NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD v. CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS UNIMAK, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-05334

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 12:55 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BERT DICE-GOLDBERG +1 973 645 6376 bert.dice-goldberg@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BERT DICE-GOLDBERG +1 973 645 6376 bert.dice-goldberg@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS UNIMAK, LLC, Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/31/17. (DD, ) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Cover letter to Clerk of Court)(DICE-GOLDBERG, BERT)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
        Certification of Cert. of Service on behalf of NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (DICE-GOLDBERG, BERT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: 11/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 1/27/2017. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/28/16. (DD, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (DICE-GOLDBERG, BERT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Certification on behalf of NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (DICE-GOLDBERG, BERT) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                PETITION to enforce Subpoenas, filed by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Brief, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Letter, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ek) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (CERT. OF SERV. - D.E. 5) filed by (BERT DICE-GOLDBERG) on (12/1/16) appears to be filed in the incorrect case. PLEASE REVIEW and file it in the correct case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (DD, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 11 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?