AKINSANMI v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-07732

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 7:14 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER terminating 38 Motion for Reconsideration and terminating 39 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff's Counsel to serve on Plaintiff a copy of the Court's 7/10/2017 Letter Opinion and a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/12/2017. (km)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Application/Petition
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/10/2017. (km)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Strike
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By 5/15/2017, Plaintiff must show cause in writing as to why the Complaint should not be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) for failure to comply with the Court's orders; that Defts may file a response by 5/25/2017. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/4/2017. (gxh)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LETTER OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/4/2017. (km)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff must electronically file a Show Cause Response due by 2/17/2017. Defendant may file a response by 3/7/20174. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/3/2017. (km)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?