Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER continuing the stay in this case for the reasons articulated in the Order of the Honorable Henry M. Herlong, Jr., United States District Judge for the District of South Carolina, ECF. No. 255, and based on the representations made in Defendant Michelle Morton's status report, ECF No. 263, regarding her scheduled criminal trial. The parties are directed to continue to provide a status report to the Court every 60 days until further ordered otherwise. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/26/2018. (abuc) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
264 |
Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Donald C. Coggins, Jr.. (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
263 |
Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Michelle A Morton. (Bradley, J) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
262 |
Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by J Edward Bradley on behalf of Michelle A Morton (Bradley, J) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
261 |
Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Greenberg Traurig LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Coates, William) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
260 |
Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust and by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Correct Main Document replaced as provided by filing user on 1/22/2018) (gpre, ). (Entered: 01/22/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
259 |
Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
258 |
Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 257 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton. (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
257 |
Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
256 |
Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 255 Order, Set Deadlines,, placed in U.S. Mail to pro se party Morton (sfla) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
255 |
Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
OPINION and ORDER continuing the stay in this action at this time. Theparties are to provide a status report to the court every 60 days until further ordered otherwise. (First Status Report due by 1/22/2018). Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/21/17. (sfla) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
254 |
Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gary T Hirst. (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
250 |
Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 247 Reason: "Court Only Entry" deleted at the direction of JDA chambers. (gpre, ) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
249 |
Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Pro Se Michelle A Morton. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(gpre, ) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
248 |
Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The re 244 Status Report (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
246 |
Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Frankie D Hughes. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
245 |
Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
244 |
Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
STATUS REPORT --Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust and by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
242 |
Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Gary T. Hirst byInvestment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter Requesting Waiver of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Gary T. Hirst, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
241 |
Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 239 Order Staying Case, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton. (gpre, ) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
239 |
Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER STAYING CASE: Defendant Bevan Cooney ("Cooney") has filed a Suggestion of Bankruptcy informing the Court that, on June 20, 2017, he filed a bankruptcy case in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Michigan (Case No. 17-03016-jwb). Consequently, this action is automatically stayed under 11 U.S.C. 362(a) pending resolution of the bankruptcy case or further Order of this Court. Cooney is directed to notify the Court within three days of resolution of his bankruptcy case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/18/17. (sfla) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 236 Reason: Refiled by clerk to correct event type. Corrected Filing Document Number 237 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 8/15/2017. (gpre, ) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
237 |
Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record AND EFFECT OF AUTOMATIC STAY by Bevan T Cooney. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service-Michelle A. Morton)(gpre, )Refiled by clerk to correct event type. (gpre, ). (Entered: 08/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
235 |
Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Gary T Hirst served on 8/3/2017, answer due 8/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Gary T. Hirst, # 2 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
- Attachment 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Gary T. Hirst
- Attachment 2 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
233 |
Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 232 Order on Motion to Withdraw, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A Morton (kmca) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
232 |
Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 228 Motion to Withdraw Haley N. Schaffer as Counsel for US Bank National Association. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/1/17.(kmca) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
231 |
Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 226 & 227 Reason: Refiled corrected documents. Corrected Filing Document Number 230 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 7/18/2017 (gpre, ) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
230 |
Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to 222 Intervenor Complaint by Jon Michael Burnham. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service of Answer to Intervening Complaint on Defendant Michelle Morton)(Hanis, Emily) Modified on 7/24/2017 to correct date filed (gpre, ). (Entered: 07/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
228 |
Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Withdraw Haley N. Schaffer as Consel for US Bank National Association by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
225 |
Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document Letter to Plaintiffs counsel)(Coates, William) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
224 |
Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust re 223 Summons Issued, 222 Intervenor Complaint (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
223 |
Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (abuc) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
222 |
Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Summons) (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
221 |
Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 218 Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation,,,, placed in U.S. Mail to PRO SE Plaintiff (sfla) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
218 |
Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER RULING ON and ADOPTING 203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: GRANTING 87 Motion to Intervene filed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part as set out 30 Motion to Stay, Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Michelle A Morton; GRANTING as set out 62 Motion to Stay filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, Michelin Retirement Plan; DENYING with leave to refile 67 Motion to Dismiss filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP; DENYING with leave to refile 91 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP; DENYING with leave to refile 200 Motion to Dismiss filed by COR Fund Advisors LLC. The parties are ordered to submit a status report to the Court no later than 9/30/17, and this case is remanded to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/12/17. (sfla) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
217 |
Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The to 211 Objection to Report and Recommendation,, of Defendant Timothy B. Anderson and Dilworth Paxson, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Major, Denny) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
216 |
Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The to 209 Objection to Report and Recommendation, of Defendant Greenberg Traurig, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Major, Denny) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
215 |
Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Keith Moss Babcock for 6/30/17 - 7/07/17 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
OBJECTION to 203 Report and Recommendation by COR Fund Advisors LLC. Reply to Objections due by 6/7/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
212 |
Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 62 MOTION to Stay filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The, 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP, 200 MOTION to Response filed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/31/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
211 |
Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
OBJECTION to 203 Report and Recommendation by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. Reply to Objections due by 6/7/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Unpublished Opinions, # 2 Exhibit B Final Order of Forfeiture, # 3 Exhibit C Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, # 4 Exhibit D Letter Dated 08/12/16, # 5 Exhibit E Order Approving Third Revised Joint Plan of Distribution, # 6 Certificate of Service Upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
209 |
Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
OBJECTION to 203 Report and Recommendation by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Reply to Objections due by 6/6/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents Graham-White v. Ell-Con Nat., Inc. (Westlaw), # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service on Pro Se Defendant)(Coates, William) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
- Attachment 1 Supporting Documents Graham-White v. Ell-Con Nat., Inc. (Westlaw)
- Attachment 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service on Pro Se Defendant
|
|
|
 |
|
|
207 |
Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 206 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
206 |
Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 205 consent motion for extension of time. Should the Court adopt the pending Report and Recommendation (Doc. 203), Plaintiffs' response to COR Fund Advisors, LLC's motion to dismiss will become moot; however, should the Court decline to adopt the Report and Recommendation, Plaintiffs should file their response to Document ECF # 200 within ten days of the Court's ruling on the Report and Recommendation. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 5/18/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
205 |
Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 200 MOTION to Dismiss by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Response to Motion due by 5/30/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
204 |
Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 62 MOTION to Stay filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The, 67 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP, 200 MOTION to placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
203 |
Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommends that the motions to stay (Docs. 30 62 ) be GRANTED. The undersigned recommends that Plaintiffs provide the Court with a status update in sixty days with respect to the $43,277,436 monetary judgment and forfeiture in Jasons criminal action, and with respect to the adoption of the Distribution Plan in SEC v. AAM, informing the Court whether restitution has been received to alleviate or reduce the damages sought in this action. Further, the undersigned recommends that all remaining motions (Docs. 67 87 91 200 ) be DENIED,with leave to re-file. Objections to R&R due by 5/24/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 5/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to File Objection)(gpre, ) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
201 |
Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Denny Parker Major on behalf of Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Major, Denny) (Main Document replaced with converted PDF on 5/8/2017) (gpre, ). (Entered: 05/05/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
200 |
Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Dismiss by COR Fund Advisors LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dean, Kelly) Modified on 5/5/2017: to remove duplicate text (kmca). (Entered: 05/04/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
199 |
Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 198 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 197 Order on Motion to Set Aside Default, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton. (gpre, ) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
198 |
Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 196 motion for extension of time to serve complaint. Plaintiffs shall effect service on Defendant Hirst by August 7, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 4/24/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
197 |
Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 134 motion to set aside Clerk's entry of default by COR Fund Advisors, LLC. COR Fund Advisors is required to respond to the Complaint by May 4, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 4/24/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
196 |
Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Response to Motion due by 5/5/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Waiver Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - Non-Service Affidavits and Statements, # 3 Exhibit C - Summons in SDNY, # 4 Exhibit D - Docket, Arrest Record and Bond Documents MDFL, # 5 Exhibit E - Sentencing Memo in SDNY, # 6 Exhibit F - Florida Property Card, # 7 Exhibit G - Sentencing Order SDNY, # 8 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
195 |
Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by William Alexander Coates for 7/20/17 - 7/31/17 (Coates, William) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
194 |
Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie D Hughes re 193 Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance July 7-26, 2017 and September 13-18, 2017 (Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
193 |
Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Thomas Wooten Traxler for July 7-26, 2017 and September 13-18, 2017 (Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
186 |
Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant US Bank by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 4/3/2017: to add text-name of defendant (kmca). (Entered: 03/31/2017)
- Attachment 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
184 |
Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bevan T Cooney. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
183 |
Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Bevan T Cooney. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
182 |
Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The re 181 Answer to Counterclaim (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
181 |
Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to Counterclaim 139 of Frankie Hughes by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
180 |
Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copy of Unpublished Opinion, # 2 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
179 |
Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unpublished Decisions)(Coates, William) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
178 |
Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 177 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
177 |
Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER denying 175 motion for extension of time to file answer or respond to Complaint by Defendant Bevan Cooney. The Complaint in this action was filed on November 10, 2016. The Court has granted Defendant Cooney two previous extensions of time to answer or respond to the Complaint. [Docs. 103 , 142 .] The Court cannot find that an additional extension of time to answer or respond to the Complaint is warranted at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/24/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
176 |
Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bevan T Cooney re 175 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, (Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
175 |
Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Bevan T Cooney. Response to Motion due by 4/6/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Diane H. Bang)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
174 |
Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 173 Clerk's Entry of Default, 158 Clerk's Entry of Default, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A Morton (kmca) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
173 |
Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Wakpamni Lake Community Corp. (kmca) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
172 |
Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Wakpamni Lake Community Corp. byInvestment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter Requesting Waiver of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Wakpamni Lake Community Corp., # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
171 |
Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 164 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 168 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 170 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice placed in U.S. Mail to PRO SE Defendant (sfla, ) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
170 |
Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 169 Motion for Barry J. Friedberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jon Michael Burnham. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/20/17.(sfla, ) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
169 |
Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Barry J. Friedberg ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7058845) by Jon Michael Burnham. Response to Motion due by 4/3/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 2 Friedberg NY Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 4 Certificate of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Hanis, Emily) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
168 |
Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 167 Motion for Matthew L. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Devon D Archer, COR Fund Advisors LLC. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/20/17.(sfla) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
167 |
Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew L. Schwartz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7057073) by Devon D Archer, COR Fund Advisors LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/31/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Pro Hac Vice Application, # 2Schwartz NY COG, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dean, Kelly) Modified on 3/20/2017 to remove excess description on attachments (sfla). (Entered: 03/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
165 |
Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE to Motion re 134 MOTION to Set Aside Default Response filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/23/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
- Attachment 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
|
 |
|
|
164 |
Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 162 consent motion for extension of time to file response/reply to 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Defendants Dilworth and Anderson's reply to Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due by March 27, 2017. Replies are due by 3/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/14/17.(sfla) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
162 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 161 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. Response to Motion due by 3/27/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
161 |
Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/17/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Engagement Letter/Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B, 8.25.14 Opinion Letter, # 3 Exhibit C, Annuity Contract, # 4 Exhibit D, Investment Management Agreement, # 5 Exhibit E, Trust Indenture, # 6 Exhibit F, 8.25.14 Closing Statement, # 7 Exhibit G, 8.26.14 Email, # 8 Exhibit H, Supplemental Indenture, # 9 Exhibit I, 8.27.14 Closing Statement, # 10 Exhibit J, SEC v. Archer, et al Complaint, # 11 Exhibit K, Placement Agency Agreement, # 12 Exhibit L, 8.21.14 Letter, # 13 Exhibit M, Distribution List, # 14 Exhibit N, 8.27.14 Opinion Letter, # 15 Exhibit O, § 10.9 Michelin Retirement Plan, # 16 Exhibit P, Hughes/Michelin Investment Management Agreement, # 17 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
- Attachment 1 Exhibit A, Engagement Letter/Agreement
- Attachment 2 Exhibit B, 8.25.14 Opinion Letter
- Attachment 3 Exhibit C, Annuity Contract
- Attachment 4 Exhibit D, Investment Management Agreement
- Attachment 5 Exhibit E, Trust Indenture
- Attachment 6 Exhibit F, 8.25.14 Closing Statement
- Attachment 7 Exhibit G, 8.26.14 Email
- Attachment 8 Exhibit H, Supplemental Indenture
- Attachment 9 Exhibit I, 8.27.14 Closing Statement
- Attachment 10 Exhibit J, SEC v. Archer, et al Complaint
- Attachment 11 Exhibit K, Placement Agency Agreement
- Attachment 12 Exhibit L, 8.21.14 Letter
- Attachment 13 Exhibit M, Distribution List
- Attachment 14 Exhibit N, 8.27.14 Opinion Letter
- Attachment 15 Exhibit O, § 10.9 Michelin Retirement Plan
- Attachment 16 Exhibit P, Hughes/Michelin Investment Management Agreement
- Attachment 17 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton
|
|
|
 |
|
|
160 |
Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 159 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
159 |
Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 155 Defendant Greenberg Traurig, LLP's motion for extension of time to file reply to Plaintiff's Response to Greenberg's motion to dismiss. Greenberg's reply is due by March 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/10/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
158 |
Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Valor Group Ltd. (gpre, ) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
157 |
Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Valor Group Ltd. byInvestment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter Requesting Waiver of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Valor Group Ltd., # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
- Attachment 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum
- Attachment 2 Exhibit A, Letter Requesting Waiver of Summons
- Attachment 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Valor Group Ltd.
