CENTER FOR AUTO SAFETY et al v. NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02325

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2017 at 11:52 AM EST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Center For Auto Safety, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adina Rosenbaum +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 arosenbaum@citizen.org
No Logo Consumer Watchdog, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adina Rosenbaum +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 arosenbaum@citizen.org
No Logo JOAN CLAYBROOK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adina Rosenbaum +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 arosenbaum@citizen.org
v.
No Logo Mark R. Rosekind, Defendant
National Highway Traffic Safety Administration National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?