Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:16-cv-62769-RNS
District Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 13, 2019 at 3:16 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Giuliano Law, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole W. Giuliano +1 954 848 2940 +1 954 848 2941 nicole@giulianolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 203

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and on Behalf of All  Others Similarly Situated John Anthony Van Ness +1 954 962 0500 +9620 962 962 0606 tvanness@vanlawfl.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alicia Hayley Welch +1 305 961 9370 Alicia.Welch@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Tax Costs
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Bring Electronic Equipment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Reopen Case
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting motion to stay case and extend case deadlines due to government shutdown 74 . This case and all accompanying deadlines are stayed until appropriations are restored. Once appropriations are restored, the Defendant shall promptly notify the Court, move to reopen this case, and submit a joint proposed scheduling order that extends all deadlines in this case for the number of calendar days of the government shutdown. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION to Stay and Extend Deadlines, Including Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment, and Trial Date, Due to Lapse of Appropriations by United States of America. Responses due by 1/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties' joint motion for extension of briefing deadlines on the parties' cross motions for summary judgment 72 . Each party shall file its response to the other party's motion for summary judgment by January 16, 2019. All reply briefs are due by January 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 67 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment, 70 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Nicole)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. re 52 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion to Certify Class filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. (Giuliano, Douglas) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Giuliano, Douglas)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Statement of: of Material Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. re 68 Notice (Other), (Giuliano, Douglas) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. of Filing Materials in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13) (Giuliano, Douglas) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States of America. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Welch, Alicia)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by United States of America re 65 Notice (Other), 64 Notice (Other), (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE by United States of America of Filing Deposition Transcript Excerpts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Deposition of Theodore D'Apuzzo (excerpts)) (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE by United States of America of Filing Declarations in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Wendell A. Skidgel, Jr. with Exhibits A-O, attached thereto, # 2 Affidavit of Steven M. Larimore, # 3 Affidavit of William M. McCool) (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to move for summary judgment 61 . The parties' deadline to file motions for summary judgment is now December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment re 51 Order Reopening Case,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Replies due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Giuliano, Douglas) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment re 51 Order Reopening Case,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, by United States of America. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEDIATION REPORT by Carol S. Cope. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Salmon, John) (Entered: 10/20/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion to Certify Class filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Giuliano, Douglas) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas J. Giuliano on behalf of Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Attorney Douglas J. Giuliano added to party Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.(pty:pla). (Giuliano, Douglas) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Carol S. Cope. Mediation Hearing set for 10/17/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Carol S. Cope. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Nicole) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion to Certify Class filed by United States of America. Replies due by 9/5/2018. (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                    Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re [47] Order on Motion to Certify Class by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER: The parties' joint motion to set briefing schedule 53 is granted. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 52 by 8/30/2018. Plaintiff shall filed its reply by September 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 8/17/2018. (zlz) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Order Reopening CaseCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REOPEN CASE, AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ( Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2018., Fact Discovery due by 11/5/2018., Mediation Deadline 12/10/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2018., In Limine Motions due by 3/12/2019., Motions due by 3/12/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/15/2019., Calendar Call set for 5/7/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.. ). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration re 52 Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion to Certify Class by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 7/31/2018 motion to reopen case
                                                                            Joint MOTION to Reopen Case by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting in part Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/27/18. (rms1)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018, Terminated: 4/27/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Responses due by 5/11/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  terminated case
                                                                                  Civil Case Administratively Closed. See DE #49 for Image (rms1) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 order on motion to certify classCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER denying [37] Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/12/2018. (rms1)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Status report
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [37] Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class (Sur-Reply) filed by United States of America. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Wendell Skidgel)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: 1/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                          NOTICE by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. re [41] Response/Reply (Other), [37] Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class of Filing Declarations in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2) (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                            Set Deadlines Per DE#43. Miscellaneous Deadline 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (cqs)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: 1/22/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants [42] the parties' joint motion for leave for filings related to motion for class certification. The Plaintiff shall file the proposed declarations on or before January 26, 2018, and the United States may file a sur-reply on or before February 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ak02)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: 1/19/2018, Terminated: 1/22/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Leave to File Documents Related to Motion for Class Certification (Amended Declarations and Sur-Reply) by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Response/Reply (Other)