- Attachment 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
156 |
Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greenberg Traurig LLP re 155 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 150 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (Coates, William) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
155 |
Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 150 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 3/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Coates, William) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
153 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 148 Reason: Incorrect document attached. Corrected Filing Document Number 149 . Filed same date as original filing: 3/7/2017. (gpre, ) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
152 |
Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 151 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A Morton (kric, ) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
151 |
Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 146 consent motion for extension of time to file answer, move, or otherwise plead by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. U.S. Bank shall answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint by April 4, 2017. No additional extensions of time to file an answer will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/8/2017.(kric, ) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
150 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/14/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Annuity Contract, # 2 Exhibit B, Investment Management Agreement, # 3 Exhibit C, Trust Indenture, # 4 Exhibit D, 8.25.14 Closing Statement, # 5 Exhibit E, Supplemental Trust Indenture, # 6 Exhibit F, 8.27.14 Closing Statement, # 7 Exhibit G, SEC v. Archer, et al. Complaint, # 8 Exhibit H, Placement Agency Agreement, # 9 Exhibit I, 8.21.14 Letter, # 10 Exhibit J, 8.25.14 Opinion Letter, # 11 Exhibit K, Virginia Class Action Complaint, # 12 Exhibit L, Greenberg Billing Invoice, # 13 Exhibit M, Distribution List, # 14 Exhibit N, Resolution No. 14-120, # 15 Exhibit O, 7.29.14 Oglala Sioux Tribal Council Meeting Minutes, # 16 Exhibit P, Morton/Galanis Emails, # 17 Exhibit Q, 8.27.14 Opinion Letter, # 18 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
- Attachment 1 Exhibit A, Annuity Contract
- Attachment 2 Exhibit B, Investment Management Agreement
- Attachment 3 Exhibit C, Trust Indenture
- Attachment 4 Exhibit D, 8.25.14 Closing Statement
- Attachment 5 Exhibit E, Supplemental Trust Indenture
- Attachment 6 Exhibit F, 8.27.14 Closing Statement
- Attachment 7 Exhibit G, SEC v. Archer, et al. Complaint
- Attachment 8 Exhibit H, Placement Agency Agreement
- Attachment 9 Exhibit I, 8.21.14 Letter
- Attachment 10 Exhibit J, 8.25.14 Opinion Letter
- Attachment 11 Exhibit K, Virginia Class Action Complaint
- Attachment 12 Exhibit L, Greenberg Billing Invoice
- Attachment 13 Exhibit M, Distribution List
- Attachment 14 Exhibit N, Resolution No. 14-120
- Attachment 15 Exhibit O, 7.29.14 Oglala Sioux Tribal Council Meeting Minutes
- Attachment 16 Exhibit P, Morton/Galanis Emails
- Attachment 17 Exhibit Q, 8.27.14 Opinion Letter
- Attachment 18 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
|
 |
|
|
149 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Bank National Association re 146 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, CONSENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
148 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Bank National Association re 146 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, CONSENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND (Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
147 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 59 Clerk's Entry of Default, 51 Clerk's Entry of Default, 61 Clerk's Entry of Default, 144 Clerk's Entry of Default, 48 Clerk's Entry of Default placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
146 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or respond re 1 Complaint, by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 3/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) Modified on 3/7/2017 to remove duplicated text (gpre, ). (Entered: 03/07/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
145 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bevan T Cooney re 141 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond (Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
144 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hugh Dunkerly. (gpre, ) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
143 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 142 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
142 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 141 consent motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Defendant Cooney should answer, move or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint by March 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/6/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
141 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond by Bevan T Cooney. Response to Motion due by 3/20/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
140 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Frankie D Hughes. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
139 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Frankie D Hughes. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
138 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Hugh Dunkerley byInvestment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant Dunkerley with Request for Waiver of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Personal Service on Defendant Dunkerley, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
- Attachment 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum
- Attachment 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant Dunkerley with Request for Waiver of Summons
- Attachment 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Personal Service on Defendant Dunkerley
- Attachment 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
137 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The re 133 Summons Returned Executed, served on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
136 |
Filed: 3/5/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Jon Michael Burnham. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service of Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Hanis, Emily) (Entered: 03/05/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
135 |
Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY to Response to Motion re 87 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Copy of Unpublished Opinion, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 Copy of Unpublished Opinion, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A-3 Copy of Unpublished Opinion, # 4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of pro-se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
134 |
Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Set Aside Default by COR Fund Advisors LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/16/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
133 |
Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Defendant Wakpamni Lake Community Corp served on 2/28/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Wakpamni Lake Community Corp.)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
130 |
Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Support re 87 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
129 |
Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 87 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/2/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Dilworth Paxson LLP's and Timothy B. Anderson's Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims, # 2 Exhibit B - Copies of Unpublished Opinions, # 3 Exhibit C - Chicago Transit Authority Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation Bond, # 4 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
- Attachment 1 Exhibit A - Dilworth Paxson LLP's and Timothy B. Anderson's Memorandum
- Attachment 2 Exhibit B - Copies of Unpublished Opinions
- Attachment 3 Exhibit C - Chicago Transit Authority Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation Bond
- Attachment 4 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
127 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust re 87 MOTION to Intervene (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
126 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust re 87 MOTION to Intervene (Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
124 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 123 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 122 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (pro se defendant). (jtho, ) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
123 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 121 Plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs' response to 91 Defendants Dilworth Paxson, LLP, and Timothy B. Anderson's motion to dismiss is due March 10, 2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/17/17.(jtho, ) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
122 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 120 Plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to 67 Defendant Greenberg Traurig, LLP's motion to dismiss is due by March 7, 2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/17/17.(jtho, ) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
121 |
Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Defendant Timothy B. Anderson and Dilworth Paxson, LLP by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Response to Motion due by 3/2/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
120 |
Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 67 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Greenberg Traurig, LLP by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Response to Motion due by 3/2/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
119 |
Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Nelson to represent defendants Devon D. Archer, COR Fund Advisors LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/15/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
117 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Jon Michael Burnham.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/21/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hanis, Emily) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
116 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Defendant Jon Burnham's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, & Affirmative Defenses by Jon Michael Burnham. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hanis, Emily) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
115 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 113 Text Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 112 Text Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
114 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Sharpe Hanis on behalf of Jon Michael Burnham (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hanis, Emily) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
113 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wayne S. Moskowitz to represent US Bank National Association; granting 97 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard G. Wilson to represent US Bank National Association; granting 98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice John T. Duffey to represent US Bank National Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/14/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Aaron H Stanton to represent Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust; granting 86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric Peter VanderPloeg to represent Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/14/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
111 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by COR Fund Advisors LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/21/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
110 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D Dean on behalf of COR Fund Advisors LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
109 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Devon D Archer.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/21/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
108 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Nelson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6999594) by Devon D Archer. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents Pro Hac Vice Application, # 2 Supporting Documents Nelson FL COG, # 3 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
107 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 106 Notice Change of Case Number placed in U.S. Mail to PRO SE Defendant (sfla) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
106 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to 6:16cv3604-HMH-JDA. This case is currently managed from the Magistrate Judge desk. (sfla) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
105 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 104 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 103 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 100 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 102 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
104 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 99 Plaintiff's motion for a 90-day extension of time to serve the Summons and Complaint on Defendants Wakpamni Lake Community Corp. and Gary T. Hirst. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/13/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
103 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 94 Defendant Bevan Cooney's consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/13/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
102 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 89 Defendant Frankie Hughes' consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/13/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
101 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/21/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents Unpublished Case, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Coates, William) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
100 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer US Bank National Association answer due 3/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/1/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
99 |
Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Waiver Letters, # 2 Exhibit B, Affidavits of Service Attempts on Defendant Wakpamni Lake Community Corp, # 3 Exhibit C, Affidavits of Service Attempts on Defendant Gary T. Hirst, # 4 Exhibit D, Affidavit of Service Status on Foreign Defendant Wealth-Assurance AG, # 5 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
- Attachment 1 Exhibit A, Waiver Letters
- Attachment 2 Exhibit B, Affidavits of Service Attempts on Defendant Wakpamni Lake Community C
- Attachment 3 Exhibit C, Affidavits of Service Attempts on Defendant Gary T. Hirst
- Attachment 4 Exhibit D, Affidavit of Service Status on Foreign Defendant Wealth-Assurance AG
- Attachment 5 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
98 |
Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Duffey ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6993170) by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
97 |
Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard G. Wilson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6993149) by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
96 |
Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wayne S. Moskowitz ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6993118) by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 2/24/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
95 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Hugh Dunkerly served on 2/7/2017, answer due 2/28/2017; Valor Group Ltd served on 2/7/2017, answer due 2/28/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Hugh Dunkerley, # 2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Valor Group Ltd., # 3 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
- Attachment 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Hugh Dunkerley
- Attachment 2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Valor Group Ltd.