                                                                                                  Plaintiff's REPLY to [40] Response in Opposition to Motion, for Class Certification by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [37] Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class filed by United States of America. Replies due by 1/12/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Wendell A. Skidgel, Jr., # (2) Affidavit of David Stone, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants [38] the parties' joint motion seeking extensions of time in which to fully brief the issue of class certification. Accordingly, the United States shall file its response to [37] the motion for class certification on or before January 5, 2018, and the Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before January 19, 2018. Responses due by 1/5/2018, replies due by 1/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ak02)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017, Terminated: 12/13/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion for Class Certification re [37] Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017, Terminated: 4/12/2018 motion to certify class
                                                                                                          Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Responses due by 12/15/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15)(Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Affidavit
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT signed by : Nicole W. Giuliano. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/27/2017. (eaa)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017, Terminated: 11/27/2017 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan Lyle Weinstein on behalf of Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Attorney Morgan Lyle Weinstein added to party Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.(pty:pla). (Weinstein, Morgan)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                    ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by United States of America. (Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants [30] the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer to Complaint. The Defendant shall file its answer on or before October 20, 2017. Answer due 10/20/2017 re: [14] Amended Complaint, filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ak02)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017, Terminated: 10/5/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [14] Amended Complaint, by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 2/4/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 1/29/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2017., Expert Discovery due by 9/28/2018., Fact Discovery due by 8/8/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 10/25/2017., In Limine Motions due by 12/4/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2018., Motions due by 12/4/2018., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/7/2019., Status Report due by 3/13/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 9/14/2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/28/2017. (rms1) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [16] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying [16] Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Responses due by 10/10/2017). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/25/2017. (lk)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Notification of Ninety Days Expiring
                                                                                                                              Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. re [16] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [14] Amended Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS [14] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United States of America (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [17] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/10/2017. (lk)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/10/2017. (lk) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Supplemental Authority re [18] Response in Opposition to Motion, by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [16] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [14] Amended Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS [14] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [17] Defendant's MOTION to Stay (Temporary Stay of Discovery) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants the [20] Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to reply to the response to its motion to dismiss The Defendant's reply is due on or before March 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/20/2017. (ars)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                                          Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017, Terminated: 3/20/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [16] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [14] Amended Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS [14] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: 3/14/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [17] Defendant's MOTION to Stay (Temporary Stay of Discovery) filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Replies due by 3/21/2017. (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [16] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [14] Amended Complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS [14] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. Replies due by 3/20/2017. (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's MOTION to Stay (Temporary Stay of Discovery) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 3/27/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Wendell Skidgel Jr.)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017, Terminated: 9/25/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [14] Amended Complaint, , MOTION TO DISMISS [14] Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 3/16/2017) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: 2/21/2017 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies as moot [13] the Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Plaintiff's amended pleading moots the motion to dismiss the prior pleading. See Taylor v. Alabama, 275 F. Appx 836, 838 (11th Cir. 2008) (noting that when the plaintiffs amended their complaint the defendants' motion to dismiss became moot). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/21/17. (ars)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017, Terminated: 2/21/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [1] Complaint, , Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 2/24/2017) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants the [10] Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. The Defendant's response to the complaint is due on or before February 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 1/26/2017. (ars)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. . Attorney John Anthony Van Ness added to party Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.(pty:pla). (Van Ness, John)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017, Terminated: 1/26/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [1] Complaint, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Hayley Welch on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft). (Welch, Alicia)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 11/30/2016, answer due 1/30/2017. (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Upcoming Deadline To Serve Under Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 4(m) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/11/2017. (lan)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: 11/23/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/23/2016. (lan)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (lan)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A. (Giuliano, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lan)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (lan)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9273059, filed by Theodore D'Apuzzo, P.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summon(s), # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J)(Giuliano, Nicole) Modified text on 11/22/2016 (bb).
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines Per DE#43. Miscellaneous Deadline 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (cqs)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?