- Attachment 3 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
94 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Bevan T Cooney. Response to Motion due by 2/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
93 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Timothy B Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
92 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
91 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response to Motion due by 2/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Copies of Unpublished Opinions, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated 6/13/14, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of James W. Hennessey, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Timothy B. Anderson, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation Bond, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Trust Indenture, Section 12.4, p. 44, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Letter dated 8/25/14, # 9 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
90 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust.(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
89 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Frankie D Hughes. Response to Motion due by 2/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Fowler, Sherman) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
88 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Support re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Frankie D Hughes. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fowler, Sherman) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Intervene by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Response to Motion due by 2/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Complaint In Intervention)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dudley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
86 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron H. Stanton ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6990784) by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Response to Motion due by 2/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dudley, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2017: # 1 Application) (gpre, ). (Main Document 86 replaced on 2/9/2017) (gpre, ). (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
85 |
Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Peter VanderPloeg ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6990737) by Chicago Transit Authority Retiree Health Care Trust. Response to Motion due by 2/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Dudley, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2017: # 1 Application) (gpre, ). (Main Document 85 replaced on 2/9/2017) (gpre, ). (Entered: 02/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
84 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Bank National Association re 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AMENDED Consent Motion of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
83 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer AMENDED Consent Motion of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 2/22/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
82 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 81 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
81 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 73 Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's consent motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Defendant U.S. Bank National Association should file an answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint by February 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/8/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 75 Reason: Filed using incorrect event. Refiled by clerk to correct event type. Corrected Filing Document Number 79 (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Devon D Archer re 68 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories served on pro se defendant Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) Refiled by clerk to correct event type. (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
78 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/15/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Copy of Unpublished Opinion, # 2 Certificate of Service upon Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
77 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by Bevan T Cooney.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/15/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
76 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie D Hughes re 64 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Fowler, Sherman) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Filing of MDL Notice of Related Action by Devon D Archer Affidavit of Service on Morton (Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Bank National Association re 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Consent Motion of Defendant US Bank National Association for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) Modified on 2/8/2017 to remove duplicated text (gpre, ). (Entered: 02/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
72 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Bank National Association re 66 Response in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 69 Order placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER directing Defendants to respond to 62 , Plaintiff's motion to stay the action, by February 14, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/7/2017. (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Devon D Archer.(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Dismiss by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support of its Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A - Copies of Unpublished Decisions, # 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service - Pro Se Defendant Michelle Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Coates, William) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
- Attachment 1 Memo in Support of its Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss
- Attachment 2 Exhibit A - Copies of Unpublished Decisions
- Attachment 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service - Pro Se Defendant Michelle Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Support re 62 MOTION to Stay Response filed by US Bank National Association. (Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Stay MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Response filed by Frankie D Hughes.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/13/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Fowler, Sherman) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Stay MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Michelle A. Morton Response filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/13/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
- Attachment 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Stay by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B, Order Setting Schedule for Approval of Proposed Joint Plan of Distribution, # 4 Exhibit C, Revised Joint Plan of Distribution, # 5 Exhibit D, Order Postponing Approval Hearing until February 24, 2017, # 6 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
- Attachment 1 Memo in Support
- Attachment 2 Exhibit A, Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment
- Attachment 3 Exhibit B, Order Setting Schedule for Approval of Proposed Joint Plan of Distrib
- Attachment 4 Exhibit C, Revised Joint Plan of Distribution
- Attachment 5 Exhibit D, Order Postponing Approval Hearing until February 24, 2017
- Attachment 6 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jason W Galanis. (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Jason W. Galanis byInvestment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant Jason W. Galanis with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Jason W. Galanis, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John P Galanis. (gpre, ) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Stay MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Response filed by Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/8/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
- Attachment 1 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant John P. Galanis byInvestment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant John P. Galanis with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant John P. Galanis, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
- Attachment 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum
- Attachment 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant John P. Galanis with Waiver of Service of Summons
- Attachment 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant John P. Galanis
- Attachment 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 54 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 53 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 55 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Haley N Schaffer to represent US Bank National Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 1/30/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Donald Umhofer to represent Bevan T. Cooney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 1/30/2017.(gpre, ) Modified on 1/30/2017 to add text (gpre, ). (Entered: 01/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Diane Haemi Bang to represent Bevan T. Cooney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 1/30/2017.(gpre, ) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Haley N. Schaffer ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6968985) by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 2/10/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Applicaiton for Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Burnham Securities Inc. (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Burnham Securities, Inc. byInvestment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant Burnham Securities, Inc. with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Personal Service on Defendant Burnham Securities, Inc., # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BFG Socially Responsible Investments Ltd, Burnham Financial Group Inc, COR Fund Advisors LLC, GMT Duncan LLC, Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company Ltd, Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Defendant BFG Socially Responsible Investments, Ltd. by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant BFG Socially Responsible Investments, Ltd. with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant BFG Socially Responsible Investments, Ltd., # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 1/26/2017 to edit text(gpre, ). (Entered: 01/26/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Donald Umhofer ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6964951) by Bevan T Cooney. Response to Motion due by 2/9/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing California)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
- Attachment 1 Affidavit Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
- Attachment 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing California
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Defendant Burnham Financial Group, Inc. by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant Burnham Financial Group, Inc. with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Burnham Financial Group, Inc., # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 1/26/2017 to edit text (gpre, ). (Entered: 01/26/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diane Haemi Bang ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6964915) by Bevan T Cooney. Response to Motion due by 2/9/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing California)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Ashmore, Beattie) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
***DOCUMENT MAILED 42 Proper Form Order, Pro Se Party's Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, Docket Report, placed in U.S. Mail to Michelle A. Morton (gpre, ) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
PROPER FORM ORDER directing Pro Se Defendant to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Pro Se Defendant is given twenty-one (21) days to submit fully completed and signed pro se party's answers to Rule 26.01 interrogatories, Case to be brought into proper form by 2/15/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 1/25/2017. (gpre, ) Modified on 1/25/2017 to edit text (gpre, ). (Entered: 01/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Defendant Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 1/26/2017 to edit text (gpre, ). (Entered: 01/25/2017)
- Attachment 1 Affidavit of J. Derrick Quattlebaum
- Attachment 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Defendant Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation with
- Attachment 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Wealth Assurance Private Client Cor
- Attachment 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation served on 12/30/2016, answer due 1/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation, # 2 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Michelle A Morton. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(gpre, ) Filed as Answer per Doc. 30 at 3. (Entered: 01/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Defendant Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company, Ltd. by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J.D. Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company, Ltd with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Personal Service on Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company, Ltd, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton).(Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 1/26/2017 to edit text (gpre, ). (Entered: 01/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Defendant COR Fund Advisors, LLC by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J.D. Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to COR Fund Advisors, LLC, # 3 Exhibit B, Waiver of Service of Summons by COR Fund Advisors, LLC, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 1/26/2017 to edit text (gpre, ). (Entered: 01/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Defendant GMT Duncan, LLC by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of J.D. Quattlebaum, # 2 Exhibit A, Letter to GMT Duncan with Waiver of Service of Summons, # 3 Exhibit B, Signed Waiver of Service of Summons, # 4 Certificate of Service on pro se Defendant, Michelle A. Morton)(Quattlebaum, James) Modified on 1/26/2017 to edit text(gpre, ). (Entered: 01/25/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. BFG Socially Responsible Investments Ltd served on 1/4/2017, answer due 1/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Defendant BFG Socially Responsible Investments, Ltd.)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge pursuant to LR 73.02. Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin per pro se pleading filed. Motion 30 referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(sfla) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Devon D Archer.(Dean, Kelly) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
PRO SE MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this action, or in the alternative MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint pending the resolution of related criminal proceedings in SDNY (Response to Motion due by 2/6/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) by Michelle A Morton. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope postmarked 1/20/17)(sfla) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Wooten Traxler on behalf of Frankie D Hughes (Traxler, Thomas) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Frankie D Hughes answer due 2/13/2017. (Fowler, Sherman) (Main Document 28 replaced on 1/23/2017 with corrected document provided by filing user) (sfla). (Entered: 01/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Sherman Brook Fowler on behalf of Frankie D Hughes (Fowler, Sherman) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Jason W Galanis served on 1/12/2017, answer due 2/2/2017; John P Galanis served on 1/10/2017, answer due 1/31/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on Defendant John P. Galanis, # 2 Affidavit of Service on Defendant Jason W. Galanis)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Burnham Financial Group Inc served on 1/4/2017, answer due 1/25/2017; Burnham Securities Inc served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017; Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company Ltd served on 1/3/2017, answer due 1/24/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company, Ltd., # 2 Exhibit B, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Burnham Financial Group, Inc., # 3 Exhibit C, Affidavit of Service on Defendant Burnham Securities, Inc.)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TEXT ORDER granting 23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by US Bank National Association. US Bank National Association answer due 2/21/2017. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on January 9, 2017. (bedw) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Motion of Defendant U.S. Bank National Assocation for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond by US Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 1/23/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Bernie W Ellis on behalf of US Bank National Association (Ellis, Bernie) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Timothy B Anderson answer due 2/13/2017; Dilworth Paxson LLP answer due 2/13/2017. (Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Paavola on behalf of Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP (Paavola, David) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Moss Babcock on behalf of Timothy B Anderson, Dilworth Paxson LLP (Babcock, Keith) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Anne P. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 13 Motion for Michael P. McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion for Caroline L. Meneau to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Greenberg Traurig LLP. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 12/22/16.(sfla) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Frankie D Hughes waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Devon D Archer waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017; COR Fund Advisors LLC waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons - Devon D. Archer, # 2 Waiver of Service of Summons - COR Fund Advisors, LLC)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Greenberg Traurig LLP answer due 2/7/2017. (Coates, William) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caroline L. Meneau ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6915080) by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 1/5/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Pro Hac Application - Carolina L. Meneau)No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael P. McNamara ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6915064) by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 1/5/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Pro Hac Application - Michael P. McNamara)No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne P. Ray ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6915042) by Greenberg Traurig LLP. Response to Motion due by 1/5/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Application for Pro Hac - Anne P. Ray)No proposed order.(Coates, William) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Jon Michael Burnham waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. US Bank National Association waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Timothy B Anderson waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017; Dilworth Paxson LLP waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. GMT Duncan LLC waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Michelle A Morton waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Bevan T Cooney waiver executed on 11/22/2016, answer due 1/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Waiver of Service of Summons)(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Greenberg Traurig LLP waiver executed on 11/18/2016, answer due 1/17/2017. (Quattlebaum, James) (Main Document 5 - provided by filing user - replaced and Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2016: # 1 Waiver of Service) (sfla). (Entered: 11/30/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sfla, ) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The.(sfla) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
COMPLAINT against Timothy B Anderson, Devon D Archer, BFG Socially Responsible Investments Ltd, Jon Michael Burnham, Burnham Financial Group Inc, Burnham Securities Inc, COR Fund Advisors LLC, Bevan T Cooney, Dilworth Paxson LLP, Hugh Dunkerly, GMT Duncan LLC, Jason W Galanis, John P Galanis, Greenberg Traurig LLP, Gary T Hirst, Frankie D Hughes, Michelle A Morton, Thorsdale Fiduciary and Guaranty Company Ltd, US Bank National Association, Valor Group Ltd, Wakpamni Lake Community Corp, Wealth Assurance Private Client Corporation, Wealth-Assurance AG ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-6850775) filed by Investment Committee of the Michelin Retirement Plan, The, Michelin Retirement Plan, The. Service due by 2/13/2017(sfla) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
|
|
|
 |